Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-00121

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Grace E Robson
Case #: 6:24-ap-00070
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Abdul Mathin
Represented By
Frank M Wolff
Nardella & Nardella. PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.
301 Arthur Godey Road Penthouse
Miami Beach, FL 33140
Represented By
James J. Webb
Mitrani, Rynor, Adamsky & Toland, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
30 30 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Mon 04/07 12:20 PM
Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Filed by Frank M Wolff on behalf of Defendant Mohamed Abdul Mathin Related [+]. (Wolff, Frank)
Related: [-] 27 ,29
29 29 1 pgs order Order Striking Mon 04/07 10:44 AM
Order Conditionally Striking Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 27
Thursday, April 03, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Deposition Thu 04/03 4:42 PM
Notice of Deposition of Corporate Representative of Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc. Filed by Frank M Wolff on behalf of Defendant Mohamed Abdul Mathin. (Wolff, Frank)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Thu 04/03 4:38 PM
Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Filed by Jesus Lozano on behalf of Defendant Mohamed Abdul Mathin. (Lozano, Jesus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Deposition Wed 03/12 5:21 PM
Notice of Deposition of Nuzhat Mathin Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Subpoena (AP) Wed 03/12 5:19 PM
Subpoena for Depo of Nuzhat Mathin Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Thu 03/06 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 03/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #23 )
Monday, March 03, 2025
23 23 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (AP) Mon 03/03 1:36 PM
Notice Rescheduling Hearing Previously scheduled May 15, 2025 at 10:15 am . Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Gena)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
22 22 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 02/13 1:11 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: James Webb (Plf Atty); Jesus Lozano (Def Atty); RULING: Pretrial Conference - cont. to May 15, 2025 at 10:15 am (AOCNFNG); (gww). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
21 21 misc Subpoena (AP) Fri 02/07 6:37 PM
Amended Subpoena A+C Architects (Deposition) Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
20 20 misc Subpoena (AP) Thu 01/30 8:53 PM
Subpoena Wells Fargo Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Subpoena (AP) Thu 01/30 8:51 PM
Subpoena Truist Bank Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Subpoena (AP) Thu 01/30 8:49 PM
Subpoena TD Bank Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Subpoena (AP) Thu 01/30 8:45 PM
Subpoena Nuzhat Mathin Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Subpoena (AP) Thu 01/30 8:43 PM
Subpoena Kurzban & Kurzban Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Subpoena (AP) Thu 01/30 8:41 PM
Subpoena JP Morgan Chase Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Subpoena (AP) Thu 01/30 8:36 PM
Subpoena CliftonLarson Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Subpoena (AP) Thu 01/30 8:34 PM
Subpoena Bank of America Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Subpoena (AP) Thu 01/30 8:23 PM
Subpoena American Express Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Subpoena (AP) Thu 01/30 8:21 PM
Subpoena A+C Architects Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
10 10 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 10/08 11:12 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: James Webb (Plf Atty); Frank Wolff (Def Atty); RULING: Pretrial Conference - cont. to February 13, 2025 at 10:15 am (AOCNFNG); (gww). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
9 9 order Allow Mon 10/07 3:25 PM
Order Granting Motion To Allow Counsel to Appear Via Zoom Related [+]. Service Instructions: James Webb is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Chelsea)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 motion Motion to Allow Mon 10/07 3:01 PM
Emergency Motion to Allow James Webb to appear via Zoom for the pre trial conference 10-8-24 Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
7 7 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 09/05 11:40 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/09 3:56 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Related [+]. Filed by Frank M Wolff on behalf of Defendant Mohamed Abdul Mathin. (Wolff, Frank)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed Wed 07/17 3:39 PM
Service Executed on Mohamed Abdul Mathin of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Change of Address Wed 07/17 3:32 PM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by James J. Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc.. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
3 3 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/10 1:56 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 08/09/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A Pretrial/Status Conference will be held on October 8, 2024, at 09:30 AM. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
court Attorney Address Discrepancy General Item 1.1 - Address Wed 07/10 8:27 PM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Firm or Address for Attorney on PDF Image does not Match the Address in the CM/ECF System. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS IN ACCORDANCE WITH Local Rule 2091-2 and submit a request to update their address through PACER:[LINK:https://pacer.uscourts.gov/] Related [+] (Sara M.)
Related: [-] [1 ]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/09 2:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of the Debtor Filed by Frank M Wolff on behalf of Defendant Abdul Mathin. (Wolff, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Mon 07/08 11:21 PM
Complaint by Cadle Properties of Illinois, Inc. against Abdul Mathin. (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [41 (Objection / Revocation of Discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))]. (Webb, James)
Related: [-]