Deose v. Allied Universal Security Services
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Referred: | Russell G Vineyard |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00126 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:626 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Nov 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 01, 2025 3:43 AM EST |
Defendant
Allied Universal Security Services
|
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Jean Debose
801 Swan Brook Drive
Fayetteville, GA 30215 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, November 18, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() CLERK'S JUDGMENT (dmb) |
|
14 | 14
![]() ORDER adopting12 Final Report and Recommendation. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/18/2024. (dmb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 11/18 3:22 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gloria Jean Debose re15 Clerk's Judgment,14 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (dmb) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 11/18 3:25 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (dmb) |
||
Monday, October 28, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER for Service of12 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/28/2024. (dmb) |
|
12 | 12
![]() FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the9 Amended Complaint, filed by Gloria Jean Debose be dismissed for failure to state a plausible claim as instructed in the Court's 8/13/2024 Order. The Clerk is directed to terminate this reference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/28/2024. (dmb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 10/28 3:55 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gloria Jean Debose re13 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,12 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re9 Amended Complaint, filed by Gloria Jean Debose. (dmb) |
||
Thursday, October 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Thu 10/17 12:13 PM
Submission of11 Order on Final Report and Recommendation to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (dmb) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 10/17 12:13 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gloria Jean Debose re11 Order. (dmb) |
||
Wednesday, October 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER rejecting6 Final Report and Recommendation. Action referred back to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard for further action. The Court finds that Deboses delay in complying with the Courts order is justified by her change of address. The8 Motion for Reconsideration re:6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is granted. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 10/16/2024. (dmb) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gloria Jean Debose re6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re3 Complaint, filed by Gloria Jean Debose,7 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (dmb) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Wed 10/09 12:54 PM
Submission of6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re3 Complaint, filed by Gloria Jean Debose,8 MOTION for Reconsideration, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb) |
||
Tuesday, September 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Universal Security Services filed by Gloria Jean Debose.(jkb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION for Reconsideration by Gloria Jean Debose. (jkb) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2024 | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 09/20 8:52 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gloria Jean Debose re6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re3 Complaint, filed by Gloria Jean Debose, and7 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (dmb) |
||
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER for Service of6 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/19/2024. (dmb) |
|
6 | 6
![]() FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the3 Complaint, filed by Gloria Jean Debose be dismissed without prejudice for failure to obey the Courts 8/13/2024 and 9/3/2024, Orders and for failure to state a claim. The Clerk is directed to terminate this reference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/19/2024. (dmb) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Mon 09/16 9:43 AM
Submission of5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (dmb) |
||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall have until 9/13/2024 to file an amended complaint in compliancewith the requirements of the Courts Order of 8/13/2024. The Clerk is directed to resubmit this matter to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon plaintiff's filing of an amended complaint or the expiration of the deadline, whichever first occurs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/3/2024. (dmb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 09/03 10:49 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gloria Jean Debose re5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (dmb) |
||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Universal Security Services with Jury Demand filed by Gloria Jean Debose.(jkb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 08/27 3:59 PM
Submission of4 Amended Complaint,2 Order, Order ruling on IFP, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (jkb) |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() COMPLAINT filed by Gloria Jean Debose.(jkb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() ORDER the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE Civil Action No. 3:24-cv-00127-TCB-RGV, and CONSOLIDATE it with Civil Action No. 3:24-cv-00126-TCB-RGV, and plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis in Case No. 126, is GRANTED, but the Court will reserve ruling on the frivolity determination and permit her an opportunity to replead her claims. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send plaintiff a new employment discrimination form complaint and she is hereby ORDERED to replead her complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order to address the deficiencies discussed herein or face a recommendation of dismissal of this action. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon plaintiffs filing of an amended complaint or the expiration of fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, whichever first occurs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 08/13/2024. Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00126-TCB-RGV, 3:24-cv-00127-TCB-RGV(jkb) Modified on 8/13/2024 (jkb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 08/13 2:02 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gloria Jean Debose, re Terminate Case, (2 in 3:24-cv-00127-TCB, 2 in 3:24-cv-00127-TCB) Order, Order ruling on IFP. Discrimination complaint form sent. Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-00126-TCB-RGV, 3:24-cv-00127-TCB(jkb) |
||
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gloria Jean Deose.(dmb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/05 4:25 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (dmb) |