Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:24-cv-01183
Nature of Suit450 Other Statutes - Commerce
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Case in other court:Fairfax County Circuit Court, CL-24-0007392
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 4:37 AM EST
Defendant
Niagara Bottling, LLC
Represented By
Nicholas Ryan Martinez
Berenzweig Leonard LLP
contact info
Declan C. Leonard
Berenzweig Leonard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rans Transport, LLC
8601 Western Oak Drive
Springfield, VA 22153
Represented By
John T. Husk
Law Office Of Seaton & Husk, L.P.
contact info
Jeffrey Ellison Cox
Law Office Of Seaton & Husk LP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Elite Transit Solutions, LLC
437 Grant Street Suite 2000
Pittsburg, PA 15219


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/17 4:39 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff Rans Transport, LLC's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Niagara Bottling, LLC's Third Party Complaint filed against Elite Transit Solutions, LLC is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 09/17/2024. (jlan)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/17 4:04 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT) by Rans Transport, LLC.(Husk, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 01, 2024
11 11 6 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Thu 08/01 1:55 PM
Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan [Dkt. No. 10] adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for August 7, 2024, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's July 16, 2024, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 08/01/2024. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
10 10 misc Discovery Plan Wed 07/31 1:09 PM
Joint Discovery Plan and Report of Rule 26(F) Conference Discovery Plan by Rans Transport, LLC.(Husk, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 07/31 8:10 AM
Summons Issued as to Elite Transit Solutions, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Monday, July 29, 2024
8 8 misc Proposed Summons Mon 07/29 3:16 PM
Proposed Summons re7 Third Party Complaint by Niagara Bottling, LLC. (Martinez, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Third Party Complaint Mon 07/29 3:15 PM
Third Party Complaint against Elite Transit Solutions, LLC, filed by Niagara Bottling, LLC.(Martinez, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
6 6 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/16 8:13 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 12/13/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/16/2024.(kgall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form,
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice
Monday, July 15, 2024
5 5 misc Citizenship Disclosure Form Mon 07/15 2:47 PM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Niagara Bottling, LLC. (Martinez, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 07/15 2:46 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Niagara Bottling, LLC. (Martinez, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/15 2:42 PM
Defendant Niagara Bottling, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by Plaintiff Rans Transport, LLC by Niagara Bottling, LLC.(Martinez, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/09 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ryan Martinez on behalf of Niagara Bottling, LLC (Martinez, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
1 1 notice Notice (other) Mon 07/08 3:29 PM
NOTICE by Niagara Bottling, LLC Notice of Removal (Martinez, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 07/10 10:50 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Cwel)
Related: [-]