Minnesota District Court
Judge:Susan Richard Nelson
Referred: Dulce J Foster
Case #: 0:24-cv-02650
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1346 Tort Claim
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 2:31 AM CST
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Adam J Hoskins
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah S. Giller
Represented By
Peter W Riley
Schwebel Goetz & Sieben
contact info
Peter G. Bertling
Bertling Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 8:39 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
19 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Minn. Stat. Section 145.682(4) . (Bertling, Peter)
Related: [-]
18 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support Minn. Stat, 145.682(4) .(Bertling, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibt A: Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Alan W. Newman
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
17 17 order Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail Tue 02/18 5:08 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER in Response to Confidential Letters: Counsel are directed to meet and confer regarding settlement on or before August 7, 2025 . Following the meet-and-confer, each party must submit a 1-2 page confidential letter describing the settlement discussions that have taken place, whether and when the party believes a settlement conference or private mediation might be most productive, and what additional discovery or motion practice might be needed to maximize the chances of reaching a settlement in such a conference. Each party's confidential letter must be submitted by email to Judge Foster at foster_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov by August 14, 2025 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 2/18/2025.(LNP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
16 16 6 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 10/30 11:47 AM
ORDER on14 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 10/30/2024. (MEH)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 10/30 8:13 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re14 Stipulation. (Hoskins, Adam)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation Wed 10/30 8:11 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Deborah S. Giller. (Hoskins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
13 13 10 pgs order Scheduling Order Fri 10/04 3:35 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2025. Fact Discovery due by 7/31/2025. Expert Discovery due by 11/28/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2025. Motions (non-disp) due 7/31/2025. Motions (disp) due by 11/28/2025. Ready for trial due by 3/30/2026. Counsel are directed to meet and confer regarding settlement on or before February 7, 2025 . Following the meet-and-confer, each party must submit a 1-2 page confidential letter describing the settlement discussions that have taken place, whether and when the party believes a settlement conference or private mediation might be most productive, and what additional discovery or motion practice might be needed to maximize the chances of reaching a settlement in such a conference. Each party's confidential letter must be submitted by email to Judge Foster at foster_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov by February 14, 2025 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 10/4/2024.(LNP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 E-Discovery Checklist,
Att: 2 Judge Foster's Practice Pointers
12 12 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 10/04 3:17 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: At the parties' request (see ECF No.11 ) and based on the Court's review of the record, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the pretrial scheduling conference scheduled for October 10, 2024 at 9:00 AM is CANCELED . The Court will issue a pretrial scheduling order based on the written submissions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 10/4/2024.(LNP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
11 11 7 pgs misc Rule 26(f) Report Thu 10/03 1:36 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Deborah S. Giller.(Hoskins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 09/11 3:14 PM
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report and Confidential Letters due by 10/3/2024 . Pretrial Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2024 at 09:00 AM by Zoom video (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 9/11/2024.(LNP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 26(f) Report Template,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 10 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/10 2:33 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by United States of America. (Hoskins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
8 8 5 pgs service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 09/04 3:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Deborah S. Giller. United States of America served on 7/22/2024, answer due 9/20/2024.(Bertling, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Attorney's Office in St. Paul, MN and Minneapolis, MN
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/31 8:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Hoskins on behalf of United States of America. (Hoskins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/10 11:13 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter G. Bertling for Deborah S. Giller. Approved by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 7/10/2024. (jam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
5 5 misc Affidavit (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings) Tue 07/09 12:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Peter Bertling byDeborah S. Giller. (Riley, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 07/08 4:21 PM
Summons Issued as to United States of America. (CLK)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 07/08 4:19 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 24-cv-2650 SRN/DJF. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/08 4:03 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter Bertling. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-11177885 filed by Deborah Giller. (Riley, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/08 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11177753) filed by Deborah Giller. Filer requests summons issued. (Riley, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet