North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:24-cv-00635
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Terminated:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
Zaxby's Operating Company L.P
Plaintiff
Joel Robertson
945 North College Street
Charlotte, NC 28206


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
13 13 appeal Mandate - USCA Wed 02/05 9:53 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to Joel Robertson re:5 Notice of Appeal 24-1824 ,10 Opinion/Judgment - USCA. (llp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
12 12 1 pgs appeal Order - USCA Wed 01/29 9:08 AM
ORDER of USCA denying the petition for rehearing en banc as to5 Notice of Appeal 24-1824 . (llp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
11 11 1 pgs appeal Order - USCA Fri 12/06 8:58 AM
TEMPORARY STAY OF MANDATE as to Joel Robertson pending ruling on petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc re:5 Notice of Appeal 24-1824 . (llp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
10 10 2 pgs appeal Opinion - USCA Thu 11/21 10:55 AM
Unpublished Opinion from Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals as to5 Notice of Appeal 24-1824 . 4th Circuit decision - Affirmed. (llp) (llp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/21/2024) USCA Judgment
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Thu 09/26 12:05 PM
Mail (Notice of Appeal) addressed to Joel Robertson returned as undeliverable. (mdp) Modified filed date on 9/26/2024 (mdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
appeal Electronic Record Transmitted Wed 09/04 9:34 AM
Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re:5 Notice of Appeal 24-1824 . (llp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
8 8 appeal Case Number - Court of Appeals Thu 08/29 11:27 AM
USCA Case Number 24-1824 for5 Notice of Appeal, USCA Case Manager: Ganna M. Aboutabl. (nvc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
7 7 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA Wed 08/28 2:03 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re5 Notice of Appeal, (tlj)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal Wed 08/28 2:00 PM
MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Appeal in forma pauperis by Joel Robertson. (tlj)
Related: [-]
5 5 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 08/28 2:00 PM
Pro Se NOTICE OF APPEAL as to4 Clerk's Judgment,3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Joel Robertson. (IFP)(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of No Transcript Order,
Att: 2 Record on Appeal,
Att: 3 Record on Appeal Exhibits
appeal Transmission of Motion to USCA Wed 08/28 2:04 PM
Transmitted and Transferred In Forma Pauperis Motion to US Court of Appeals re:5 Notice of Appeal,. Motions terminated at District Court:6 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Appeal in forma pauperis (tlj)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
4 4 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 08/05 4:44 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/5/2024. Signed by Clerk, Katherine Hord Simon. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 08/05 4:40 PM
ORDER (Sealed - Participants) granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/5/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/08 2:13 PM
Pro Se MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joel Robertson. (add)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/08 2:11 PM
Pro Se COMPLAINT against Zaxby's Operating Company L.P with Jury Demand, filed by Joel Robertson.. (add)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
order Order of Instructions Mon 07/08 2:14 PM
Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Litigants in Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 07/08/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(add)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Mon 07/08 2:15 PM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (add)
Related: [-]