Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:24-cv-00803
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
VLSI Technology LLC
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Alan J. Heinrich
contact info
Morgan Chu
contact info
Amy Proctor
contact info
Benjamin W. Hattenbach
contact info
Charlotte J. Wen
contact info
Plaintiff
Intel Corporation
Represented By
Steven J. Horn
contact info
Thomas G. Saunders
contact info
Dominic E. Massa
contact info
Mary V. Sooter
contact info
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jeremy A. Tigan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Joshua L. Stern
contact info
William F. Lee
contact info
Joseph J. Mueller
contact info
Rachel Bier
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, December 12, 2024
50 50 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Case Stayed Thu 12/12 2:35 PM
SO ORDERED, re49 Proposed Order Staying Case, filed by Intel Corporation. Setting Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/2/2025. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/12/2024. (kmd)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 12/12 11:58 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mary V. Sooter, Thomas G. Saunders, Joseph J. Mueller, Dominic E. Massa, William F. Lee, Steven J. Horn, Rachel Bier for Intel Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
49 49 misc Proposed Order Wed 12/11 5:02 PM
Joint PROPOSED ORDER -- [Proposed] Order Staying Case -- re Oral Argument by Intel Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
48 48 misc - Transcript Thu 12/05 6:30 PM
Official Transcript of Motions Hearing held on 12/04/24 before Judge Colm Connolly. Court Reporter Deanna Warner, Email: deanna_warner@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/26/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2025. (Warner, Deanna)
Related: [-]