New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Peggy Kuo
Referred: Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:24-cv-04811
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:688 Jones Act
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2024
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2025 3:22 AM EST
Defendant
City of New York
Represented By
David Lee Depugh
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Grym
Represented By
Bernard D. Friedman
Friedman, James & Buchsbaum LLP
contact info
Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Friedman, James & Buchsbaum LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/09 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John P. James on behalf of Joseph Grym (aty to be noticed) (James, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines Tue 04/08 5:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. A Settlement Conference was held on April 8, 2025. Bernard Friedman, Esq. and John James, Esq. appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Plaintiff Joseph Grym was also present. David Depugh, Esq. appeared on behalf of the defendant. Attorney James is directed to file a notice of appearance forthwith. The parties reached an agreement. (RO)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/08 5:07 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court dismisses this case with leave to reopen on or before May 23, 2025 , if the parties' settlement is not finalized by then. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/8/2025. (RO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
order Scheduling Order Thu 04/03 9:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to the Court's unavailability, the settlement conference scheduled for April 8, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. will now begin at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/3/2025. (RO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 02/13 11:08 AM
Letter by Joseph Grym, STATUS REPORT by Joseph Grym (Friedman, Bernard) Modified on 2/13/2025 to add motion for extension of time to complete discovery (RO)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 02/13 4:14 PM
ORDER: The Court construes the Letter at14 to include a motion for extension of time to complete expert discovery and grants the motion. The deadline for the parties to file a joint status report certifying the close of all discovery is extended to May 23, 2025. The deadline for the parties to file a joint Proposed Pretrial Order remains May 30, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/13/2025. (RO)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew V. Buchsbaum on behalf of Joseph Grym (aty to be noticed) (Buchsbaum, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
12 12 minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/21 5:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Initial Conference held on November 21, 2024 Bernard Friedman, Esq. appeared on behalf of plaintiff. David Depugh appeared on behalf of defendant. The attached Scheduling Order was entered setting deadlines for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. A settlement conference will be held on April 8, 2025 at 2:00 pm in Courtroom 11C South, before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Plaintiff must be present. A representative of the defendant with complete settlement authority (other than counsel) must be present, unless leave is granted to participate by phone. The parties are directed to submit confidential ex parte settlement statements to Kuo_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov by April 1, 2025. The statements must include the last offer and demand, and a frank assessment of the strengths and weaknesses of each partys case. For guidance on the requirements for the statements, the parties should consult Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo's Individual Practice Rules. The Court will schedule ex parte telephone calls with counsel after review of the statements. (FTR LOG: 10:31 - 10:48) (RO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
11 11 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 10/10 4:23 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by City of New York. (Depugh, David)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Thu 10/10 9:32 AM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. (FG)
Related: [-]
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/10 9:44 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge: The10 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge is So Ordered. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 10/10/2024. Judge Pamela K. Chen no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our [LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (FG)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 10/10 5:21 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Conference is adjourned to November 21, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/10/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
10 10 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 10/09 12:35 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by City of New York. (Depugh, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
9 9 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 10/08 2:31 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Joseph Grym (Friedman, Bernard)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Tue 10/08 4:49 PM
ORDER: The parties have indicated in their9 proposed scheduling order that they would consent to this action being reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all purposes, including jurisdiction for dispositive motion(s) and for trial. Should the parties wish to consent, they should fill out and electronically file the Consent to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge. The consent form may be accessed at the following link: https://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 10/8/2024. (FG)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/26 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Depugh on behalf of City of New York (notification declined or already on case) (Depugh, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/26 1:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by City of New York. (Depugh, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Scheduling Order Tue 07/16 12:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on October 22, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By October 17, 2024 , the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: [LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf] Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendant is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/16/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
5 5 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/11 1:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Grym. City of New York served on 7/11/2024, answer due 8/1/2024. (Friedman, Bernard)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 07/11 12:18 PM
Summons Issued as to City of New York. (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 07/11 12:17 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 07/11 12:16 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/11 11:39 AM
COMPLAINT against City of New York Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Joseph Grym. (Friedman, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/11 12:15 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]