California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-05750
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Terminated:Aug 08, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 24STCV13043
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 12:33 AM PST
Defendant
Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC
Represented By
David Henry Danning
Gleason And Favarote LLP
contact info
Paul M Gleason
Gleason And Favarote, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Lupita Martinez
Represented By
Hugo Ernesto Gamez
Law Offices Of Hugo Gamez
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cushman and Wakefield of California, Inc.
Terminated: 08/02/2024
Represented By
David Henry Danning
Gleason And Favarote LLP
contact info
Paul M Gleason
Gleason And Favarote, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
23 23 order Dismissing Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 01/21 2:31 PM
ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Stipulation pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)22 is hereby approved, and this case is dismissed without prejudice and without any party being declared a prevailing party for any purpose. This dismissal without prejudice is treated by the Court as functionally indistinguishable from a stay in terms of the parties' ability to seek confirmation, modification, or vacatur of an arbitration award. This dismissal is made without prejudice to any rights that Plaintiff may have to file or have heard any motion based on California Code of Civil Procedure Sections 1281.9799. Pursuant to the Court's 1/13/2025 order, the order to show cause is discharged and the January 24 hearing is vacated. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
22 22 stip Dismiss Case Fri 01/17 4:37 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) Without Prejudice filed by defendants Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC, Cushman and Wakefield of California, Inc..(Gleason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration Proof of Service of Proposed Order
Monday, January 13, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 01/13 8:20 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties are ORDERED to show cause at an in-person hearing why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution on 1/24/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr., consistent with the Court's 8/8/2024 order. The parties shall file a joint written response to this order to show cause (OSC), together with their overdue joint status report, no later than 1/17/2025. Alternatively, if the parties file a stipulation of dismissal by 1/17/2025, the OSC will be automatically discharged, and the January 24 hearing will be automatically vacated by operation of this order. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
20 20 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 08/08 9:42 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION [DKT. NO. 19] by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court grants the request to stay the case pending arbitration and vacates the mandatory scheduling conference set for August 9. The parties shall file a joint report on the status of the arbitration by January 10, 2025, with a supplemental joint status report due every 60 days thereafter until they notify the Court that arbitration is complete or until further order of the Court. If the parties fail to timely file a joint report, this action will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
19 19 20 pgs stip Order Wed 08/07 5:23 PM
STIPULATION for Order to submit matter to binding arbitration and stay action pending completion of arbitration filed by defendants Cushman and Wakefield of California, Inc., Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC.(Gleason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 02, 2024
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 08/02 9:31 AM
(In Chambers) Order by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Pursuant to Plaintiff's notice of withdrawal at Dkt. No. 17, the motion to remand at Dkt. No. 12 is deemed withdrawn, and Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Cushman and Wakefield of California, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dta)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/01 7:39 PM
Notice filed by PLAINTIFF Lupita Martinez. WITHDRAWING MOTION TO REMAND (Gamez, Hugo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
16 16 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 07/31 8:20 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
15 15 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 07/30 6:50 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendants Cushman and Wakefield of California, Inc., Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC.. (Gleason, Paul)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs order Order Tue 07/30 8:50 AM
ORDER RE MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court will give the parties one further opportunity to meet and confer to attempt to resolve their jurisdictional dispute. At that meeting, Plaintiff shall identify (1) her citizenship, (2) the evidence she has that C&W employed her, and (3) the basis for C&Ws liability if it did not employ her. After meeting and conferring, Plaintiff no later than August 1 shall file a notice stating whether she wishes to dismiss her claims against C&W and withdraw her motion to remand or whether she wishes to pursue the motion12 . If she does not withdraw the motion, Plaintiff should be prepared at the mandatory scheduling conference on August 9 to identify the evidence providing a Rule 11 basis for her suggestions that she is not a California citizen and that Defendants' evidence that C&W never employed her is false. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
13 13 respm Amendment (Motion related) Fri 07/26 10:35 PM
Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court12 filed by Plaintiff Lupita Martinez.(Gamez, Hugo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration [AMENDED] of Hugo Gamez ISO Remand
12 12 motion Remand Case to State Court Fri 07/26 6:24 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by PLAINTIFF Lupita Martinez. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Gamez, Hugo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Hugo Gamez ISO Remand,
Att: 2 Proposed Order ISO Remand
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
11 11 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 07/16 1:14 PM
Plaintiff filed a complaint in state court against Defendants Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC (Pinnacle) and Cushman & Wakefield of California, Inc. (C&W), alleging that she was employed by both Defendants and that they discriminated and retaliated against her in violation of state law. Defendants removed, invoking diversity jurisdiction and claiming that C&W, which is nondiverse, was fraudulently joined and never employed Plaintiff. Dkt. No. 1. The notice of removal is supported by declarations stating that Plaintiff was employed by Pinnacle and was never employed by C&W. Dkt. Nos. 1-2, 1-3. The parties shall promptly meet and confer to determine whether there is a genuine factual dispute about Plaintiff's employer(s) and to attempt in good faith to resolve any dispute. No later than July 26, 2024, the parties shall file one of the following: (1) if Plaintiff lacks a factual basis to assert that she was employed by C&W, a stipulation or notice of dismissal of Plaintiff's claims against C&W, (2) if Plaintiff has evidence that she was employed by C&W, a noticed motion for remand, or (3) if the parties are able to resolve their dispute in full, a notice of settlement or a voluntary dismissal.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ko)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/11 6:29 PM
Notice of Assignment, Standing Orders, Filing Procedures, Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines, Etc. filed by defendants Cushman and Wakefield of California, Inc., Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC. (Gleason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 07/09 2:36 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on August 9, 2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINE TO FILE A JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT. (lfa)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 07/09 2:32 PM
Standing Order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (lfa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 07/09 1:08 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 07/09 1:08 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 07/09 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Mon 07/08 6:16 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants Cushman & Wakefield of California, Inc., Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC. Related Case(s): no related cases (Danning, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/08 6:13 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Cushman & Wakefield of California, Inc., Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC identifying Cushman & Wakefield US, Inc. and Cushman & Wakefield PLC as Corporate Parent. (Danning, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 07/08 6:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Cushman & Wakefield of California, Inc., Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC. (Danning, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/08 5:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV13043 Receipt No: ACACDC-37792973 - Fee: $405, filed by defendants Cushman & Wakefield of California, Inc., Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC. (Attorney David Henry Danning added to party Cushman & Wakefield of California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Henry Danning added to party Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Danning, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David H. Danning,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jessie Waller,
Att: 3 Declaration of Patty Sturm,
Att: 4 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Answer
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 07/09 1:19 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cushman and Wakefield of California, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Lupita Martinez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/23/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 07/09 1:23 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Cushman and Wakefield of California, Inc., Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 3)(ghap)
Related: [-]