California Central District Court
Judge:Hernan D Vera
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 2:24-cv-05705
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Terminated:Feb 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
22 22 order Awarding EAJA Fees Thu 03/13 11:21 AM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Re: Stipulation for Attorney Fees21 . (see document for details) (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
21 21 stip Attorney Fees Mon 03/10 6:32 AM
STIPULATION for Attorney Fees Ricardo Anthony Garcia.(Yim, Young)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, February 07, 2025
20 20 judgmentCV Judgment Mon 02/10 8:43 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Hernan D. Vera, Related to: Order on Stipulation to Voluntary Remand,19 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above-captioned action is remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the Stipulation to Remand. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
Related: [-]
19 19 order For Order Mon 02/10 8:40 AM
ORDER OF REMAND18 by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Based upon the parties' Stipulation to Voluntary Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and to Entry of Judgment ("Stipulation to Remand"), and for cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action be remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the terms of the Stipulation to Remand. (es)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Order Fri 02/07 1:05 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) filed by Defendant Martin O'Malley.(Harada, Lynn) Modified on 2/7/2025 (nbo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
17 17 order For Order Tue 01/28 11:15 AM
ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick.16 IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until February 26, 2025 to file her responsive brief and Plaintiff will have until March 12, 2025 to file an optional reply brief. (san)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
16 16 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/24 12:32 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Brief (non-motion non-appeal)13 filed by Defendant Martin O'Malley.(Harada, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
15 15 order For Order Mon 12/23 3:49 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE14 by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until January 27, 2025 to file her responsive brief and Plaintiff will have until February 10, 2025 to file an optional reply brief. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
14 14 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/11 12:51 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Brief (non-motion non-appeal)13 filed by Defendant Martin O'Malley.(Attorney Lynn M. Harada added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft))(Harada, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
13 13 misc Brief (non-motion non-appeal) Wed 11/13 4:52 PM
BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Anthony Garcia. (Yim, Young)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
12 12 order Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 11/12 9:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT11 by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
11 11 motion Exceed Page Limitation Thu 11/07 1:15 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Plaintiff brief Ricardo Anthony Garcia. (Yim, Young)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of service
Saturday, October 19, 2024
10 10 misc Status Report Sat 10/19 10:40 AM
STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Anthony Garcia. (Yim, Young)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
9 9 order Extension of Time to File Thu 09/26 11:14 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's brief is due on, or before, November 13, 2024. Defendant's responsive brief will be due by December 13, 2024 and Plaintiffs reply, if any, December 27, 2024. Granting8 MOTION for Extension of Time. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 09/25 5:05 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File brief Ricardo Anthony Garcia. (Yim, Young)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 09/09 9:11 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) (mj) filed by Defendant Martin O'Malley.(Tarn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Page,
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable,
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions,
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices,
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 7 Disability Related Development,
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2,
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3,
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4,
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 5
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
6 6 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) Tue 07/16 3:39 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Martin O'Malley. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
5 5 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 07/12 11:07 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . See document for details. (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Tue 07/09 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Hernan D. Vera and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 07/08 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties (Yim, Young)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 07/08 9:18 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Anthony Garcia. (Yim, Young)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/08 9:18 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37785230 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Young Bin Yim added to party Ricardo Anthony Garcia(pty:pla))(Yim, Young)
Related: [-]