Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 5:24-cv-00091
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2024
Terminated:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2025 2:29 AM CST
Defendant
Dominos Pizza Franchising LLC
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Thomas W Cunningham
Brooks Kushman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Dominos Pizza LLC
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Thomas W Cunningham
Brooks Kushman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Dominos Pizza, Inc.
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Thomas W Cunningham
Brooks Kushman P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Fall Line Patents, LLC
Represented By
Rehan Mohammed Safiullah
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Zachariah Harrington
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Matthew J Antonelli
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
28 28 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 03/12 4:09 PM
ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff Fall Line Patents, LLC and Defendants Chili's, Inc. and Brinker International, Inc.'s (collectively "Chili's") Joint Motion to Dismiss the Chili's Defendants Only. Docket No. 56 . In the joint motion, Plaintiff and Chili's seek to dismiss with prejudice all claims against each other with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Id. After review, the joint motion (Docket No. 56 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that all claims made by Plaintiff and Chili's against each other in the above-captioned actions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/12/2025. Associated Cases: 5:24-cv-00167-RWS, 5:24-cv-00089-RWS, 5:24-cv-00090-RWS, 5:24-cv-00091-RWS, 5:24-cv-00092-RWS, 5:24-cv-00094-RWS, 5:24-cv-00095-RWS, 5:24-cv-00096-RWS, 5:24-cv-00169-RWS, 5:24-cv-00170-RWS, 5:24-cv-00172-RWS, 5:24-cv-00173-RWS, 5:24-cv-00174-RWS, 5:24-cv-00175-RWS, 5:24-cv-00176-RWS, 5:24-cv-00177-RWS, 5:24-cv-00178-RWS, 5:24-cv-00179-RWS, 5:24-cv-00180-RWS, 5:24-cv-00181-RWS, 5:24-cv-00182-RWS(psm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
27 27 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 11/22 4:58 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (slo)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 11/22 4:56 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims made by Plaintiff and Dominos against each other in the above-captioned actions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to close Fall Line Patents, LLC v. Dominos Pizza Inc., et al., 5:24-CV-00091-RWS. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/22/2024. (slo)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
25 25 misc Status Report Mon 10/14 1:13 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT on Venue Discovery by Fall Line Patents, LLC. (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
24 24 4 pgs order Order Tue 10/01 8:40 AM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action (5:24-cv-00089) shall serve as the lead case for the consolidated issues. All future pretrial filings, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/30/2024. (slo)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference Mon 09/30 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 10/01 8:48 AM
ALL FUTURE PRETRIAL FILINGS, OTHER THAN VENUE MOTIONS, SHALL BE FILED IN LEAD CASE 5:24-CV-00089. (slo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference Thu 09/19 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 09/13 4:40 PM
ORDER granting20 MOTION for Venue Discovery and for anExtension of Time to Respond to15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) . Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/13/2024. (slo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 09/12 10:44 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 09/10 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Dominos Pizza Franchising LLC, Dominos Pizza LLC, Dominos Pizza, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
18 18 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 09/09 5:43 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Dominos Pizza Franchising LLC (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 09/09 5:43 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Dominos Pizza LLC (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 09/09 5:41 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Dominos Pizza, Inc. (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 09/09 5:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) by Dominos Pizza Franchising LLC, Dominos Pizza LLC, Dominos Pizza, Inc..(Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Devereaux Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - SFA #8036,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - MAC Pizza Website
Friday, August 02, 2024
14 14 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 08/02 11:45 AM
Defendant Dominos Pizza, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
13 13 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 08/02 11:44 AM
Defendant Dominos Pizza Franchising LLC's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
12 12 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 08/02 11:43 AM
Defendant Dominos Pizza LLC's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 08/02 12:08 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dominos Pizza LLC to 9/9/2024. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas) Modified on 8/2/2024 (bas)
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 08/02 12:11 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dominos Pizza Franchising LLC to 9/9/2024. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 08/02 12:13 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dominos Pizza, Inc. to 9/9/2024. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/23 3:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. Dominos Pizza Franchising LLC served on 7/19/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/23 3:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. Dominos Pizza LLC served on 7/18/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/23 3:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. Dominos Pizza, Inc. served on 7/19/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/17 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Related Cases by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/16 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/16 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/16 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 07/16 2:43 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Dominos Pizza Franchising LLC, Dominos Pizza LLC, Dominos Pizza, Inc.(slo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC,
Att: 2 Summons-Domino's Pizza LLC
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 07/16 12:15 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 07/11 2:22 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/11 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Dominos Pizza Franchising LLC, Dominos Pizza LLC, Dominos Pizza, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10233506.), filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/11 3:17 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Thu 07/11 3:18 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (slo)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 07/11 3:18 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo)
Related: [-]