Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Abizer Zanzi
Referred: Abizer Zanzi
Case #: 2:24-cv-00239
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1346 Tort Claim
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2025 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
The United States Postal Service
Represented By
Antonio Lee - AUSA
Us Attorney'S Office - Ham/in
contact info
Defendant
The United States of America
Represented By
Antonio Lee - AUSA
Us Attorney'S Office - Ham/in
contact info
Defendant
Richard McDevitt
Vouga & Associates LLC 2252 W 93rd Avenue
Merrillville, IN 46410
Plaintiff
Alison Gillard
Represented By
Arman Garo Sarkisian
Sarkisian Sarkisian & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
21 21 minutes Telephone Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 04/22 11:01 AM
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/22/2025 before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Pla appeared by atty Arman Sarkisian. Dft's appeared by atty Antonio Lee. Discussion heard on the record regarding case status and discovery. Parties request an extension of time to complete fact discovery. The Court GRANTS the oral motion made on the record [DE 20] and extends the Fact Discovery deadline to 12/19/2025. The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Status Conference on 9/17/2025 09:30 AM CST before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Parties to file a joint status report regarding status of discovery, including discovery completed to date and anticipated discovery remaining, if any, and status of mediation or settlement discussions to date by 9/10/2025. To join the hearing, please call 833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 2255 6691; Push # to skip Participant ID; enter Passcode: 252788 when prompted. (FTR.) (shk)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 04/22 10:54 AM
JOINT ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. **Requested on the record. (shk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
19 19 misc Status Report Tue 04/15 3:12 PM
STATUS REPORT of the Parties by Alison Gillard. (Sarkisian, Arman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
18 18 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Thu 12/19 1:13 PM
RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 12/19/2024 before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Pla appeared by atty Arman Sarkisian. Dft appeared by atty Antonio Lee, AUSA. As discussed on the record, the Court now sets the following case management deadlines: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 1/3/2025. Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 3/7/2025. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 6/27/2025. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 8/29/2025. Rule 26(e)(2) supplements are due by 10/17/2025. Fact Discovery deadline is 5/30/2025. Deadline for Completion of Discovery is 12/19/2025. The parties state on the record they have chosen Richard McDevitt as mediator. Mediation to be completed by 12/19/2025. The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Status Conference on 4/22/2025 09:30 AM CST before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Parties to file a joint status report regarding status of discovery, including discovery completed to date and anticipated discovery remaining, if any, and status of mediation or settlement discussions to date by 4/15/2025. To join the hearing, please call 833-568-8864, Meeting ID: 161 2255 6691#, Push # to skip, Participant ID Passcode: 252788#. (Order attached) (FTR.) (shk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Tue 12/10 11:42 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sarkisian, Arman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Full Consent to Magistrate Judge - Standard Tue 12/03 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to the most recent General Order regarding civil case assignment from Judge Gretchen S Lund to Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 11/15 3:28 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2024 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Parties are instructed to call 833-568-8864 and enter Meeting ID 161 2255 6691#, Participant ID Passcode252788#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 11/15/2024. (shk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
14 14 11 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 11/06 11:08 AM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by The United States of America.(Lee - AUSA, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
13 13 4 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/05 12:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiff against The United States of America, filed by Alison Gillard.(Sarkisian, Arman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/30 5:19 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Pltf Complaint. Response to be filed by 11/8/2024 Text entry by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 10/30/2024. (shk)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Wed 10/30 5:07 PM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 10/30/2024. (shk)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 10/30 5:20 PM
Reset Answer Deadline: Answer due on or before 11/8/2024 (shk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/25 2:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to2 Amended Complaint Unopposed by Defendants The United States Postal Service, The United States of America. (Lee - AUSA, Antonio)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/25 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio Lee - AUSA on behalf of All Defendants (Lee - AUSA, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 09/10 9:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed per7 Affidavit of Service. The United States of America served on 8/26/2024, answer due 10/25/2024. (sej)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/09 2:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons to The United States of America served on US Attorney's Office N.D. of Indiana on 08/26/2024, filed by Alison Gillard.(Sarkisian, Arman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certified Green Card to Defendant RETURNED
Thursday, August 22, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 08/22 11:39 AM
Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (kmt)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed Summons Thu 08/22 9:50 AM
Proposed Summons filed by Alison Gillard. (Sarkisian, Arman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/20 12:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint For Damages served on Defendant USA and Defendant USPS on July 25, 2024, filed by Alison Gillard.(Sarkisian, Arman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certified Green Cards to Defendants RETURNED
Friday, July 12, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 07/12 12:13 PM
Summons Issued as to The United States Postal Service, The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (nae)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 07/12 11:51 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Gretchen S Lund and Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi added. (nae)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
2 2 5 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/11 10:41 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES WITH EXHIBIT A against The United States Postal Service, The United States of America, filed by Alison Gillard.(Sarkisian, Arman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to 1st Amended Complaint
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/11 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against The United States Postal Service, The United States of America( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5623256.), filed by Alison Gillard.(Sarkisian, Arman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons to USPS,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Summons to USA