Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:24-bk-90072

Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joshua P Searcy
Case #: 9:24-ap-09004
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025

Debtor
Curtis Wade Hermes
P O Box 2095
Livingston, TX 77351
Represented By
Curtis Wade Hermes
contact info
Debtor
Jeni Delane Hermes
PO Box Box 2095
Livingston, TX 77351
Represented By
Jeni Delane Hermes
contact info
Last checked: never
Plaintiff
Thomas Michael Hudson, Jr
386 Pine Ridge Drive
Livingston, TX 77351
Represented By
Derek Johnson
Gulley Johnson, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Meghan Leigh Hudson
386 Pine Ridge Drive
Livingston, TX 77351
Represented By
Derek Johnson
Gulley Johnson, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
32 32 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/24 11:31 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Order Closing Due To Stipulated Dismissal (RE: related document(s)30 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Meghan Leigh Hudson). (srb)
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order - Matrix Tue 04/22 8:02 AM
Order Closing Due To Stipulated Dismissal Related [+]. (srb)
Related: [-] 30 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Meghan Leigh Hudson
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/22 8:04 AM
Adversary Case Number 24-9004 Closed. (srb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Case Mon 04/14 11:24 AM
Agreed Notice of Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Meghan Leigh Hudson(Johnson, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
29 29 court Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/07 11:31 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Scheduling Order Arising From Initial Management Conference. Discovery due by 9/5/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2025. (jd)
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
28 28 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/05 1:59 PM
Scheduling Order Arising From Initial Management Conference. Discovery due by 9/5/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2025. (jd)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Initial Disclosure Sun 03/02 5:42 PM
Plaintiffs' Notice of Initial Disclosure Filed by Thomas Michael Hudson Jr, Meghan Leigh Hudson (Johnson, Derek)Modified on 3/3/2025 (srb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/26 10:58 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes > Related [+]
Related: [-] 25 Defendant's Notice of Initial Disclosure Filed by Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes (RE: related document(s)23 Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. (RE: related document(s)17 Amended Complaint by Thomas Michael Hudson Jr against all plaintiffs. (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint for Objection to Discharge and Adversary Proceeding to Prove Fraud, Theft and Damages (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): filed by Plaintiff Thomas Michael Hudson). Telephonic Management Conference scheduled for 3/5/2025. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy. (jd)). (Wyatt, Donald)Modified on 2/26/2025 (tls). filed by Debtor Curtis Wade Hermes, Defendant Curtis Wade Hermes, Debtor Jeni Delane Hermes, Defendant Jeni Delane Hermes). (Wyatt, Donald
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Initial Disclosure Tue 02/25 5:29 AM
Notice of Initial Disclosure Filed by Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes Related [+]
Related: [-] 23 Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. (RE: related document(s)17 Amended Complaint by Thomas Michael Hudson Jr against all plaintiffs. (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint for Objection to Discharge and Adversary Proceeding to Prove Fraud, Theft and Damages (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): filed by Plaintiff Thomas Michael Hudson). Telephonic Management Conference scheduled for 3/5/2025. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy. (jd)). (Wyatt, Donald
Sunday, January 19, 2025
24 24 court Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/19 11:29 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 23 Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. (RE: related document(s)17 Amended Complaint by Thomas Michael Hudson Jr against all plaintiffs. (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint for Objection to Discharge and Adversary Proceeding to Prove Fraud, Theft and Damages (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): filed by Plaintiff Thomas Michael Hudson). Telephonic Management Conference scheduled for 3/5/2025. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy. (jd)). Notice Date 01/19/2025. (Admin.
Friday, January 17, 2025
23 23 3 pgs order Order and Notice of Hearing (Telephonic Management Conference) Fri 01/17 6:04 AM
Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. Related [+]
Related: [-] 17 Amended Complaint by Thomas Michael Hudson Jr against all plaintiffs. (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint for Objection to Discharge and Adversary Proceeding to Prove Fraud, Theft and Damages (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): filed by Plaintiff Thomas Michael Hudson). Telephonic Management Conference scheduled for 3/5/2025. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy. (jd
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/15 10:03 AM
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes > Related [+]. (Wyatt, Donald)
Related: [-] 21 Defendant's Answer to Plantiff's First Amended Adversary Complaint Doc#17 Filed by Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes (Wyatt, Donald)Modified on 1/13/2025 (tls). filed by Debtor Curtis Wade Hermes, Defendant Curtis Wade Hermes, Debtor Jeni Delane Hermes, Defendant Jeni Delane Hermes
Friday, January 10, 2025
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 01/10 10:54 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes (Wyatt, Donald)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 21, 2024
20 20 court Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/21 11:33 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 12/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time (RE: related document(s)18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings Filed by Donald L. Wyatt Jr. on behalf of Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes). (srb)
Thursday, December 19, 2024
19 19 order Extend Time (Adversary) Thu 12/19 2:17 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time Related [+]. (srb)
Related: [-] 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings Filed by Donald L. Wyatt Jr. on behalf of Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 12/19 2:22 PM
Curtis Wade Hermes Answer Deadline Reset for 1/10/2025; Jeni Delane Hermes Answer Deadline Reset for 1/10/2025. (srb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time (Adversary) Wed 12/18 4:17 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings Filed by Donald L. Wyatt Jr. on behalf of Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes Related [+]. (Wyatt, Donald)Modified on 12/19/2024 (tls)
Related: [-] 17 Amended Complaint by Thomas Michael Hudson Jr against all plaintiffs. (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint for Objection to Discharge and Adversary Proceeding to Prove Fraud, Theft and Damages (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): filed by Derek Johnson on behalf of Thomas Michael Hudson Jr, Meghan Leigh Hudson against Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C # 4 Cover Sheet # 5 Summons # 6 Summons) (Johnson, Derek) Modified on 7/10/2024 (md). filed by Plaintiff Thomas Michael Hudson, Plaintiff Meghan Leigh Hudson). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit) filed by Plaintiff Thomas Michael Hudson
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 05, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/05 7:39 PM
Amended Complaint by Thomas Michael Hudson Jr against all plaintiffs. Related [+]. (Johnson, Derek)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint for Objection to Discharge and Adversary Proceeding to Prove Fraud, Theft and Damages (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): filed by Derek Johnson on behalf of Thomas Michael Hudson Jr, Meghan Leigh Hudson against Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C # 4 Cover Sheet # 5 Summons # 6 Summons) (Johnson, Derek) Modified on 7/10/2024 (md). filed by Plaintiff Thomas Michael Hudson, Plaintiff Meghan Leigh Hudson
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Saturday, November 23, 2024
16 16 court Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/23 11:34 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 11/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Granting In Part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s)5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Objection to Jurisdiction, Objection to Standing and, Alternatively, Motion to Strike and For a More Definite Statement Defendant Curtis Wade Hermes, Defendant Jeni Delane Hermes). (md)
Thursday, November 21, 2024
15 15 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 11/21 11:02 AM
Order Granting In Part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Related [+]. (md)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Objection to Jurisdiction, Objection to Standing and, Alternatively, Motion to Strike and For a More Definite Statement Defendant Curtis Wade Hermes, Defendant Jeni Delane Hermes
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
court Hearing Held [Adversary] Wed 11/20 1:30 PM
Hearing Held: Motion Granted in Part, Denied in Part; Court to Execute Order. Related [+]. . (md)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Objection to Jurisdiction, Objection to Standing and, Alternatively, Motion to Strike and For a More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Curtis Wade Hermes, Defendant Jeni Delane Hermes
Thursday, October 31, 2024
14 14 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/31 11:35 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Virtual Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Objection to Jurisdiction, Objection to Standing and, Alternatively, Motion to Strike and For a More Definite Statement Filed by Debtor Curtis Wade Hermes, Defendant Curtis Wade Hermes, Debtor Jeni Delane Hermes, Defendant Jeni Delane Hermes).. Virtual Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2024 at 09:30 AM at Virtual Hearing Location (TYL Nov 20). (jd)
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
13 13 court Hearing Set - With Form Tue 10/29 8:41 AM
Virtual Hearing Set Related [+]. . Virtual Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2024 at 09:30 AM at Virtual Hearing Location (TYL Nov 20). (jd)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Objection to Jurisdiction, Objection to Standing and, Alternatively, Motion to Strike and For a More Definite Statement Filed by Debtor Curtis Wade Hermes, Defendant Curtis Wade Hermes, Debtor Jeni Delane Hermes, Defendant Jeni Delane Hermes
Monday, October 14, 2024
12 12 answer Objection Mon 10/14 9:27 PM
Objection Filed by Thomas Michael Hudson Jr Related [+]. (Johnson, Derek)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Objection to Jurisdiction, Objection to Standing and, Alternatively, Motion to Strike and For a More Definite Statement Filed by Donald L. Wyatt Jr. on behalf of Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Wyatt, Donald) Modified on 9/10/2024 (srb). filed by Debtor Curtis Wade Hermes, Defendant Curtis Wade Hermes, Debtor Jeni Delane Hermes, Defendant Jeni Delane Hermes
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
11 11 court Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/09 11:34 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting Second Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time (RE: related document(s)9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Derek Johnson on behalf of Thomas Michael Hudson Jr). (tls)
Monday, October 07, 2024
10 10 order Extend Time (Adversary) Mon 10/07 2:17 PM
Order Granting Second Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time Related [+]. (tls)
Related: [-] 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Derek Johnson on behalf of Thomas Michael Hudson Jr
9 9 motion Extension of Time (Adversary) Mon 10/07 9:01 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Derek Johnson on behalf of Thomas Michael Hudson Jr Related [+]. (Johnson, Derek)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Objection to Jurisdiction, Objection to Standing and, Alternatively, Motion to Strike and For a More Definite Statement Filed by Donald L. Wyatt Jr. on behalf of Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Wyatt, Donald) Modified on 9/10/2024 (srb). filed by Debtor Curtis Wade Hermes, Defendant Curtis Wade Hermes, Debtor Jeni Delane Hermes, Defendant Jeni Delane Hermes
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, September 22, 2024
8 8 court Certificate of Mailing Sun 09/22 11:28 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (RE: related document(s)6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Derek Johnson on behalf of Thomas Michael Hudson Jr (RE: related document(s)5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Objection to Jurisdiction, Objection to Standing and, Alternatively, Motion to Strike and For a More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiff Thomas Michael Hudson). (md)). Notice Date 09/22/2024. (Admin.)
Friday, September 20, 2024
7 7 order Extend Time (Adversary) Fri 09/20 10:07 AM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Derek Johnson on behalf of Thomas Michael Hudson Jr (RE: related document(s)5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Objection to Jurisdiction, Objection to Standing and, Alternatively, Motion to Strike and For a More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiff Thomas Michael Hudson). (md)
Thursday, September 19, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time (Adversary) Thu 09/19 4:16 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Derek Johnson on behalf of Thomas Michael Hudson Jr Related [+]. (Johnson, Derek)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Objection to Jurisdiction, Objection to Standing and, Alternatively, Motion to Strike and For a More Definite Statement Filed by Donald L. Wyatt Jr. on behalf of Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Wyatt, Donald) Modified on 9/10/2024 (srb). filed by Debtor Curtis Wade Hermes, Defendant Curtis Wade Hermes, Debtor Jeni Delane Hermes, Defendant Jeni Delane Hermes
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 09, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 09/09 12:00 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (12(b)(6)) Filed by Donald L. Wyatt Jr. on behalf of Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes (Wyatt, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 26, 2024
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 07/26 9:57 AM
Curtis Wade Hermes Answer Deadline Reset for 9/9/2024; Jeni Delane Hermes Answer Deadline Reset for 9/9/2024. (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Tue 07/23 3:18 PM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: DONALD WYATT) Filed by Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes (Wyatt, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/12 8:49 AM
Certificate of Service Waiver of Service of Summons Filed by Meghan Leigh Hudson, Thomas Michael Hudson Jr (Johnson, Derek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
court POrder Note Thu 07/11 12:09 AM
Related: [-]
court POrder Note Thu 07/11 12:09 AM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 07/10 1:31 PM
Summons Issued on Curtis Wade Hermes and Jeni Delane Hermes and electronically transmitted back to the filer to be served upon the relevant parties. Date Issued 7/10/2024, Answer Due 8/9/2024 (md)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint [COURT USE ONLY] Tue 07/09 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): filed by Derek Johnson on behalf of Thomas Michael Hudson Jr, Meghan Leigh Hudson against Curtis Wade Hermes, Jeni Delane Hermes. (Johnson, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C
Att: 4 Cover Sheet
Att: 5 Summons
Att: 6 Summons