Connecticut District Court
Judge:Michael P Shea
Referred: Maria E Garcia
Case #: 3:24-cv-01174
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 3:24 AM EST
Defendant
Matthew Costello
Represented By
Samantha C. Wong
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Janelle Medeiros
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Edward David Rowley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Charles Lavoie
Represented By
Samantha C. Wong
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Janelle Medeiros
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Edward David Rowley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Bryan J. Fahey
Represented By
Samantha C. Wong
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Janelle Medeiros
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Edward David Rowley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
SeanPaul Reyes
Represented By
Blake Turley
contact info
Alexander T. Taubes
Alexander T. Taubes
contact info


Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
36 36 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/24 5:14 PM
ORDER. The35 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Discovery, including depositions of fact and expert witnesses, is extended to August 1, 2025 . Dispositive motions are due September 15, 2025 . The Joint Trial Memorandum is due October 15, 2025 , or 30 days from the Courts ruling on dispositive motions, whichever is later. The case will be ready for trial by November 14, 2025 , or 30 days from submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum, whichever is later. The Court hereby CANCELS the Telephonic Status Conference scheduled for May 15, 2025. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 04/24/2025. (Metzroth, R)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/24 12:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/1/25 to complete discovery25 Order, by SeanPaul Reyes. (Taubes, Alexander)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/25 10:32 AM
Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/1/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2025; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 10/15/2025; Trial Ready Date 11/14/2025 (Sichanh, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
34 34 motion Leave to File Document Tue 11/05 10:35 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by SeanPaul Reyes. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amicus Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit to Brief,
Att: 3 Envelope
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
33 33 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 10/23 12:17 PM
ORDER. The32 motion for Attorney Janelle R. Medeiros to withdraw as counsel is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 10/23/2024. (Metzroth, R)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
32 32 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 10/22 10:05 AM
MOTION for Janelle R. Medeiros, AAG to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew Costello, Bryan J. Fahey, Charles Lavoie. (Medeiros, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/21 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward David Rowley on behalf of Matthew Costello, Bryan J. Fahey, Charles Lavoie in their individual capacities only (Rowley, Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order Returning Submission Thu 10/17 4:11 PM
ORDER Returning Submission as Deficient: Amicus Brief returned to Marc Joesph Stout ( Non-Party ) Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 10/17/2024.(Sichanh, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
29 29 misc Docket Annotation Fri 10/11 4:28 PM
Docket Entry Correction re28 Order Returning Submission, entry entered in error. (Sichanh, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order Returning Submission Thu 10/10 3:39 PM
ORDER Returning Submission as Deficient: Amicus Filing returned to SeanPaul Reyes Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 10/10/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
27 27 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 10/07 10:39 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SeanPaul Reyes. (Taubes, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/04 9:30 AM
Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/1/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2025 Trial Brief due by 7/15/2025 Trial Ready Date 8/15/2025 (Santos, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
26 26 minutes Status Conference Thu 10/03 10:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maria E. Garcia: Continued Telephonic Rule 16 Status Conference held on 10/3/2024. Total Time: 9 minutes (Santos, S)
Related: [-]
25 25 9 pgs order Order Thu 10/03 11:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Please see the attached Scheduling Order for complete listing of deadlines. Discovery due by 5/1/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2025 Trial Brief due by 7/15/2025 Trial Ready Date 8/15/2025 Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 10/3/24.(Esposito, A.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
24 24 order Order Thu 09/26 1:30 PM
ORDER. The Rule 16 Telephonic Conference scheduled for September 26, 2024, is continued to October 3, 2024. The continuance is due to the failure of Plaintiffs counsel to participate in the conference. Attorney Blake Turley joined the conference late on behalf of Plaintiff, representing that he intended to file an appearance. However, at the time of the conference he had not filed an appearance in the case and did not meet or confer with Defendants counsel regarding the Rule 26(f) Report. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding the proposed deadlines prior to the continued Rule 16 Conference and should be prepared to articulate a basis for seeking nearly one year, September 1, 2025, to complete discovery. Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 9/26/24. (Esposito, A.)
Related: [-]
23 23 utility Calendar Entry Thu 09/26 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Continued Telephonic Rule 16 Status Conference set for 10/3/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maria E. Garcia. Conference Number: 203-684-6202 Meeting ID: 120473810# (Esposito, A.)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Status Conference Thu 09/26 12:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maria E. Garcia: Telephonic Rule 16 Status Conference held on 9/26/2024. Total Time: 11 minutes (Court Reporter Courstmart.) (Santos, S)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Turley on behalf of SeanPaul Reyes (Turley, Blake)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
19 19 utility Calendar Entry Mon 09/23 12:53 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Rule 16 Status Conference set for 9/26/2024 at 12:00 PM before Judge Maria E. Garcia. Conference Number: 203-684-6202 Meeting ID: 100211439# (Esposito, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
20 20 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 09/23 1:16 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia for Rule 16 conference and enter a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 9/18/2024.(Sichanh, C)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order Fri 09/20 12:39 PM
ORDER. The parties have filed a17 Rule 26(f) report. This case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Garcia to hold a Rule 16 conference and enter a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 9/20/2024. (Pierson, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 09/18 3:18 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Taubes, Alexander)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order Wed 09/18 9:14 AM
ORDER. The defendants have filed a15 Motion to Dismiss. On or before October 7, 2024 , the plaintiff shall either file a response to the motion or file an amended complaint in which he pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in the defendants' memorandum of law. The Court will not allow further amendments after October 7, 2024 . If the Plaintiff chooses to amend and the defendants renew their motion to dismiss, the defendants may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 9/18/2024. (Pierson, M)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/23 1:09 PM
Set Deadlines as to15 MOTION to Dismiss . Plaintiff Response due by 10/7/2024 or Amended Complaint due by 10/7/2024. (Sichanh, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 09/16 2:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Costello, Bryan J. Fahey, Charles Lavoie.Responses due by 10/7/2024(Wong, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Friday, September 06, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 09/06 3:52 PM
ORDER. The13 joint motion for extension is GRANTED. The parties shall file their 26(f) report on or before September 25, 2024 . Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 9/6/2024. (Pierson, M)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/09 12:56 PM
Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/25/2024 (Sichanh, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time Thu 09/05 12:34 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/25/24 to file Rule 26(f) report by SeanPaul Reyes. (Taubes, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 08/02 10:54 PM
ORDER. The11 consented-to motion for extension of time is GRANTED. The defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before September 15, 2024 . In addition, the parties are notified that, under Local Rule 26(f), their deadline to file a 26(f) report is 44 days after the appearance of defense counsel, i.e., September 14, 2024 . Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 8/2/2024. (Pierson, M)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Update Answer Deadline Mon 08/05 10:41 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/14/2024; Answer deadline updated for Matthew Costello to 9/15/2024; Bryan J. Fahey to 9/15/2024; Charles Lavoie to 9/15/2024. (Sichanh, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time Thu 08/01 1:51 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 15, 2024 to file a response to the plaintiff's Complaint by Matthew Costello, Bryan J. Fahey, Charles Lavoie. (Medeiros, Janelle)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/01 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha C. Wong on behalf of Matthew Costello, Bryan J. Fahey, Charles Lavoie (Wong, Samantha)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/01 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle Medeiros on behalf of Matthew Costello, Bryan J. Fahey, Charles Lavoie (Medeiros, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 07/11 12:46 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Matthew Costello, Bryan J. Fahey, Charles Lavoie* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alexander T. Taubes* *Alexander T. Taubes* *470 James Street, Suite 007* *New Haven, CT 06513*. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Electronic Service Documents Thu 07/11 12:45 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Electronic Filing Order,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,5 Standing Protective Order,1 Complaint filed by SeanPaul Reyes, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement Signed by Clerk on 7/11/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
service Request to Issue Summons Wed 07/10 9:57 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Matthew Costello, Bryan J. Fahey, Charles Lavoie. (Taubes, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
6 6 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Thu 07/11 12:44 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Thu 07/11 12:43 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 07/09/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Thu 07/11 12:43 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 07/09/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Thu 07/11 12:42 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2024. Discovery due by 1/8/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 2/12/2025. Signed by Clerk on 07/09/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Wed 07/10 9:51 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 7/9/24.(Hushin, Z.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/09 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Matthew Costello, Bryan Fahey, Charles Lavoie ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7828743.), filed by SeanPaul Reyes.(Taubes, Alexander)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 07/10 11:08 AM
Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]