Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ashely M Chan
Case #: 2:24-bk-12344
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Dismissed:Jul 31, 2024
Terminated:Aug 15, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Norristown Appliances, LLC
1012 W Germantown Pike
Norristown, PA 19403-3906
Represented By
ROBERT H. HOLBER
Attorney Robert H Holber PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of United States Trustee Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building 900 Market Street Suite 320
Philadelphia, PA 19107


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, August 15, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 08/15 1:05 PM
Bankruptcy Case Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 03, 2024
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 08/04 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 08/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #26 )
Thursday, August 01, 2024
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/02 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #23 )
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Other Thu 08/01 9:02 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case for the reasons stated on the record. Related [+] (D., Stacey)
Related: [-] 22
25 25 court CHAP - Hearing Held (Bk) Wed 07/31 3:28 PM
Hearing Held on22 Motion to Dismiss Case for Other Filed by United States Trustee. Order entered dismissing case. (B., Pamela)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
24 24 answer Response Mon 07/29 4:17 PM
Response to Motion to Dismiss Case for Other filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee Filed by NE IND Owner-2 LLC Related [+]. (KURTZMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 22
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 notice U.S. Trustee Notice of Motion Mon 07/29 3:53 PM
Notice of Expedited Motion to Dismiss Case for Other22 Filed by United States Trustee. Hearing scheduled 7/31/2024 at 12:30 PM at Courtroom #4. (CARTWRIGHT, KACIE)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss Case for Other Mon 07/29 3:50 PM
Expedited Motion to Dismiss Case. Failure to attend meetings and provide information to UST Filed by United States Trustee Represented by KACIE CARTWRIGHT (Counsel). (CARTWRIGHT, KACIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Service List
Saturday, July 27, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 07/28 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #20 )
Thursday, July 25, 2024
20 20 order Extend / Shorten Time Thu 07/25 11:53 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Atty Disclosure Statement due 8/5/2024. Schedule A/B due 8/5/2024. Schedule D due 8/5/2024. Schedule E due 8/5/2024. Schedule F due 8/5/2024. Schedule G due 8/5/2024. Schedule H due 8/5/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/5/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 8/5/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 8/5/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 8/5/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement due 8/5/2024. Corporate Resolution due 8/5/2024. (W., Christine)
Related: [-] 19
Friday, July 19, 2024
19 19 motion Extend / Shorten Time Fri 07/19 9:24 AM
Motion to Extend time to File 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Corporate Ownership Statement, Corporate Resolution, Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Attorney Compensation, Statement of Financial Affairs, and Summary of Assets and Liability Filed by Norristown Appliances, LLC Represented by ROBERT H. HOLBER (Counsel). (HOLBER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certification of Service
Thursday, July 18, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 07/19 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #15 )
17 17 notice Notice of Motion Thu 07/18 10:16 AM
Notice of Related [+] Filed by Norristown Appliances, LLC. Hearing scheduled 8/21/2024 at 12:30 PM at Courtroom #4. (HOLBER, ROBERT)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Att: 1 Certification of Service
16 16 motion Withdraw As Attorney Thu 07/18 10:14 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Norristown Appliances, LLC Represented by ROBERT H. HOLBER (Counsel). (HOLBER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 15, 2024
15 15 order Extend / Shorten Time Mon 07/15 5:36 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend time to File Small Business Balance Sheet, Small Business Cash Flow Statement, Small Business Statement of Operations and Small Business Tax Return. Documents are due 8/5/2024 Related [+] (W., Christine)
Related: [-] 13
Saturday, July 13, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 07/14 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Number of Notices Mailed: Related [+]. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Friday, July 12, 2024
13 13 motion Extend / Shorten Time Fri 07/12 9:34 AM
Motion to Extend time to File Small Business Balance Sheet, Small Business Cash Flow Statement, Small Business Statement of Operations and Small Business Tax Return. Filed by Norristown Appliances, LLC Represented by ROBERT H. HOLBER (Counsel). (HOLBER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certification of Service
Thursday, July 11, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Requiring Documents Fri 07/12 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Requiring Documents. Number of Notices Mailed: Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
11 11 trustee Telephonic 341 Meeting Information Thu 07/11 2:54 PM
The upcoming 341(a) meeting is scheduled to be held remotely..For participation by telephone, please call 1-877-685-3103 and use (access code/meeting id/passcode) 6249335 to join the meeting.. More information can be found in the attached pdf document.. (CARTWRIGHT, KACIE)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (multi) Thu 07/11 2:48 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/22/2024 at 02:00 PM at ALTERNATE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE (For Trustee Use Only). Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 01/6/2025. (MILLER, NANCY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
9 9 1 pgs trustee Notice Appointing Trustee or Subchapter V Trustee Wed 07/10 2:31 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee LEONA MOGAVERO, ESQ.. The trustees acceptance and verified statement shall be filed within 7 days of this notice. Filed by United States Trustee.(CARTWRIGHT, KACIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Verified Statement
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/09 1:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by JEFFREY KURTZMAN, TODD R. BARTOS Filed by JEFFREY KURTZMAN, TODD R. BARTOS on behalf of NE IND Owner-2 LLC. (BARTOS, TODD)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Entry of Appearance and Request for Notices (FOR TRUSTEE'S OFFICE ONLY) Tue 07/09 1:24 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICES, pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rules 2002 and 9010, KACIE CARTWRIGHT hereby appears in this matter on behalf of the United States trustee for Region 3, and demands that all notices, motions, etc., given or required to be given in this case, and that all papers, etc., served in this case, be given to and served upon me at the address listed on this case party list. Filed by KACIE CARTWRIGHT on behalf of United States Trustee. (CARTWRIGHT, KACIE)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/09 11:30 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by JEFFREY KURTZMAN Filed by JEFFREY KURTZMAN on behalf of NE IND Owner-2 LLC. (KURTZMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Requiring documents for non-individual cases Tue 07/09 9:44 AM
Order Entered the debtor having failed to file or submit with the petition all of the documents required by Fed. R. Bankr.P.1007, It is hereby ORDERED that this case MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE if the documents listed are not filed by deadlines listed. Any request for an extension of time must be filed prior to the expiration of the deadlines listed . Small Business Balance Sheet or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 7/15/2024. Small Business Cash Flow Statement or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 7/15/2024. Small Business Statement of Operations Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 7/15/2024. Small Business Tax Return or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 7/15/2024. Atty Disclosure Statement due 7/22/2024. Corporate Resolution due 7/22/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 7/22/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 7/22/2024. Schedule A/B due 7/22/2024. Schedule D due 7/22/2024. Schedule E/F due 7/22/2024. Schedule G due 7/22/2024. Schedule H due 7/22/2024. Statement of Corporate Ownership due 7/22/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/22/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/22/2024. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
4 4 misc Matrix List of Creditors Mon 07/08 5:03 PM
Matrix List of Creditors Filed. Number of pages filed: 1, Filed by ROBERT H. HOLBER on behalf of Norristown Appliances, LLC . (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs motion Employ Mon 07/08 3:57 PM
Application to Employ Robert H. Holber, Esquire as Counsel Filed by Norristown Appliances, LLC Represented by ROBERT H. HOLBER (Counsel). (HOLBER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Compensation Statement
Att: 4 Certification of Service
Att: 5 Verified Statement
2 2 court Document Mon 07/08 3:52 PM
Document in re: Written Consent of Sole Member Filed by ROBERT H. HOLBER on behalf of Norristown Appliances, LLC. (HOLBER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 07/08 3:38 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Norristown Appliances, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V due by 10/7/2024. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 01/6/2025. Statement of Corporate Ownership due 07/22/2024. Corporate Resolution due 07/22/2024. (HOLBER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 07/08 3:40 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12344 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25836089. Fee Amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1