Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jacqueline P Cox
Case #: 1:24-bk-10008
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Mar 04, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Crusade Burger Bar, LLC
209 S. Bridge St.
Yorkville, IL 60560
Represented By
Konstantine T. Sparagis
Law Offices Of Konstantine Sparagis P C
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
116 116 trustee Chapter 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution D-consenual plan consummated, fee award recd Tue 04/29 11:20 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $6,372.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 10 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $150141.00, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $904585.93, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $904585.93 Filed by Trustee Janice H Seyedin. (Seyedin, Janice)
Related: [-]
115 115 notice Notice of Substantial Consummation Tue 04/29 10:50 AM
Notice of Substantial Consummation with Certificate of Service. Filed by Konstantine T. Sparagis on behalf of Crusade Burger Bar, LLC Related [+]. (Sparagis, Konstantine)
Related: [-] 77 Chapter 11 Plan/Amended Plan
Thursday, April 24, 2025
114 114 misc Monthly Operating Report for Small Business (Form 425C) Thu 04/24 2:47 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Small Business (Form 425C) for the Filing Period Ending 02/28/2025 Filed by Konstantine T. Sparagis on behalf of Crusade Burger Bar, LLC. (Sparagis, Konstantine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Bank Statements
Att: 2 Exhibit B - P&L
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Exhibits to MOR