Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew T Schelp
Case #: 4:24-cv-00935
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Terminated:Oct 08, 2024
Case in other court:St. Louis County, 24SL-CC02540
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 2:30 AM CST
Defendant
American Family Insurance
6000 American Parkway
Madison, WI 53783
Represented By
Ann Marie Piana
American Family Insurance Company - Wisconsin
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Busiek
1785 Kay Drive
Florissant, MO 63031
Represented By
Mark D. Schoon
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case) Tue 10/08 12:45 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court Ordered Plaintiff to file a Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan in advance of a Rule 16 conference. Doc.11 . Plaintiff failed to do so. The Court then Ordered Plaintiff to show cause why the Court should not levy sanctions for his failure to file the Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Doc.12 . Plaintiff failed to file any response. Because of Plaintiff's failure to obey this Court's Orders, the Court will dismiss this action. See Hutchins v. A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., 116 F.3d 1256, 1259 (8th Cir. 1997) ("A district court has the power to dismiss a litigant's cause of action when the litigant fails to comply with the court's orders."); see also Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f)(1) (allowing for sanctions for failing to obey a scheduling or other pretrial order); id. at 37(b)(2)(A)(v) (allowing, as a sanction, for dismissal of the action in whole or in part). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/8/2024. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Mon 09/30 10:55 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff failed to comply with the Court's Order to file a Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. See Doc.11 .Accordingly,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference set in this matter for Monday, September 30, 2024, is CANCELLED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than Wednesday, October 02, 2024, Plaintiff shall show cause why the Court should not levy sanctions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(f).* Plaintiff's failure to show cause will result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f); see also id. at 37(b)(2)(A)(v). (Show Cause Response due by 10/2/2024.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on September 30, 2024. (BRP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
11 11 order Rule 16 Order Wed 09/18 3:15 PM
RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Track 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/27/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/30/2024 11:30 AM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 9/18/2024. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
10 10 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Tue 07/30 10:43 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Robert Busiek - SECOND NOTICE. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (TMT)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Fri 07/26 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant American Family Insurance Sent To: State Court - Executed(Piana, Ann)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal
Thursday, July 18, 2024
8 8 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Thu 07/18 2:19 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Robert Busiek. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (TMT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
7 7 order CJRA Order Wed 07/10 3:57 PM
CJRA ORDER (NMG). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp for all further proceedings. (HMA)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Electronic Notice - Attorney not Admitted to MOED Wed 07/10 1:30 PM
Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Mark D. Schoon. Review of case shows that Attorney Mark D. Schoon is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov] under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JWD)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY Wed 07/10 1:18 PM
Petition Related [+] Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Robert Busiek.(JWD)
Related: [-] moval/Transfer
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/10 11:21 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I..(Piana, Ann)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Wed 07/10 11:18 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., AmFam Holdings, Inc., American Family Mutual Holding Company.. (Piana, Ann)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Wed 07/10 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. Sent To: Plaintiff (Piana, Ann)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Petition Wed 07/10 11:08 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 24SL-CC02540, with receipt number AMOEDC-10702383, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I..(Piana, Ann)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A State Court File,
Att: 3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form
misc Case Opening Notification Wed 07/10 1:31 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]