Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:24-mj-06273
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 08, 2024 3:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Rami Rotlewicz (1)
Represented By
Jude M. Faccidomo
Ratzan And Faccidomo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brianna Coakley
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/08/2024 3:16 AM EDT
Saturday, June 08, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Rami Rotlewicz (1). (at)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION TO SEAL re1 Complaint by USA as to Rami Rotlewicz. (at)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED ORDER granting2 Motion TO SEAL as to Rami Rotlewicz (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 6/8/2024). (See attached document for full details). (at)
Related: [-]