Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:24-cv-01240
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Public Accomodations)
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 1:25 AM PST
Defendant
Fielding Graduate University
Represented By
Jacob M Axelrad
contact info
Scott M. Mahoney
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Harrison M Thorne
contact info
Sarai Leora Brown
Skane Mills LLP
contact info
Defendant
Danielle Moreggi
Represented By
Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Defendant
Connie Veazey
Represented By
Jacob M Axelrad
contact info
Scott M. Mahoney
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Harrison M Thorne
contact info
Defendant
Wendi Williams
Represented By
Jacob M Axelrad
contact info
Scott M. Mahoney
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Harrison M Thorne
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Sadora
The Law Offices of Robert S. Melcic 3315 E. Russell Rd. Ste. A4-271
Las Vegas, NV 89120
Represented By
Robert Sean Melcic
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
40 40 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 04/04 6:30 PM
ORDER granting39 Stipulation TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES (FIRST REQUEST). Discovery due by 9/22/2025. Motions due by 10/21/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/19/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/3/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Stipulation Thu 04/03 3:44 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re27 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Defendant Danielle Moreggi. (Thome, Sheri) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
38 38 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 03/05 1:29 PM
ORDER granting37 Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, WITH PREJUDICE, AGAINST DEFENDANT FIELDING GRADUATE UNIVERSITY, WENDI WILLIAMS, AND CONNIE VEAZEY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Complaint filed by Plaintiff, JASON SADORA, against Defendants FIELDING GRADUATE UNIVERSITY, WENDI WILLIAMS and CONNIE VEAZEY, in the above-captioned matter, United States District Court, Case No. 2:24-cv-01240-APG-EJY, including all claims alleged therein, are hereby dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants FIELDING GRADUATE UNIVERSITY, WENDI WILLIAMS and CONNIE VEAZEY. Each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/5/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
37 37 motion Stipulation Tue 03/04 12:48 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Defendant Fielding Graduate University. (Brown, Sarai) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 03/04 12:25 PM
ORDER granting35 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Sheri M. Thome, Esq. substituted in place and stead of Jacqueline V. Nichols. Sheri M. Thome, Esq. hereby accepts substitution as the attorneys of record for Defendant Danielle Moreggi, Ph.D. in this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/4/2025.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
35 35 motion Motion Substitute Attorney/Party Mon 03/03 5:18 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Sheri M. Thome, Esq. in for Attorney Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP by Defendant Danielle Moreggi. Responses due by 3/17/2025. (Thome, Sheri)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
34 34 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 01/16 12:13 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 1/16/2025 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler via videoconference. Pla Counsel: Robert S. Melcic, Genevieve Generaux (law clerk) ; Def Counsel: Harrison Thorne, Sarai L. Thornton, Jacqueline V. Nichols ; Pla: Jason Sadora ; Defs: Connie Veazey, Wendi Williams, Dino Ferrare, Susan Gustad, Danielle Moreggi ; Time of Hearing: 10:00 A.M.- 2:25 P.M. No settlement reached. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BCI)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
33 33 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 12/23 11:48 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.32 Stipulation for Extension of Time (first request). Confidential written evaluation statement due January 13, 2025. The Early Neutral Evaluation will remain scheduled for January 15, 2025, at 10:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/20/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
32 32 motion Stipulation Thu 12/19 5:15 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendants Fielding Graduate University, Wendi Williams, Connie Veazey and Danielle Moreggi and Plaintiff Jason Sadora to Submit Written Confidential Early Neutral Evaluation Statements re22 Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session,, by Defendants Fielding Graduate University, Wendi Williams, Connie Veazey. (Mahoney, Scott) (extend) (ene)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
31 31 notice Notice Association of Counsel Wed 10/30 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Sarai Leora Brown on behalf of Defendant Fielding Graduate University. WENDI WILLIAMS, AND CONNIE VEAZEY (Brown, Sarai)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
30 30 7 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/24 10:39 AM
ORDER granting17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/24/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
29 29 7 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/24 10:37 AM
ORDER granting16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/24/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
28 28 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Thu 10/17 11:01 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DLS)
Related: [-]
27 27 3 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 10/17 11:00 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting26 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/23/2025. Motions due by 7/23/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/22/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/17/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 10/17 8:30 AM
First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re 25 Minute Order,, by Plaintiff Jason Sadora. (Melcic, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
25 25 minord Minute Order Tue 10/15 10:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/15/2024. By Law Clerk: K. Reeves. It has come to the attention of the Court that the parties failed to file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order after the first party answered the Complaint, which is a violation of United States District Court for the District of Nevada Local Rule 26-1. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties must file a joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 14 days of the date of this Order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KBR)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
24 24 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Fri 10/11 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re17 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Harrison Michael Thorne, by Defendants Fielding Graduate University, Connie Veazey, Wendi Williams. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Mahoney, Scott)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Fri 10/11 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re16 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Jacob Marcus Axelrad, by Defendants Fielding Graduate University, Connie Veazey, Wendi Williams. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Mahoney, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
22 22 4 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Wed 10/02 2:11 PM
ORDER Scheduling Early Neutral Evaluation session - An Early Neutral Evaluation is scheduled for January 15, 2025 , at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom video conference. On January 8, 2025, parties and counsel must send-along with their confidential written evaluation statement (see section IV) - their preferred e-mail address for the Zoom invitation to judicial clerk Brenna Irving at brenna_irving@nvd.uscourts.gov . A pre-evaluation telephonic conference is set for January 14, 2025, at 3:00 p.m. This telephonic conference is for Judge Weksler and counsel only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/2/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
minord Minute Order Thu 09/19 11:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/19/2024. By Deputy Clerk: M. Johansen. Verified Petition does not comply with LR IA 11-2(a). Client signatures are missing from the petition for defendants Williams and Veazey. Counsel is advised to remedy the deficiencies and refile the petition under the event Notice of Corrected Image linking to 16 and 17 by October 21, 2024. Failure to comply will result in denial of the Petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
19 19 3 pgs notice Notice Other Wed 09/18 3:16 PM
NOTICE RE: EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION by Jason Sadora re1 Complaint,,,,. (Melcic, Robert)
Related: [-]
18 18 3 pgs misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 09/18 2:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fielding Graduate University, Connie Veazey, Wendi Williams. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mahoney, Scott)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Wed 09/18 2:12 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Harrison Michael Thorne and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Scott M. Mahoney (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7813524) by Defendants Fielding Graduate University, Connie Veazey, Wendi Williams. (Mahoney, Scott)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Wed 09/18 2:06 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Marcus Axelrad and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Scott M. Mahoney (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7813406) by Defendants Fielding Graduate University, Connie Veazey, Wendi Williams. (Mahoney, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Tue 09/17 10:21 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Harrison M Thorne and Jacob M Axelrad to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER[LINK:www.pacer.gov] to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/1/2024. (no image attached) (KMB)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
14 14 31 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/16 1:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, Defendants Fielding Graduate University, Wendi Williams, and Connie Veazey's Answer to Complaint filed by Fielding Graduate University, Connie Veazey, Wendi Williams.(Mahoney, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 09/10 10:26 AM
ORDER Granting12 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Fielding Graduate University answer due 9/16/2024; Connie Veazey answer due 9/16/2024; Wendi Williams answer due 9/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Stipulation Mon 09/09 1:33 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendants Fielding Graduate University, Wendi Williams, and Connie Veazey to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (First Request by Defendants Fielding Graduate University, Connie Veazey, Wendi Williams. (Mahoney, Scott) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 08/27 4:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Danielle Moreggi. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Nichols, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
10 10 38 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/27 4:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Danielle Moreggi. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/6/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/11/2024.(Nichols, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/22 6:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Sadora re2 Summons Issued. Connie Veazey served on 8/20/2024. (Melcic, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/22 6:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Sadora re2 Summons Issued. Wendi Williams served on 8/19/2024. (Melcic, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/22 6:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Sadora re2 Summons Issued. Fielding Graduate University served on 8/19/2024. (Melcic, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/07 11:02 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Sadora re2 Summons Issued. Danielle Moreggi served on 8/6/2024. (Melcic, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
5 5 2 pgs misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 07/25 4:44 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jason Sadora. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Melcic, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
misc QC Notice Mon 07/22 8:09 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Jason Sadora. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/29/2024. (no image attached) (KMB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
order Standing Order Mon 07/15 8:55 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/12 9:54 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fielding Graduate University, Danielle Moreggi, Connie Veazey, Wendi Williams re1 Complaint. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
1 1 47 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 07/09 7:52 PM
First COMPLAINT against Jason Sadora (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7740588) by Jason Sadora. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/19/2024. Proof of service due by 10/7/2024. (Melcic, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons Summons: Fielding,
Att: 3 2 pgs Summons Summons: Moreggi,
Att: 4 2 pgs Summons Summons: Veazey,
Att: 5 2 pgs Summons Summons: Williams,
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit Ex. 1 EM from Griffith,
Att: 7 3 pgs Exhibit Ex. 2 Timely Response Policy,
Att: 8 3 pgs Exhibit Ex. 3 EM from Veazey,
Att: 9 3 pgs Exhibit Ex. 4 EMDR at PILV,
Att: 10 7 pgs Exhibit Ex. 5 Practicum Contract,
Att: 11 4 pgs Exhibit Ex. 6 Practicum Agreement,
Att: 12 2 pgs Exhibit Ex. 7 EM from Moreggi,
Att: 13 4 pgs Exhibit Ex. 8 Referral to PPC,
Att: 14 3 pgs Exhibit Ex. 9 EM from Veazey,
Att: 15 2 pgs Exhibit Ex. 10 Demographic Data
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 07/12 9:24 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (CAH)
Related: [-]