California Southern District Court
Judge:M James Lorenz
Referred: David D Leshner
Case #: 3:24-cv-01181
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332lr Diversity - Labor
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Imperial, ECU003523
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 12:26 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1 through 50
Defendant
Equinox Gold Corp
Represented By
James Putnam Carter
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Victoria L. Cendejas
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jordan Wysocki
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
New Gold Canada, Inc.
Defendant
Western Mesquite Mines, Inc.
Represented By
James Putnam Carter
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Victoria L. Cendejas
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jordan Wysocki
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Guillermo L. Sornia
Represented By
Emil Davtyan
D.Law, Inc.
contact info
Jean Hopkins Power
D. Law, Inc.
contact info
David Harmik Yeremian
D.Law, Inc.
contact info
Alvin B. Lindsay
D.Law, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
12 12 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Tue 03/04 10:36 AM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by the Chambers of Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re11 Notice (Other), from Plaintiff Guillermo L. Sornia. Non-compliance with local rule(s), 83.3(f): withdrawal of counsel requires a motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties.(rmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stricken Document
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/26 10:10 AM
NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF JEAN HOPKINS POWER by Guillermo L. Sornia (Lindsay, Alvin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 02/24 9:03 AM
ORDER Approval9 Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation. All formal discovery and litigation procedures shall be stayed until 9/5/2025. The ENE and Case management Conference shall be continued to 10/8/2025 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/21/2025. (rmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 motion Stay Thu 02/20 5:52 PM
MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation by Guillermo L. Sornia. (Lindsay, Alvin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Tue 02/18 3:59 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by the Chambers of Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation , from Plaintiff Guillermo L. Sornia. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(f): Lacking signature certification. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties.(rmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stricken Document
Friday, February 14, 2025
7 7 motion Stay Fri 02/14 12:22 PM
MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation by Guillermo L. Sornia. (Power, Jean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jean H. Power on behalf of Guillermo L. Sornia (Power, Jean)Attorney Jean H. Power added to party Guillermo L. Sornia(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
5 5 7 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Mon 01/13 12:03 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Joint Discovery Plan due 2/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/13/2025.(dim)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/09 12:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equinox Gold Corp. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (axc1)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Tue 07/09 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Equinox Gold Corp. No Parties With Financial Interest. (axc1)
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 07/09 12:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Equinox Gold Corp. (axc1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 07/09 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18995681.), filed by Western Mesquite Mines, Inc., Equinox Gold Corp, New Gold Canada, Inc.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1181-L-DDL. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case.(axc1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Declaration of VIctoria Cendejas,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Declaration of VIctoria Cendejas,
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Declaration of VIctoria Cendejas,
Att: 8 Exhibit F - Declaration of VIctoria Cendejas