Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Thomas L Parker
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:24-cv-02488
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 2:33 AM CST
Defendant
Arlington Community Schools Board of Education
12060 Arlington Trail
Arlington, TN 38002
Represented By
Bradley Wayne Craig
Lewis Thomason King Krieg & Waldrop
contact info
Ryan Rosenkrantz
Lewis Thomason
contact info
Valerie B. Speakman
Arlington Community Schools
contact info
Christopher W. McCarty
Lewis, Thomason, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
B. R.
Represented By
Janet Goode
contact info
Michael Franklin Braun
Michael F. Braun
contact info
Plaintiff
Ericka Ramage
Represented By
Janet Goode
contact info
Michael Franklin Braun
Michael F. Braun
contact info
Plaintiff
Gene Ramage
Represented By
Janet Goode
contact info
Michael Franklin Braun
Michael F. Braun
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, November 07, 2024
33 33 order Judgment Thu 11/07 4:08 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/7/2024. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/07 9:45 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Arlington Community Schools Board of Education. (Craig, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
31 31 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Mon 11/04 4:09 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/4/2024. (mkm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
30 30 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/29 4:25 PM
MOTION for a Status Conference proposed order submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Goode, Janet)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
29 29 notice Deficiency Notice Fri 08/30 9:10 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document28 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by Arlington Community Schools Board of Education has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: proposed Orders should emailed to the Judge in a Word format. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (mf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
28 28 motion Settlement Wed 08/28 2:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Arlington Community Schools Board of Education.(Craig, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - proposed Order
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
27 27 18 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Wed 08/07 7:59 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 8/7/24. (seh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
26 26 minutes Status Conference Fri 08/02 1:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: Status Conference held on 8/2/2024 via Teams. Janet Goode and Michael Braun appearing for the Plaintiff. Bradley Craig, Valerie Speakman, and Ryan Rosenkrantz appearing for the Defense. The Court advises the parties that it will grant the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction3 , and orders that the Defendant must modify its policy to allow Plaintiff B.R. to enroll in the upcoming school year. Order to be entered by the Court. (Court Reporter: Polly Wardlaw/Teams) (btg)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Setting Letter - Teams Fri 08/02 11:51 AM
SETTING LETTER: Status Conference set for Friday, 8/2/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Brad Gilmartin at bradley_gilmartin@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (btg)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/02 8:56 AM
NOTICE by B. R., Ericka Ramage, Gene Ramage re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Goode, Janet)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
22 22 minutes Evidentiary Hearing Wed 07/31 6:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 7/31/2024 re3 Motion. Janet Goode and Michael Braun representing the Plaintiffs. Bradley Craig, Ryan Rosenkrantz, and Valerie Speakman representing the Defendant. Opening statements by parties. Plaintiff proof/witness sworn: Ericka Ramage, Exhibits 1-7; Cross Exhibits 8-10. Defendant's oral motion to dismiss - response by Plaintiff - Oral Motion taken under advisement. Defendant's proof/witness sworn: Brad Turner, Exhibits 11-14. Court heard closing statements from parties.3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is taken under advisement. Order to enter. (Court Reporter: Polly Wardlaw)(1:14-6:17) (tlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/30 1:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arlington Community Schools Board of Education.(Rosenkrantz, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated 2 19-2024
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Application
20 20 notice Setting Letter Tue 07/30 9:27 AM
SETTING LETTER:. A Hearing on the Petition for Temporary Injunction has been set for Wednesday, July 31, 2024 at 1:00 P.M. in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker.(smm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
19 19 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 07/30 9:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: A StatusConference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conference on 7/29/2024. Michael F. Braun and Janet Goode appeared for the plaintiff(s). Bradley W. Craig, Valerie B. Speakman and Ryan Rosenkrantz appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the status of the case with the parties. A Hearing on the Petition for Temporary Injunction has been set for Wednesday, July 31, 2024 at 1:00 P.M. in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter: Catherine Phillips) (smm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/26 5:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie B. Speakman on behalf of Arlington Community Schools Board of Education (Speakman, Valerie)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Deficiency Notice Fri 07/26 3:56 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document14 Notice of Appearance filed by Arlington Community Schools Board of Education has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the pleading has a hand written signature and not the required electronic signature. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/25 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. McCarty on behalf of Arlington Community Schools Board of Education (McCarty, Christopher)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/25 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Rosenkrantz on behalf of Arlington Community Schools Board of Education (Rosenkrantz, Ryan)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/25 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie B. Speakman on behalf of Arlington Community Schools Board of Education (Speakman, Valerie)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Setting Letter - Teams Thu 07/25 9:44 AM
TEXT NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): A Status Conference has been set for Monday, July 29, 2024 at 3:30 PM. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm) Modified on 7/25/2024 to change the date. (smm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/24 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Wayne Craig on behalf of Arlington Community Schools Board of Education (Craig, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
11 11 service Certificate of Service Thu 07/18 1:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B. R., Ericka Ramage, Gene Ramage (Goode, Janet)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/18 1:41 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gene Ramage, B. R., Ericka Ramage. Arlington Community Schools Board of Education waiver sent on 7/10/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. (Goode, Janet)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 07/11 8:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Arlington Community Schools Board of Education. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Thu 07/11 8:18 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice LR 16.2 Thu 07/11 8:17 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice ADR Compliance Thu 07/11 8:17 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
5 5 utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 07/11 8:16 AM
Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/10 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Franklin Braun on behalf of B. R., Ericka Ramage, Gene Ramage (Braun, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 07/10 9:31 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Goode, Janet)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Sealed Document Wed 07/10 9:30 AM
Sealed Document Notice of Filing Under Seal .(Goode, Janet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/10 9:25 AM
COMPLAINT against Arlington Community Schools Board of Education (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4453799), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Goode, Janet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons