Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10964

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:24-ap-03667
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 1:26 PM EST
Defendant
ALCHEMY CAPITAL PARTNERS, LP
Represented By
Pieter Van Tol
Van Tol Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
HARUMI URATA-THOMPSON
Represented By
Eric Samuel Rosen
Dynamis LLP
contact info
Kimberly Jones
Dynamis LLP
contact info
Constantine Economides
Dynamis LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHANNES TREUTLER
Defendant
KRISTINE MEEHAN MASHINSKY
Represented By
Leigh Nathanson
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
ALEXANDER MASHINSKY
Represented By
Jessica Moore
Ruskin Moscou Faltischeck, P.C.
contact info
Sheryl P Giugliano
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Shlomi Daniel Leon
Represented By
Pieter Van Tol
Van Tol Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
ALIZA LANDES
Represented By
Pieter Van Tol
Van Tol Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
KOALA3 LLC
Defendant
KOALA2 LLC
Represented By
Leigh Nathanson
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
KOALA1 LLC
Represented By
Sheryl P Giugliano
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
HANOCH GOLDSTEIN
Represented By
Avi Weitzman
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Zachary Melvin
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
FOUR THIRTEEN LLC
Represented By
Avi Weitzman
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Zachary Melvin
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
RONI COHEN-PAVON
Defendant
BITS OF SUNSHINE LLC
Represented By
Avi Weitzman
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Zachary Melvin
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
JEREMIE BEAUDRY
Represented By
Thaddeus D. Wilson
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Kevin Jordan O'Brien
King & Spalding
contact info
Arthur Jay Steinberg
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
AM VENTURES HOLDING, INC.
Represented By
Sheryl P Giugliano
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Intervenor-Defendant
The Troutman/Lowenstein Group
Represented By
Deborah Kovsky-Apap
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI
Represented By
Aaron Colodny
White & Case LLP
contact info
Samuel P Hershey
White & Case LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 21 2025
Memorandum Opinion and Order, Signed on 1/21/2025, (I) Granting the Litigation Administrator's Motion for Entry of an Order Lifting the Stay of the Proceedings and (II) Denying the Troutman and Lowenstein Groups' Motion to Intervene. related document(s)25, 28) (Anderson, Deanna)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
109 109 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 1:33 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Aaron Colodny on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Colodny, Aaron)
Related: [-] 103 ,105 ,104 ,108
Monday, April 28, 2025
108 108 5 pgs answer Statement Mon 04/28 7:42 PM
Statement / Notice of Revised Objection Deadline for Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant AM Ventures Holdings Inc. Related [+] filed by Aaron Colodny on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. Objections due by 5/15/2025, (Colodny, Aaron)
Related: [-] 104
Thursday, April 24, 2025
107 107 25 pgs answer Memorandum of Law Thu 04/24 4:58 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Third-Party Defendants Ron Deutsch, Adrian Alisie, and Oren Blonstein's Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint Related [+] filed by Avi Weitzman on behalf of ADRIAN ALISIE, OREN BLONSTEIN, RON DEUTSCH. (Weitzman, Avi)
Related: [-] 106
106 106 motion Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 04/24 4:55 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Avi Weitzman on behalf of ADRIAN ALISIE, OREN BLONSTEIN, RON DEUTSCH. (Weitzman, Avi)
Related: [-] 63