California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01397
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jul 11, 2024 12:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Jennifer Roxana Morales (1)
Represented By
Benjamin J. Cheeks
Law Offices Of Benjamin J. Cheeks, A.P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Antoinette Jeena Peoples (2)
Represented By
Heather L. Beugen
Law Office Of Heather L. Beugen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Steven Lee
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Mar 17 2025
JUDGMENT as to Antoinette Jeena Peoples (2). Count(s) 1, Custody of the BOP for a term of Time Served as of 4/7/2025 at 8:00 am. Supervised Release for a term of 3 years. $100 assessment imposed. No fine. Signed by Judge John A. Houston. (aef)
GPO Apr 18 2025
JUDGMENT as to Jennifer Roxana Morales (1). Count(s) 1, Custody of the BOP for a term of 27 months. Supervised Release for a term of 3 years. $100 assessment imposed. No fine. Signed by Judge John A. Houston. (aef)

Docket last updated: 07/11/2024 1:23 AM PDT
Sunday, June 09, 2024
Arrest of Jennifer Roxana Morales, Antoinette Jeena Peoples. (no document attached) (mef) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jennifer Roxana Morales, Antoinette Jeena Peoples.(mef) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jennifer Roxana Morales, Antoinette Jeena Peoples: Initial Appearance set for 6/10/2024 before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. (no document attached) (gac) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Steven Lee appearing for USA. (Lee, Steven)Attorney Steven Lee added to party USA(pty:pla)(axc1). [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
4 4 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Jennifer Roxana Morales. Report prepared by: Marcia Flores. (Document applicable to USA, Jennifer Roxana Morales.) (Flores, M.) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
5 5 AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Initial Appearance as to Jennifer Roxana Morales, Antoinette Jeena Peoples held on 6/10/2024. Financial affidavits submitted and approved. Court Appointed Attorney CJA Benjamin J. Cheeks (n/a) for Jennifer Roxana Morales and CJA Attorney Heather L. Beugen (n/a) for Antoinette Jeena Peoples. Bond set as to Jennifer Roxana Morales (1) $20,000 + 2 FRRA (1 related); Antoinette Jeena Peoples (2) $20,000 + 2 FRRA (1 related). Both defendants ordered into inpatient treatment direct from custody. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/18/2024 at 9:30AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara L. Major. Arraignment set for 7/9/2024 at 9:30AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara L. Major. Rule 5 advisal provided. (CD# 6/10/2024 BLM 202-236). (Plaintiff Attorney Kelvin Chew, AUSA s/a). (Defendant Attorney Matthew Luevano, FD). (dls) Modified on 6/18/2024 to correct arr date(nbp). [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Jennifer Roxana Morales, Antoinette Jeena Peoples (no document attached) (dls) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY ORDER as to Jennifer Roxana Morales: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/10/2024. (dls) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
8 8 BRADY ORDER as to Antoinette Jeena Peoples: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/10/2024. (dls) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Jennifer Roxana Morales (1) $20,000 P/S secured by 2 FRA's (1 must be related).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/10/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jennifer Roxana Morales (cxl) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Antoinette Jeena Peoples (cxl) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Antoinette Jeena Peoples (2) $20,000 P/S secured by 2 FRA's (1 related).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/10/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
13 13 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Jennifer Roxana Morales (Cheeks, Benjamin) (axi). [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): Preliminary Hearing is vacated re13 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 (no document attached) (ave) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
15 15 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Antoinette Jeena Peoples. Report prepared by: M. Ruiz. (Document applicable to USA, Antoinette Jeena Peoples.) (Gomez, B.) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
16 16 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Antoinette Jeena Peoples (Beugen, Heather) (axi). [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): Preliminary Hearing is vacated re16 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 (no document attached) (ave) [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
18 18 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Lee, Steven) (axi). [3:24-mj-02229-BLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
19 19 INFORMATION as to Jennifer Roxana Morales (1) count 1, Antoinette Jeena Peoples (2) count 1. (ave)
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Arraignment on Information as to Jennifer Roxana Morales (1) Count 1 and Antoinette Jeena Peoples (2) Count 1 held on 7/9/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 8/7/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge John A. Houston. (CD# 7/9/2024 BLM 24: 9:35 - 9:50). (Plaintiff Attorney Evangeline Dech, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Heather Beugen CJA and Benjamin J. Cheeks, CJA). (ave)
Related: [-]