Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:24-cv-00821
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Terminated:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 2:58 AM CST
Counter Defendant
SB Initiative, Inc.
Represented By
Chanelle R. Acheson
Waddey Acheson LLC
contact info
Ira Clinton Waddey, Jr.
Waddey Acheson LLC
contact info
William David Bridgers
Holland & Knight (nashville)
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Cheekwood Botanical Garden and Museum of Art
Represented By
Maia T. Woodhouse
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cheekwood Botanical Garden and Museum of Art
Represented By
Maia T. Woodhouse
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SB Initiative, Inc.
Represented By
Chanelle R. Acheson
Waddey Acheson LLC
contact info
Ira Clinton Waddey, Jr.
Waddey Acheson LLC
contact info
William David Bridgers
Holland & Knight (nashville)
contact info

GPO Sep 24 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT re Order 44. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/24/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, December 16, 2024
61 61 misc Entry of Judgment Mon 12/16 10:36 AM
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:60 Order Dismissing Case. (ab)
Related: [-]
60 60 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 12/16 10:35 AM
ORDER: The Court acknowledges that this action (with all of its claims and counterclaims) has been DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to enter judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58 and close the file. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/16/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ab)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
59 59 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/13 1:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cheekwood Botanical Garden and Museum of Art. (Woodhouse, Maia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
58 58 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/10 12:34 PM
ORDER: To ensure that the attention of the parties and their counsel remains on finalization of a settlement agreement following resolution by Magistrate Judge Newbern of the parties' dispute, see Docket No.57 , the parties must, by no later than January 3, 2025, submit either a joint stipulation of dismissal or a joint motion for proposed agreed order of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/10/2024. (kc)
Related: [-]