Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jonathan D Greenberg
Case #: 4:24-cv-01161
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Terminated:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 3:29 AM EST
Defendant
Brookfield Township
Represented By
Thomas N. Spyker
Reminger Co. - Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Brookfield Township Police Department
Represented By
Thomas N. Spyker
Reminger Co. - Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Officer Cody Dean
Represented By
Thomas N. Spyker
Reminger Co. - Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Entity Does
Defendant
Jane Does
Defendant
John Does
Plaintiff
Jennifer Miller
5667 Warren-Sharon Rd.
Brookfield, OH 44403
Represented By
Rhys B. Cartwright-Jones
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
20 20 minutes ~Util - Terminate Referral Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/06 2:19 PM
Order Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Related [+]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 5/6/25. (D,Ky)
Related: [-] .19
Monday, May 05, 2025
19 19 notice Stipulation (atty event) Mon 05/05 1:35 PM
Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jennifer Miller. (Cartwright-Jones, Rhys)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
18 18 motion Extension (other) Mon 04/21 12:14 PM
Joint Motion for extension of time until May 5, 2025 to File Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Miller. (Cartwright-Jones, Rhys)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Mon 04/21 1:03 PM
Order [non-document] granting18 Joint Motion for extension of time until May 5, 2025 to File Dismissal. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 4/21/25.(D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
order Minute Order _ Mediation Conference Fri 03/07 9:19 AM
Minutes of Proceedings and Order [non-document]: On March 6, 2025, Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd conducted a mediation. Plaintiff Jennifer Miller attended and was represented by Rhys B. Cartwright-Jones; Defendants Brookfield Township, et al., party representative Kimberly Link attended and was represented by Thomas N. Spyker. The parties reached an agreement in principle and have settled all matters in dispute. Accordingly, the parties will finalize and execute a settlement agreement and will submit a stipulated entry dismissing all claims with prejudice within 45 days of the date of this entry. It is so ordered. Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 3/6/2025. (Court Reporter: N/A. Time: 6.25 hours). (D,JJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
minutes Telephone Conference MJ Wed 03/05 3:26 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Ex Parte Telephone Conferences held on 3/5/2025. Attorney Rhys Cartwright-Jones participated on behalf of plaintiff; Attorney Thomas Spyker participated on behalf of defendants. The court and counsel separately discussed background information and issues in order to prepare for the upcoming Mediation Conference set for 3/6/2025 by video conference (Cleveland). Instructions for participating via video have been emailed to the parties separately. (Court Reporter: N/A). (S,DA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Fri 02/21 11:50 AM
IMPORTANT Notice [non-document]: Ex parte Telephone Conference with counsel for Plaintiff set for 3/5/2025 at 11:00 AM to be held before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Ex parte Telephone Conference with counsel for Defendants set for 3/5/2025 at 11:30 AM to be held before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel of record separately. Related document(s)17 . (D,JJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
17 17 6 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 8:47 AM
Order Setting Mediation Conference : Mediation conference to be held on 3/6/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. The mediation conference will be held by video conference. Instructions for participating via video will be emailed to the parties separately. Mediation statements are due on or before 2/28/2025. Counsel shall contact the magistrate judge's courtroom deputy via email to schedule an ex-parte telephone conference. See Order for additional information and requirements. Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 2/18/2024. (D,JJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Case Referred to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Fri 02/14 12:27 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. A telephonic status conference was held on February 14, 2025 with counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants. With the agreement of the parties, and pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and Local Rule 72.2, this matter is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Reuben Sheperd for mediation. The Mediation shall occur within 30-days of this order, in accordance with Magistrate Judge Sheperd's calendar. Time: 15 minutes. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
16 16 minutes Status Conference Thu 12/12 10:35 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. A telephone status conference was conducted on December 12, 2024. This case is set for a telephone status conference on February 14, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall use the call-in information previously provided to participate in the conference. Time: 20 minutes. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
15 15 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Wed 10/23 1:15 PM
Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 11/29/2024. Discovery due by 3/31/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2025. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/12/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 10/23/24. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Case Management Conference Wed 10/23 1:12 PM
Minutes of proceedings A case management conference was conducted on October 23, 2024. Case management deadlines were established as set forth in a separate Order issued this date. This case is set for a telephone status conference on December 12, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall use the call-in information previously provided to participate in the conference. Time: 25 minutes. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
13 13 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Mon 10/21 1:22 PM
Supplement to Case Management Conference Scheduling Order, Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - Anticipated Fees and Costs Report, filed by Jennifer Miller. Related document(s)11 ,12 . (Cartwright-Jones, Rhys)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
12 12 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Fri 10/18 11:23 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Brookfield Township, Brookfield Township Police Department, Cody Dean. (Spyker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
11 11 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Wed 10/09 11:20 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with telephonic case management conference to be held on 10/23/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 10/9/24. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Report of Parties Planning Meeting,
Att: 2 Attachment 2 - Local Rule 30.1
order Order Wed 10/09 11:21 AM
Order [non-document] Counsel and the parties are hereby advised that this Court will not accept ex parte telephone calls to Chambers regarding substantive issues in pending cases. The Court speaks through its docket. While it may be appropriate to call Chambers regarding routine, non-substantive matters (such as requests for the dial in information for an upcoming status conference, etc.), it is not appropriate under any circumstances for counsel to call Chambers ex parte for "guidance" or "clarification" regarding substantive matters, including matters relating to existing case management deadlines, requests to file briefing, and/or inquiries regarding the "status" of pending motions. All questions regarding substantive matters in pending cases must be filed as a motion on the public docket, with the following exception. If a dispute arises during a deposition that requires this Court's immediate assistance, the parties may call Chambers for assistance, but must do so jointly (and not on an ex parte basis). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 10/9/24. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for order Wed 10/09 11:39 AM
Order [non-document] The Court received the parties' Joint Motion for Permission to Appear Virtually for Scheduled Proceedings (Doc. No.9 ) and ORDERS as follows. The Joint Motion for Permission to Appear Virtually for Scheduled Proceedings is DENIED without prejudice, as the requested relief is premature. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 10/9/24.(D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
10 10 order Consent to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/08 12:03 PM
Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg for further proceedings. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on October 8, 2024. (Y,A)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs motion Order Tue 10/08 10:32 AM
Joint Motion for Permission to Appear Virtually for Scheduled Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Miller. Related document(s)7 . (Cartwright-Jones, Rhys)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 10/08 10:30 AM
Consent to Magistrate's Jurisdiction filed by All Parties. (Cartwright-Jones, Rhys)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 10/08 12:30 PM
Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg assigned to case pursuant to consent. Judge J. Philip Calabrese terminated. Related document10 . (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
7 7 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Fri 09/20 11:24 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on October 15, 2024 at 4:00 p.m. in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on September 20, 2024.(Y,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 26 Report of Parties
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/13 8:25 AM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Brookfield Township, Brookfield Township Police Department, Cody Dean. (Spyker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
5 5 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 07/15 8:32 AM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Brookfield Township, Brookfield Township Police Department, and Officer Cody Dean. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
4 4 oth_doc Praecipe Fri 07/12 1:35 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons as to Brookfield Township, Officer Cody Dean, and Brookfield Police Department filed by Jennifer Miller. Related document(s)2 ,1 .(Cartwright-Jones, Rhys)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons as to Brookfield Township,
Att: 2 Summons Summons as to Cody Dean,
Att: 3 Summons Summons as to Brookfield PD
Thursday, July 11, 2024
2 2 oth_doc Jury Demand (atty event) Thu 07/11 7:36 AM
Jury Demand filed by Jennifer Miller. (Cartwright-Jones, Rhys)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
3 3 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Thu 07/11 10:37 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No Summons Issued or Presented at time of filing. (D,Th)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/10 4:01 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Brookfield Township , Brookfield Township Police Department, Officer Cody Dean, John Does (1-5), Jane Does (1-5) and Entity Jones (1-5). Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number BOHNDC-12640005. Filed by Jennifer Miller.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet (page 2. missing) (Cartwright-Jones, Rhys) Modified on 7/10/2024 (D,Ju)
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 07/11 9:33 AM
Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (D,Th)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 07/11 9:35 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (D,Th)
Related: [-]