Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:R Stan Baker
Referred: Christopher L Ray
Case #: 4:24-cv-00140
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Terminated:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 3:32 AM EST
Defendant
Reef Systems Corporation
Represented By
Steven Chase Parker
Smith, Anderson, Blount, Dorsett, Mitchell & Jernigan, LLP
contact info
Kerry A. Shad
Smith, Anderson, Blount, Dorsett, Mitchell & Jernigan L.L.P.
contact info
Shameka C. Rolla
Smith, Anderson, Blount, Dorsett, Mitchell & Jernigan L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Augusta Dejuan Hathaway
5501 Abercord St. Ste. D-210
Savannah, GA 31405
Represented By
Roland Mumford
Roland Mumford
contact info
Adeash Lakraj
Farah And Farah, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
36 36 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 04/21 9:45 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/21/2025. (amd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/17 4:44 PM
ORDER. Attorney Winfrey having been granted leave to appear pro hac vice, no further action is required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/17/2025. (pts)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/17 9:40 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re:33 Response to Order to Show Cause. (csr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
33 33 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 04/16 8:02 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Augusta Dejuan Hathaway.(Lakraj, Adeash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit phv papers and email,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2.18 email,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3.27 email,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3.28 call,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3.29 call
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
32 32 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/15 1:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Reef Systems Corporation. (Parker, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 04/08 10:39 AM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/7/2025. (SLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Filing Mon 04/07 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Filing by Augusta Dejuan Hathaway re28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission Winfrey Certificate of Good Standing (Lakraj, Adeash)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 04/07 12:47 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission. (csr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Filing Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 04/03 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re:28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission. After 14 days of noncompliance a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 4/17/2025. (csr)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 1:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission by Augusta Dejuan Hathaway. Responses due by 4/17/2025. Fee paid, $200, Receipt # AGASDC-4033999.(Lakraj, Adeash) Modified on 4/3/2025 (gmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
25 25 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/02 9:18 AM
ORDER directing the parties to file either the anticipated stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report updating the Court on the status of their settlement by April 21, 2025. (Stipulation of Dismissal or Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2025.) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Brian Winfrey must show cause why he has been attempting to represent the Plaintiff in violation of this Court's local rules (Show Cause Response due by 4/16/2025.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 04/02/2025. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 03/28 6:47 PM
STATUS REPORT (Cover Letter incl.) by Reef Systems Corporation. (Parker, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/11 11:00 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2024. Discovery due by 2/14/2025. Motions due by 4/14/2025. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 2/14/2025. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 2/28/2025. Status Report due by 3/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/11/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
22 22 motion Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 12/09 3:10 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Parker, Steven)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 12/09 3:44 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (thb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 12/06 9:56 AM
ORDER granting re19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Roland Mumford terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/6/24. (loh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
20 20 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 12/05 9:21 AM
ORDER granting re15 Consent Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/5/24. (loh)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 12/05 9:11 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:19 Second MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (csr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
19 19 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 12/04 6:16 PM
Second MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Augusta Dejuan Hathaway. Responses due by 12/18/2024.(Mumford, Roland)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter of withdrawal and tracking confirmation
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
18 18 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 12/03 10:44 AM
ORDER directing the parties to file a revised Rule 26(f) Report no later than December 9, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/03/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Mon 12/02 2:15 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Attorney Kerry A. Shad. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/02/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Mon 12/02 2:06 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac for attorney Shameka Rolla. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/2/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 12/02 9:44 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge:14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (kjm)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 12/02 9:46 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge:15 Consent MOTION for Protective Order (Proposed Order Submission) (kjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
15 15 motion Protective Order Fri 11/29 2:48 PM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order (Proposed Order Submission) by Reef Systems Corporation. Responses due by 12/13/2024. (Parker, Steven)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 11/29 2:42 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Parker, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 1:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shameka C. Rolla Receipt Number AGASDC-3946338, Fee Amount $200, by Reef Systems Corporation. Responses due by 12/11/2024.(Parker, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - EDNC Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - List of Cases in SDGA,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 1:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kerry A. Shad Receipt Number AGASDC-3946327, Fee Amount $200, by Reef Systems Corporation. Responses due by 12/11/2024.(Parker, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - EDNC Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - List of Cases in SDGA,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Wed 11/27 2:21 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shameka C. Rolla Receipt Number AGASDC-3946338, Fee Amount $200,12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kerry A. Shad Receipt Number AGASDC-3946327, Fee Amount $200. (csr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 11/13 8:38 AM
ORDER denying9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/12/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/11 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adeash Lakraj on behalf of Augusta Dejuan Hathaway (Lakraj, Adeash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
9 9 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 11/07 2:54 PM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney without opposition by Augusta Dejuan Hathaway. Responses due by 11/21/2024. (Mumford, Roland)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 11/07 3:56 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:9 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney without opposition. (csr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Fri 10/25 4:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Reef Systems Corporation. (Parker, Steven)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/25 3:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Reef Systems Corporation.(Parker, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 10/10 9:47 AM
ORDER granting5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Reef Systems Corporation answer due 10/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/10/2024. (kjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/09 1:52 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Reef Systems Corporation. Responses due by 10/23/2024.(Parker, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Wed 10/09 4:18 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. (csr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 7:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roland Mumford on behalf of Augusta Dejuan Hathaway (Mumford, Roland)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
3 3 order Rule 26(f) Order Mon 07/08 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Standing Order regarding cases pending before Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker. ([LINK:Click Here to View Standing Order)] RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 07/08/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 07/08 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Reef Systems Corporation. (jlh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/08 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Reef Systems Corporation, filed by Augusta Dejuan Hathaway. (Fee paid: Receipt #400001601, $405.00.) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)
Related: [-]