New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alvin K Hellerstein
Case #: 1:24-cv-05174
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981ra Race Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 3:45 AM EST
Defendant
Northwell Health, Inc.
Northwell Health, Inc. Marcy U. Kaiser, Esq. Office of Legal Affairs 2000 Marcus Avenue
New Hyde Park, NY 11042
Represented By
Jennifer Beth Courtian
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Sarah Elizabeth Child
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Janice Vetrano
New Hyde Park, NY 11040
Represented By
Jennifer Beth Courtian
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Sarah Elizabeth Child
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
LaKita Steel
Represented By
Robert B. Davis
Robert B. Davis, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
23 23 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/25 4:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a status conference on Friday, August 1, 2025, at 10:00 a.m., which will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 646-453-4442, Access code: 507 454 028#. Finally, by July 29, 2025, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov), a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record at the conference, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 8/1/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/25/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
22 22 order Case Management Plan Mon 11/18 2:40 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2024. Discovery due by 6/30/2025. Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/18/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 11/15 10:06 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/15/2024, ( Status Conference set for 8/1/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
21 21 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/14 4:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for November 15, 2024, at 10:00 a.m., will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 646-453-4442, Conference ID: 400 847 450#. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
20 20 order Protective Order Wed 11/13 4:17 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/13/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Wed 11/13 11:28 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Northwell Health, Inc., Janice Vetrano..(Courtian, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 11/13 11:27 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Northwell Health, Inc., Janice Vetrano..(Courtian, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 10/21 4:55 PM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to Nov. 15, 2024, 10:00 AM. Telephone Conference set for 11/15/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/21/2024) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
16 16 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 10/16 3:55 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for November 1, 2024 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jennifer B. Courtian dated October 16, 2024. Document filed by Northwell Health, Inc., Janice Vetrano..(Courtian, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/25 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Elizabeth Child on behalf of Northwell Health, Inc., Janice Vetrano..(Child, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/20 4:01 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Northwell Health, Inc., Janice Vetrano..(Courtian, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/20 3:46 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Northwell Health, Inc., Janice Vetrano..(Courtian, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order Fri 09/20 2:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a status conference on November 1, 2024, at 10:00 a.m., which will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 646-453-4442 Access code: 648 184 847# To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 10 minutes prior to the start of the conference. Finally, no later than October 29, 2024 at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 11/1/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/20/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 09/16 10:54 AM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. The extension to 9/20/24 is granted. SO ORDERED. (Northwell Health, Inc. answer due 9/20/2024; Janice Vetrano answer due 9/20/2024.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/16/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/13 2:56 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint through and including September 20, 2024 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jennifer Courtian dated September 13, 2024. Document filed by Northwell Health, Inc., Janice Vetrano..(Courtian, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 08/14 10:23 AM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Defendants have until September 16, 2024 to respond. SO ORDERED. (Northwell Health, Inc. answer due 9/16/2024; Janice Vetrano answer due 9/16/2024.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 08/12 1:05 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jennifer B. Courtian dated August 12, 2024. Document filed by Northwell Health, Inc., Janice Vetrano..(Courtian, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 08/01 4:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. All Defendants. Service was accepted by Shannon Tassey accepted service of the complaint for Northwell, Jesselyn Vergara accepted service for Janice Vetrano. Document filed by LaKita Steel..(Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 07/10 2:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Janice Vetrano..(pc)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 07/10 2:42 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Northwell Health, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 07/10 10:24 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 07/10 10:25 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 07/10 10:27 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 07/10 10:27 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert B. Davis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 07/10 10:27 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert B. Davis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Janice Vetrano. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/09 2:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 07/09 2:16 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Janice Vetrano, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by LaKita Steel..(Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 07/09 2:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Northwell Health, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by LaKita Steel..(Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/09 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Northwell Health, Inc., Janice Vetrano. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29580611)Document filed by LaKita Steel..(Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]