Colorado District Court
Judge:N Reid Neureiter
Case #: 1:24-cv-01892
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Case in other court:Florida Northern, 3:24-cv-00124
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 1:25 AM MST
Defendant
Defendant 1
Plaintiff
Michael J. Thornton
Represented By
Daniel J. Thornburgh
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz PLLC
contact info
Robert Jason Richards
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, February 21, 2025
28 28 service Service by Publication - Complaint Fri 02/21 2:27 PM
SERVICE by Publication filed by Michael J. Thornton. Defendant 1 served on 2/6/2025, answer due 2/26/2025.(Thornburgh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Attorney Daniel J. Thornburgh
Thursday, February 06, 2025
27 27 minutes Status Conference Thu 02/06 2:58 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Status Conference held on 2/6/2025. FTR: Courtroom A401. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
26 26 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Mon 02/03 2:56 PM
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON FORGEIGN DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO RULE 4(f)(3) By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/3/2025.(norlin, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
25 25 18 pgs motion Order Fri 01/31 11:49 PM
MOTION for Order to Authorize Alternate Service of Process by Plaintiff Michael J. Thornton.(Thornburgh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Attorney Daniel J. Thornburgh,
Att: 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 01/28 4:39 PM
ORDER ON MOTION ENLARGEMENT OF TIME Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. No.23 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 5, 2025 to effectuate service of process on the Defendants. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/28/2025.(norlin, )
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/28 12:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Complaint and Summons by Plaintiff Michael J. Thornton.(Thornburgh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Monday, January 27, 2025
22 22 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 01/27 4:31 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Status Conference held on 1/27/2025. Further telephonic Status Conference set for 2/6/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties shall call the conference line 571-353-2301, Access Code 841686937# to participate. FTR: Courtroom A401. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
21 21 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 11/14 4:28 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Status Conference held on 11/14/2024. Further telephonic Status Conference set for 1/27/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties shall call the conference line 571-353-2301, Access Code 841686937# to participate. FTR: Courtroom A401. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
20 20 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Order on Motion to Expedite Tue 09/10 3:13 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Status Conference held on 9/10/2024: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery and Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas (Dkt. #19 ) is GRANTED . Plaintiff is authorized to serve third-party subpoenas on OKX to obtain information described in the motion. The cryptocurrency exchanges are directed to respond to the subpoenas within 14 days of service. Further telephonic Status Conference is set for November 14, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (Mountain Standard Time) before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter in Courtroom A401. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties shall call the conference line 571-353-2301, Access Code 841686937# to participate. Plaintiff shall have up to and including February 3, 2025 to effectuate service of process on the Defendants. FTR: Courtroom A401. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Expedite Tue 09/10 2:20 PM
MOTION to Expedite DISCOVERY AND LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENAS by Plaintiff Michael J. Thornton.(Thornburgh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENAS
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 08/21 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Daniel J. Thornburgh by Robert Jason Richards on behalf of Michael J. Thornton (Richards, Robert)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 08/21 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Jason Richards on behalf of Michael J. ThorntonAttorney Robert Jason Richards added to party Michael J. Thornton(pty:pla) (Richards, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/10 12:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER The above-captioned case has been directly assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c) - Direct Assignment to Magistrate Judges. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic Status Conference is SET on September 10, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. Five minutes prior to the scheduled time, participants shall call the conference line at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937#. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7/10/2024. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
15 15 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 07/09 10:39 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 07/09 10:38 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Tue 07/09 10:36 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
Related: [-]
12 12 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 07/09 10:28 AM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 3:24-cv-00124. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/09 11:06 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Upon due consideration of Plaintiff's motion to transfer case (Doc. 9 ) and the case file, the Court finds that this case could have originally been filed in the District of Colorado and that it should be transferred there in the interest of justice under 28 U.S.C. §1406(a). Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 07/09/24. (jfj)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/09 10:53 AM
NOTICE Proposed Order Granting Transfer from Northern District of Florida to District of Colorado Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) by MICHAEL J. THORNTON re9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Colorado (THORNBURGH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re:8 Response to Order to Show Cause,9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Colorado. (jfj) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 7/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/09 8:45 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re:8 Response to Order to Show Cause,9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Colorado. (jfj)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
9 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Colorado by MICHAEL J. THORNTON. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/22/2024) . (THORNBURGH, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 7/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
8 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MICHAEL J. THORNTON. (THORNBURGH, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 7/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
7 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The complaint was filed more than 90 days ago and it does not appear that service has been effectuated on any of the defendants. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause within 7 days from the date of this Order why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 07/01/24. (Show Cause Response due by 7/8/2024 .) (jfj) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 7/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re:1 Complaint. 90 day deadline has elapsed without an appearance by any defendant. (jfj) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 7/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
6 6 Summons Issued as to JOHN DOES 1-20. (mb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 7/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Summons Issued as to DEFENDANT 1 a/k/a "SUSAN". (mb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 7/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Request for Summons Summons by MICHAEL J. THORNTON. (THORNBURGH, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 7/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
Friday, March 22, 2024
3 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (THORNBURGH, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 7/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Note to Counsel THORNBURGH re Re1 Complaint. A complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet, currently AO Form JS 44, shall be filed by counsel for the filing party in each civil case at the time of filing, unless for good cause shown an additional time for such filing is allowed. [See Local Rule 5.2]. Please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection: Other Filings >> Other Documents >> Civil Cover Sheet. (jfj) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 7/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT for Conversion of Stolen Cryptocurrency against DEFENDANT 1, JOHN DOES 1-20 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-8711106.), filed by MICHAEL J. THORNTON. (THORNBURGH, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 7/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "1" Cryptocurrency Tracing Report