Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:24-cv-03024
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Terminated:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 3:52 AM EST
Defendant
Infosys McCamish Systems, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Williams Thorpe
Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP
contact info
Ronan P. Doherty
Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP
contact info
Amanda Bradley
Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Deana Lindley
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Kopelowitz Ostrow PA
contact info
MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Gibson Consumer Law Group, LLC
contact info
Gary M. Klinger
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 08/13 12:59 PM
Clerk's Notation re12 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion to Stay Thu 08/08 10:52 AM
ORDER granting 26 Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:24-cv-00995-JPB; granting13 Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying as moot14 Motion to Stay in case 1:24-cv-03024-JPB; granting8 Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying as moot9 Motion to Stay in case 1:24-cv-03124-JPB; granting15 Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying as moot 16 Motion to Stay in case 1:24-cv-03252-JPB; granting (13) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying as moot14 Motion to Stay in case 1:24-cv-03302-JPB. This order does not modify the preliminary schedule in McNally v. Infosys McCamish Sys., Inc., No. 1:24-CV-00995-JPB (N.D. Ga. filed Mar. 6, 2024), which schedule will continue to govern the consolidated cases. See McNally, ECF Nos. 19-1, 21. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/7/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stay Wed 08/07 3:08 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Infosys McCamish Systems, LLC.(Thorpe, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 08/07 3:07 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Infosys McCamish Systems, LLC.(Thorpe, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/07 3:06 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Infosys McCamish Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Infosys Limited, Corporate Parent Infosys BPM Limited for Infosys McCamish Systems, LLC. (Thorpe, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Williams Thorpe on behalf of Infosys McCamish Systems, LLC (Thorpe, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Bradley on behalf of Infosys McCamish Systems, LLC (Bradley, Amanda)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ronan P. Doherty on behalf of Infosys McCamish Systems, LLC (Doherty, Ronan)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 08/08 11:17 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (gww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/31 1:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deana Lindley. Infosys McCamish Systems, LLC waiver mailed on 7/11/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. (Gibson, MaryBeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 07/18 4:35 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:7 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary M. Klinger Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13579674).. Attorney Gary M. Klinger added appearing on behalf of Deana Lindley. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/18 5:25 PM
ORDER granting7 Application for Admission of of Gary M. Klinger Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on July 18, 2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
7 7 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/17 7:38 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Gary M. Klinger Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13579674).by Deana Lindley. (Gibson, MaryBeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Tue 07/16 3:09 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Ostrow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13573324). Attorney Jeffrey M. Ostrow added appearing on behalf of Deana Lindley. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/16 3:27 PM
ORDER granting6 Application for Admission of of Jeffrey Ostrow Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on July 16, 2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
6 6 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/15 4:52 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Ostrow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13573324).by Deana Lindley. (Gibson, MaryBeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
5 5 30+ pgs order Order Thu 07/11 11:59 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on July 11, 2024. (jkl)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Letter re:83.1 Thu 07/11 8:32 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Jeffrey M. Ostrow. Clerk to follow-up by 7/22/2024. (esr)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Letter re:83.1 Thu 07/11 8:31 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Gary M. Klinger. Clerk to follow-up by 7/22/2024. (esr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 07/10 6:34 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Infosys McCamish Systems, LLC. (tht)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
1 1 83 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 07/10 6:33 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Deana Lindley. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13556859)(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet