Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Paul S Diamond
Case #: 2:24-cv-03021
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2025 3:28 AM EST
Defendant
JMC POP UPS LLC
Defendant
JOSEPH MCCULLOUGH
Defendant
SAMANTHA SHUTTER
Plaintiff
TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION
Represented By
HARA K. JACOBS
Ballard, Spahr, Andrews And Ingersoll
contact info
Kimberly A. Harchuck
Holihan Law
contact info
MICHAEL W.O. HOLIHAN
contact info


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
14 14 motion Default Judgment Wed 03/26 5:49 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against JMC POP UPS LLC, JOSEPH MCCULLOUGH, SAMANTHA SHUTTER filed by TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION..(JACOBS, HARA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Memorandum,
Att: 5 Declaration of Hara K. Jacobs,
Att: 6 Declaration of Kimberly A. Harchuck,
Att: 7 Exhibit B-1,
Att: 8 Exhibit B-2,
Att: 9 Declaration of Anne L. Coyle,
Att: 10 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/21 9:01 AM
ORDER GRANTING11 12 PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION FOR KIMBERLY A. HARCHUCK, ESQ., AND MICHAEL W.O. HOLIHAN, ESQ.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/20/24. 11/21/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 11/20 11:59 AM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael W.O. Holihan by TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17893280.). (JACOBS, HARA)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 11/20 11:56 AM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kimberly A. Harchuck by TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17893238.). (JACOBS, HARA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 08/26 3:20 PM
DEFAULT BY JMC POP UPS LLC, JOSEPH MCCULLOUGH, SAMANTHA SHUTTER FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (rf, )
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs misc Request for Default Mon 08/26 11:53 AM
Request for Default TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION against JMC POP UPS LLC, JOSEPH MCCULLOUGH, SAMANTHA SHUTTER.(JACOBS, HARA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Hara K. Jacobs,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
misc Default Entered Mon 08/26 3:21 PM
Default Entered (rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/06 4:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION re: Tiffany Zalas served Summons and Complaint upon SAMANTHA SHUTTER. SAMANTHA SHUTTER served on 7/31/2024, answer due 8/21/2024. (JACOBS, HARA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/30 4:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION re: Gavin Rogers served Summons and Complaint upon JOSEPH MCCULLOUGH. JOSEPH MCCULLOUGH served on 7/20/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. (JACOBS, HARA)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/30 4:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION re: Gavin Rogers served Summons and Complaint upon JMC POP UPS LLC. JMC POP UPS LLC served on 7/20/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. (JACOBS, HARA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/16 1:12 PM
ORDER THAT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE PAMELA A. CARLOS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/16/24. 7/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 07/16 8:13 AM
Summons Issued as to JMC POP UPS LLC, JOSEPH MCCULLOUGH, SAMANTHA SHUTTER. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/11 3:56 PM
NOTICE by TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION AO 121 Copyright Form (JACOBS, HARA)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 07/11 3:26 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY by TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION.(JACOBS, HARA)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 07/11 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT against JMC POP UPS LLC, JOSEPH MCCULLOUGH, SAMANTHA SHUTTER ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17595010.), filed by TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION.(JACOBS, HARA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 18 Designation Form