Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Brian J Davis
Referred: Samuel J Horovitz
Case #: 3:24-cv-00669
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2024
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 3:41 AM EST
Defendant
American Association of Clinical Endocrinology (AACE)
Plaintiff
Age Reversal Unity
1321 Upland Dr. PMB 18311
Houtson, TX 77043


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 08, 2024
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 11/08 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/07 1:11 PM
ORDER ADOPTING 8 Report and Recommendation; DENYING 2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/7/2024. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
8 8 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 10/07 4:33 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re pro se Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Signed by Magistrate Judge Samuel J. Horovitz on 10/7/2024. (KTQ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
7 7 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/05 11:59 AM
ORDER taking under advisement 2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Plaintiff shall have until September 25, 2024, to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order and all applicable rules and law. If Plaintiff fails to do so, the undersigned will likely recommend that the District Judge deny the Motion and dismiss this action without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Samuel J. Horovitz on 9/5/2024. (KTQ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/22 9:47 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Association of Clinical Endocrinology (AACE) filed by Age Reversal Unity.(BGR)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 08/21 3:43 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 4 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file as a separate document Plaintiff's amended complaint (Doc. 4-1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Samuel J. Horovitz on 8/21/2024. (KTQ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
4 4 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 07/25 9:45 AM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint by Age Reversal Unity. (e-portal)(JDR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/09 2:31 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Samuel J. Horovitz. New case number: 3:24-cv-669-BJD-SJH. Magistrate Judge J. B. Toomey no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED:2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Samuel J. Horovitz. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 07/05 3:25 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Age Reversal Unity. (e-portal) (ELM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/05 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against American Association of Clinical Endocrinology (AACE) filed by Age Reversal Unity. (e-portal)(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons