New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:24-cv-05236
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2024
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2025 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center
Represented By
Terri L. Chase
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Judith Nelson, M.D.
Represented By
Matthew Dorfman
Vladeck Raskin & Clark, P.C.
contact info
Anne L. Clark
Vladeck, Raskin & Clark, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
35 35 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 05/07 4:27 PM
ORDER granting34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The deadline to file an application to restore this action to the Court's calendar is extended from May 8, 2025, to June 6, 2025. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 34. Motions due by 6/6/2025. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/6/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
34 34 motion Extension of Time Mon 05/05 2:42 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: additional thirty days under April 08 Order addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Anne L. Clark dated May 5, 2025. Document filed by Judith Nelson, M.D...(Clark, Anne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
33 33 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 04/08 3:34 PM
ORDER : WHEREAS, at a March 11, 2025, discovery conference, the parties informed the Court that they have reached a settlement in principle in this case. It is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot, and all conferences are CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/8/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
32 32 misc Letter Thu 03/06 11:37 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Terri L. Chase dated March 6, 2025 re: Response to Plaintiff's Feb. 24, 2025 Letter Motion for Conference. Document filed by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center..(Chase, Terri)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Letter Thu 03/06 7:01 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Anne L. Clark dated March 6, 2025 re: Discovery. Document filed by Judith Nelson, M.D...(Dorfman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Wed 02/26 4:19 PM
ORDER granting29 Letter Motion for Conference. By March 6, 20 25, the parties shall meet and confer regarding the deficiencies in Defendant's discovery responses and file a joint letter detailing what discovery has been completed and what discovery remains, as well as proposing deadlines for any supplemental productions. By March 6, 20 25, Defendant shall also file a letter in response to Plaintiff 's pre-motion letter. A conference regarding the discovery dispute will be held on March 11, 2025, at 3:45 P.M. The conference will be in person at the United States Courthouse, Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY, 10007 at Room 1106. If lead counsel for any party is located outside of New York City or would experience a hardship from an in-person appearance and would prefer to appear remotely, they should notify the Court immediately by filing a letter on the docket so that arrangements can be made. Status Conference set for 3/11/2025 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/26/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
29 29 motion Conference Mon 02/24 11:32 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference for pre-motion discovery conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Anne L. Clark dated February 24, 2025. Document filed by Judith Nelson, M.D...(Dorfman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6
Monday, January 27, 2025
28 28 order Scheduling Order Mon 01/27 3:15 PM
SECOND AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Fact discovery is extended to March 28, 2025, for the limited purpose of completing fact depositions. Deposition due by 3/28/2025. Fact Discovery due by 3/28/2025. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/15/2025 at 03:15 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed at that time. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the dates under paragraphs 5, 6, 8(a), 9(b)-(c) and 13(a)-(c) into the Court's calendar, and to schedule the conference under paragraph 13(c) as a Pre-Motion Conference, even though the conference will be held by telephone. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/27/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Memo Endorsement Mon 01/27 3:04 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:26 Letter filed by Judith Nelson, M.D. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The deadline to complete fact discovery is extended to March 28, 2025, for the limited purpose of completing fact depositions. A Second Amended Case Management Plan will issue separately. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/27/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
26 26 misc Letter Fri 01/24 12:59 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Anne L. Clark dated January 24, 2025 re: Discovery. Document filed by Judith Nelson, M.D...(Dorfman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
25 25 order Memo Endorsement Wed 01/22 2:37 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:24 Letter filed by Judith Nelson, M.D. ENDORSEMENT: By January 29, 2025, the parties shall file a letter regarding the status of Defendant's document production and anticipated dates for supplemental productions. The letter shall also provide new proposed dates when counsel and witnesses are available in March 2025 for each fact deposition provided below. The parties' request for an extension of fact discovery is held in abeyance pending the receipt of that letter. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/22/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
24 24 misc Letter Fri 01/17 5:43 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Anne L. Clark dated 1/17/2025 re: Discovery. Document filed by Judith Nelson, M.D...(Dorfman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/02 4:08 PM
E-DISCOVERY PROTOCOL: Defendant Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center agrees to conduct searches based on the search terms and custodians to be agreed upon by Defendant and Plaintiff Judith Nelson, M.D. (the "Parties"). Defendant reserves all rights to limit these searches if they return an unreasonable number of documents for Defendant to review, and to expand them if they fail to return any, or a reasonable number of, documents. Plaintiff will propose a time period for the searches and searches will be limited to that time period unless otherwise agreed or otherwise ordered by the Court. Plaintiff, for her part, reserves all of her rights, including to seek other, further or expanded searches based upon Defendant's production and/or the results of searches initially conducted by Defendant. The Parties are meeting and conferring to finalize modifications to searches, if and as necessary, as further set forth. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/2/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 12/02 4:03 PM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application GRANTED. The deadline for fact discovery is extended to February 28, 2025. Each deposition shall take place by the date proposed, unless extended by the Court. An Amended Case Management Plan will issue separately. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 18. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/2/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/02 4:00 PM
AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All pparties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 2/28/2025. Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2025. The parties shall file a status letter when discussions with the private mediator have concluded or on November 18, 2024, whichever is earlier. The parties shall file a letter on the status of discovery on January 17, 2025. Pre-Motion Conference set for 3/19/2025 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The motion will be discussed at the conference. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed at that time. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the dates under paragraphs 5, 6, 8(a), 9(b)-(c) and 13(a)-(c) into the Court's calendar, and to schedule the conference under paragraph 13(c) as a Pre-Motion Conference, even though the conference will be held by telephone. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/2/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
20 20 misc Letter Tue 11/26 10:24 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Terri L. Chase dated November 26, 2024 re: the Court's November 15, 2024 Order. Document filed by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center..(Chase, Terri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - ESI Protocol
Friday, November 15, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 11/15 6:55 PM
ORDER with respect to18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. By November 26, 2024, the parties shall file (1) their mutually agreed upon ESI protocol and (2) a letter detailing their plan to conduct remaining fact discovery, including the estimated number of documents or other discovery left to be produced and whether the documents have been collected. The letter shall also address for each fact deposition currently anticipated the name, a description and a proposed date when counsel and the witnesses are available. If the Court approves the parties' proposed dates, they will be so ordered and require Court Order to modify any given date. The Court does not consider engaging in settlement discussions to be good cause for extending discovery deadlines. A decision on the parties' request for an extension is held in abeyance pending receipt of this information.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/15/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 11/14 12:59 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Joint Status Update addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Terri L. Chase dated November 14, 2024. Document filed by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center..(Chase, Terri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Revised Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
17 17 misc Status Report Tue 10/29 10:53 AM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center..(Chase, Terri)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
16 16 5 pgs order Protective Order Mon 09/30 5:36 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/30/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Protective Order Thu 09/26 9:11 PM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center..(Chase, Terri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order re Confidential Information
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/03 4:13 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 9/16/2024. Deposition due by 12/20/2024. Fact Discovery due by 12/20/2024. Telephone Conference set for 2/26/2025 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The motion will be discussed at the conference. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. The parties shall file a status letter when discussions with the private mediator have concluded or on November 18, 2024, whichever is earlier. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the dates under paragraphs 5, 6, 8(a), 9(b)-(c) and 13(a)-(c) into the Court's calendar, and to schedule the conference under paragraph 13(c) as a Pre-Motion Conference, even though the conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial 5 days. is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/3/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/03 3:54 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the September 4, 2024, initial pretrial conference is CANCELED. If the parties believe that a conference would nevertheless be useful, they should inform the Court immediately so the conference can be reinstated. The case management plan and scheduling order will issue in a separate order. The parties' attention is particularly directed to the provisions for periodic status letters, and the need for a pre-motion letter to avoid cancellation of the final conference and setting of a trial date. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a status letter when discussions with the private mediator have concluded or on November 18, 2024, whichever is earlier. It is further ORDERED that if either party seeks to file a motion for summary judgment at the conclusion of discovery, they shall file a pre-motion letter pursuant to Individual Rules III.A.1 and III.C.6. The parties should be aware that the Court does not extend the deadlines for fact and expert discovery absent compelling circumstances. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/3/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
12 12 16 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/29 1:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center..(Chase, Terri)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/29 1:45 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center..(Chase, Terri)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
10 10 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Wed 08/28 10:55 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Judith Nelson, M.D...(Clark, Anne)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Wed 08/28 10:43 AM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Anne L. Clark dated 08/28/2024 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Judith Nelson, M.D...(Clark, Anne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/27 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Dorfman on behalf of Judith Nelson, M.D...(Dorfman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/29 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Terri L. Chase on behalf of Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center..(Chase, Terri)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 07/15 4:49 PM
ORDER The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. Initial Conference set for 9/4/2024 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/15/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 13, 2024
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sat 07/13 12:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Anne)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 07/12 10:15 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 07/12 10:03 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Anne L. Clark to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error, Form is not properly signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 07/12 10:07 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 07/12 10:07 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 07/12 10:08 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 07/11 11:54 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Judith Nelson, M.D...(Clark, Anne)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 07/11 11:53 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Anne)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/11 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT against Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29590937)Document filed by Judith Nelson, M.D...(Clark, Anne)
Related: [-]