New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Judge:Philip Bentley
Case #: 1:24-ap-03387
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Varaluz LLC
Represented By
David Michael Kasell
Kasell Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
LaForge Design Corp.
Represented By
LaForge Design Corp.
contact info
Defendant
Varaluzllc
Represented By
Varaluzllc
contact info
Defendant
Varaluz Lighting
Represented By
Varaluz Lighting
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Franklin Henderson
Represented By
Ronald Franklin Henderson
contact info
Defendant
Varaluz, LLC
Represented By
David Michael Kasell
Kasell Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Varaluz
Represented By
David Michael Kasell
Kasell Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Kalamata Capital Group, LLC
Represented By
Kalamata Capital Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
12 12 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 09/24 1:33 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Ariel Bouskila on behalf of Kalamata Capital Group, LLC. (White, Greg)
Related: [-]
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 09/24 1:35 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-3387 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 10, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Mailing - Blank Notice Sun 08/11 12:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] . Notice Date 08/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Thursday, August 08, 2024
10 10 misc Blank Notice (BNC) Thu 08/08 3:21 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Related [+]; with hearing to be held on 10/1/2024 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (PB) (White, Greg)
Related: [-] 6 ,8
Friday, August 02, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing - Blank Notice Sat 08/03 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] . Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
8 8 misc Blank Notice (BNC) Wed 07/31 12:08 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing re: Pretrial Conference & First Motion to Sever, Remand and Abstain Related [+]; with hearing to be held on 8/27/2024 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (PB) (White, Greg)
Related: [-] 4 ,6
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
7 7 notice Notice, Hearing Wed 07/17 1:54 PM
First Notice of Hearing on Motion to Remand Related [+] filed by Ariel Bouskila on behalf of Kalamata Capital Group, LLC. with hearing to be held on 8/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (PB) (Bouskila, Ariel)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 motion Motion, Sever Wed 07/17 10:44 AM
First Motion to Sever , Remand and Abstain filed by Ariel Bouskila on behalf of Kalamata Capital Group, LLC. (Bouskila, Ariel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ariel BOuskila In Support Of Motion to Remand et al.
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A. Agreement
Att: 3 Ex B S&C In State Court
Att: 4 Ex. C First Notice of Removal
Att: 5 Ex. D First Order to Remand
Att: 6 Ex. E Notice of Motion for Default
Att: 7 Ex. F. Bk Filing
Att: 8 Ex. Second Notice of Removal
Att: 9 Ex H motion to transfer to BK Court
Att: 10 Ex I Order Granting Transfer
Att: 11 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Friday, July 12, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Sat 07/13 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #2 )
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
4 4 misc Auto Notice, Pre-Trial Conference for a Removed Case Wed 07/10 8:42 AM
Notice of Pre-Trial Conference for a Removed Case with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (PB), (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ~Generic~ NOTICE Wed 07/10 8:39 AM
This case is related to a Chapter 11 case filed in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for Nevada before Hilary L. Barnes under the caption In re Varaluz LLC, Case No. 24-13181 (HLB) (Bankr. D. Nev.). (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Wed 07/10 7:31 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Cecelia G. Morris to Judge Philip Bentley. Judge Philip Bentley added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
1 1 notice Transfer Order Tue 07/09 4:02 PM
Adversary case 24-03387 Copy of Certified Order Transferring Case No. 1:24-cv-4875 (PKC) from the U.S. District Court, S.D.N.Y. to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, S.D.N.Y. Related [+]. Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by Kalamata Capital Group, LLC. (Pisarczyk, Gladys)
Related: [-] ceipt Number 29539832, Fee Amount $ 350.
Att: 1 Doc #2 - Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Doc # 3 Rule 7.1
Att: 3 Doc # 4 Motion
Att: 4 Doc # 5 Memo Endorsed Order