Westbrook v. Dallas County et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Referred: | David L Horan |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01734 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 11, 2024 2:59 AM CST |
Defendant
Dallas County
|
|
Defendant
John Wiley Price
|
|
Plaintiff
Lula Westbrook
3727 Bertrand Avenue
Dallas, TX 75210 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 05, 2025 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Wed 02/05 12:23 PM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 24-10942 : Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (axm) |
||
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER denying12 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ; denying13 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/15/2025) (chmb) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION to Waive Fees for Transcript Order, Motion to Waive Fees for District Court Docket Number 3:24-cv-1734-K, Motion for Permission to waive Auction Sale Under Appeal for 2410942, Motion to Waive Auction Sale filed by Lula Westbrook. (axm) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re9 Notice of Appeal,11 Notice of Appeal,8 Notice of Appeal,10 Notice of Appeal filed by Lula Westbrook ***FILED USING THE EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2024 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 10/31 9:12 PM
USCA Case Number 24-10942 in USCA5 for9 Notice of Appeal,11 Notice of Appeal,8 Notice of Appeal,10 Notice of Appeal filed by Lula Westbrook. (axm) |
||
Thursday, October 17, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit, received from the Fifth Circuit for processing in this office on 10/18/2024, by Lula Westbrook. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (axm) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit, received from the Fifth Circuit for processing in this office on 10/18/2024, by Lula Westbrook. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (axm) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit, received from the Fifth Circuit for processing in this office on 10/18/2024, by Lula Westbrook. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (axm) |
|
Thursday, October 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit, received from the Fifth Circuit for processing in this office on 10/16/2024 by Lula Westbrook. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (axm) Modified on 10/17/2024 (axm) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() JUDGMENT -This action came on for consideration by the Court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this lawsuit is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/13/2024) (chmb) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/13/2024) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Unless Plaintiff Lula Westbrook shows through timely objections a basis to amend the complaint to allege a plausible claim, the Court should dismiss this lawsuit with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/18/2024) (cfk) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Injunction
Mon 07/08 3:06 PM
MOTION for Emergency Injunction filed by Lula Westbrook (see document3 for image). (axm) |
|
3 | 3
![]() COMPLAINT and Motion for Emergency Injunction against Dallas County, John Wiley Price filed by Lula Westbrook. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (axm) |
|
1 | 1
![]() New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] index and to the prior sanctions found within the[LINK:circuit] index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) |