California Northern District Court
Judge:Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Case #: 3:24-cv-04178
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2025 12:18 AM PST
Defendant
Anthony J. Blinken
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Tor R. Petersen
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of State
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Adolfo Mora Lopez
Represented By
Zachary Nightingale
Van Der Hout, Brigagliano & Nightingale, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 05/01 8:17 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 22 Stipulation to Continue the Stay of Proceedings. Status Report due by 5/30/2025. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
22 22 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 04/30 3:58 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Status Report and Stipulation to Continue the Stay of Proceedings; [Proposed] Order filed by Tor R. Petersen, Anthony J. Blinken, U.S. Department of State. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 04/01 9:07 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 20 stipulation to stay proceedings until April 30, 2025. (amolc2, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
20 20 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 03/31 11:17 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Status Report and Stipulation to Continue the Stay of Proceedings filed by Tor R. Petersen, Anthony J. Blinken, U.S. Department of State. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 01/29 12:23 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 18 stipulation to stay proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 3/31/2025. (amolc2, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
18 18 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 01/28 4:41 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Status Report and Stipulation to Continue the Stay of Proceedings; [Proposed] Order filed by Tor R. Petersen, Anthony J. Blinken, U.S. Department of State. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 12/02 10:13 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 16 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Mon 12/02 10:13 AM
Case Stayed (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
16 16 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 11/26 4:31 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings filed by Tor R. Petersen, Anthony J. Blinken, U.S. Department of State. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/30 11:36 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Anthony J. Blinken, Tor R. Petersen, U.S. Department of State. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 09/17 7:53 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting as modified 13 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 09/16 4:30 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint; and [Proposed] Order filed by Anthony J. Blinken, Tor R. Petersen, U.S. Department of State. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 09/16 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Elizabeth D. Kurlan on behalf of Anthony J. Blinken, Tor R. Petersen, U.S. Department of State (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 07/24 3:47 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/24/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 07/24 3:32 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 07/24 1:17 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adolfo Mora Lopez.. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 07/24 1:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adolfo Mora Lopez re5 Summons Issued,6 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order,3 Certificate of Interested Entities,1 Complaint, (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 07/16 4:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adolfo Mora Lopez. Anthony J. Blinken served on 7/16/2024, answer due 9/16/2024; Tor R. Petersen served on 7/16/2024, answer due 9/16/2024; U.S. Department of State served on 7/16/2024, answer due 9/16/2024. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
6 6 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Fri 07/12 9:45 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 07/12 9:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Anthony J. Blinken, Tor R. Petersen, U.S. Department of State. (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 07/11 11:43 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/25/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 07/11 11:19 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Adolfo Mora Lopez (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 07/11 11:18 AM
Proposed Summons. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/11 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against Anthony J. Blinken, Tor R. Petersen, U.S. Department of State ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19606983.). Filed by Adolfo Mora Lopez.(Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet