California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-05733
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 12:29 AM PST
Defendant
International Golf Group, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Miles Mitzner
Mitzner LLP
contact info
Kyle Kubisch
Law Offices Of Kyle Kubisch
contact info
Ben Lewis Wagner
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steve Stowe
Represented By
Olivia J Scott
Holland And Knight LLP
contact info
Matthew Miles Mitzner
Mitzner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Zachary Wettstein
Represented By
Matthew Miles Mitzner
Mitzner LLP
contact info
Kyle Kubisch
Law Offices Of Kyle Kubisch
contact info
Ben Lewis Wagner
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sellingers Power Golf Ltd.
Represented By
Olivia J Scott
Holland And Knight LLP
contact info
Bruce J Zabarauskas
Holland And Knight LLP
contact info
Matthew Miles Mitzner
Mitzner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Back Story, LLC
Represented By
Gabriel G. Green
Buchalter Apc
contact info
Willmore F. Holbrow, III
Buchalter Apc
contact info
Matthew Miles Mitzner
Mitzner LLP
contact info
Kevin Connelly
Buchalter, Apc
contact info
Joshua M. Robbins
Buchalter PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Terminated: 11/15/2024
Represented By
Matthew Miles Mitzner
Mitzner LLP
contact info
John A. Goldmark
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Terminated: 11/15/2024
Represented By
Marcy Blattner Micale
Davis Wright Tremaine
contact info
Matthew Miles Mitzner
Mitzner LLP
contact info
John A. Goldmark
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 30, 2025
74 74 order Dismiss Dismiss Case Stay Case Fri 01/31 8:47 AM
ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS61 ,62 AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY63 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED, as follows: The Sellinger's Defendants are dismissed from the action in its entirety, with prejudice, for lack of personal jurisdiction; The first and fourth causes of action are dismissed, with prejudice; The second and third causes of action are dismissed, without prejudice; The Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED, as moot. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint, consistent with this Order, within twenty-one (21) days. (lom)
Related: [-]
73 73 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/30 11:13 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS (Dkts.61 ,62 , &63 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: In light of Parties submitting to the tentative order posted on the Court's website on 1/22/2025, the Court vacates the Motion hearing scheduled for 1/31/2025. No appearance by counsel is necessary. The Tentative Ruling is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
72 72 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 01/29 11:28 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS (DKTS.61 62 &63 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Motions from 1:30 pm to 1/31/2025 at 11:15 AM. The hearing will proceed in-person at the First Street Courthouse, Courtroom 9B. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
71 71 order Continue Thu 01/23 11:38 AM
ORDER RE DEFENDANTS SELLINGER'S POWER GOLF LTD.'S AND STEVE STOWE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(b)(2) AND 12(b)(6)70 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Motion is GRANTED. 2. All hearings in this matter currently scheduled for January 24, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. are hereby continued to January 31, 2025. (lom)
Related: [-]