Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Leo T Sorokin
Case #: 1:24-cv-11773
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 3:29 AM EST
Cross Claimant
Bonnie Watman
Represented By
Michael B. Feinman
Feinman Law Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Jeanne Watman
Cross Defendant
Kyle Watman
Cross Defendant
Shane Andrew Watman
Defendant
Bonnie Watman
24 Dearborn Road
Sanbornton, NH 03269
Represented By
Michael B. Feinman
Feinman Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Jeanne Watman
80 Powow Street
Amesbury, MA 01913
Defendant
Kyle Watman
80 Powow Street
Amesbury, MA 01913
Defendant
Shane Andrew Watman
80 Powow Street
Amesbury, MA 01913
Plaintiff
Deborah Cotter
Administrator of the Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 35 Trust Funds 25 Colgate Road
Roslindale, MA 02131
Represented By
Melissa A. Brennan
Feinberg, Dumont & Brennan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
28 28 misc Mail Returned Wed 09/25 2:06 PM
Mail sent to Kyle Watman re 15 Copy Mailed, Returned as Undeliverable. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Mail Returned Wed 09/25 2:03 PM
Mail sent to Shane Watman re 15 Copy Mailed, Returned as Undeliverable. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Mail Returned Wed 09/25 2:00 PM
Mail sent to Kyle Watman re 18 Copy Mailed, Returned as Undeliverable. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Mail Returned Wed 09/25 1:58 PM
Mail sent to Jeanne Watman re 18 Copy Mailed, Returned as Undeliverable. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Mail Returned Wed 09/25 1:55 PM
Mail sent to Shane Watman re 18 Copy Mailed, Returned as Undeliverable. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Mail Returned Wed 09/25 1:53 PM
Mail sent to Jeanne Watman re 15 Copy Mailed, Returned as Undeliverable. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
22 22 order Judgment - Default Tue 09/24 9:45 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered: FINAL JUDGMENT as to Bonnie Watman. (Attachments #1 Appendix) (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 09/24 9:32 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING 19 Motion for Default Judgment as to Kyle Watman, Shane Watman and Jeanne Watman ALLOWING 20 Motion for Default Judgment as to Jeanne Watman, Kyle Watman and Shane Watman (Cooke, Melonie) Modified on 9/24/2024 to update docket text. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
20 20 motion Default Judgment Mon 09/23 4:04 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jeanne Watman, Kyle Watman and Shane Watman by Deborah Cotter.(Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment
Friday, September 06, 2024
19 19 motion Default Judgment Fri 09/06 11:53 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Kyle Watman, Shane Watman and Jeanne Watman by Bonnie Watman.(Feinman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, August 22, 2024
18 18 misc Copy Mailed Thu 08/22 4:06 PM
Copy re17 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default mailed to : Shane Watman certified mail number: 7022 0410 0001 7382 8573 Kyle Watman certified mail number: 7022 0410 0001 7382 8580 Jeanne Watman certified mail number: 7022 0410 0001 7382 8597 on 08/22/2024. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Notice of Entry of Default by Clerk Thu 08/22 3:36 PM
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jeanne Watman, Kyle Watman, Shane Andrew Watman (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order
16 16 misc Request for notice of default Thu 08/22 12:19 PM
Request for notice of default by Deborah Cotter . (Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Copy Mailed Thu 08/22 11:31 AM
Copy re13 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default,14 Standing Order re motions for default judgment mailed to: Shane Watman certified mail number: 7022 0410 0001 7382 8559 Kyle Watman certified mail number: 7022 0410 0001 7382 8566 Jeanne Watman certified mail number: 7022 0410 0001 7382 8542 on 08/22/2024. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Standing order on motions for default judgment Thu 08/22 11:23 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered: STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Notice of Entry of Default by Clerk Thu 08/22 11:20 AM
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jeanne Watman, Kyle Watman, Shane Andrew Watman (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
12 12 misc Request for notice of default Wed 08/21 11:27 AM
Request for notice of default by Bonnie Watman . (Feinman, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Request for notice of default Wed 08/21 11:26 AM
Request for notice of default by Bonnie Watman . (Feinman, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Request for notice of default Wed 08/21 11:26 AM
Request for notice of default by Bonnie Watman . (Feinman, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Request for notice of default Wed 08/21 11:25 AM
Request for notice of default by Bonnie Watman . (Feinman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/05 3:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Shane Andrew Watman served on 7/30/2024, answer due 8/20/2024. (Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/05 3:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Kyle Watman served on 7/30/2024, answer due 8/20/2024. (Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/05 3:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Jeanne Watman served on 7/30/2024, answer due 8/20/2024. (Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/30 12:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Bonnie Watman served on 7/24/2024, answer due 8/14/2024. (Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Mon 07/29 2:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Jeanne Watman, Kyle Watman, Shane Andrew Watman by Bonnie Watman.(Feinman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 07/11 11:10 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 07/11 10:22 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/10 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Shane Andrew Watman, Kyle Watman, Bonnie Watman, Jeanne Watman Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10500588 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Deborah Cotter, Administrator of the Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 35 Trust Funds.(Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Category Form