New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:24-bk-42838
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
King of Queens Auto Services Corp.
3801 & 3803 21st Street
Long Island City, NY 11101
Represented By
Heath S Berger
Berger, Fischoff, Shumer,
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 07/08/2024 8:00 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Tue 07/09 2:55 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 24-42838 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22771510. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 15 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 07/09 2:47 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Small Business Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of King of Queens Auto Services Corp. Chapter 11 Plan - Small Business - due by 01/6/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Disclosure Statement due by 01/6/2025. (Berger, Heath)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement Tue 07/09 2:49 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of King of Queens Auto Services Corp. (Berger, Heath) Modified on 7/9/2024 (dng)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Tue 07/09 2:50 PM
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of King of Queens Auto Services Corp. (Berger, Heath)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement Tue 07/09 2:51 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of King of Queens Auto Services Corp. (Berger, Heath) Modified on 7/9/2024 (dng)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement Tue 07/09 2:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of King of Queens Auto Services Corp. (Berger, Heath) Modified on 7/9/2024 (dng)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement Tue 07/09 2:53 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of King of Queens Auto Services Corp. (Berger, Heath)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Statement Tue 07/09 2:54 PM
Statement Regarding Authority to Sign & File Petition Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of King of Queens Auto Services Corp. (Berger, Heath)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Affidavit Tue 07/09 3:34 PM
Affidavit Re: Pursuant to Rule 1007-4 Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of King of Queens Auto Services Corp. (Berger, Heath)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Tue 07/09 3:57 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Small Business Balance Sheet due by 7/16/2024. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 7/16/2024. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 7/16/2024. Small Business Tax Return due by 7/16/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 7/23/2024. Schedule A/B due 7/23/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 7/23/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 7/23/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 7/23/2024. (dng)
Related: [-]