Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Referred: Ch Magistrate Judge Edwin G Torres
Case #: 1:24-cv-22645
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
23 23 6 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/21 4:02 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION For Relief in Support of Settlement and Request for Hearing by Byramji Moneck Javat. (Srebnick, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
22 22 4 pgs misc Supplement Wed 12/18 4:33 PM
SUPPLEMENT Response by Warden(Catala, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit A
Friday, December 13, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/13 2:59 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court finds good cause to grant the requested, unopposed extension. The Government shall file its response on or before December 18, 2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/13/2024. (kgb)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Fri 12/13 12:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file response by Warden. Responses due by 12/27/2024. (Catala, Maria)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/13 3:31 PM
Set Deadlines: Responses due by 12/18/2024 per DE 21 . (wce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
19 19 minutes Status Conference Tue 12/10 2:59 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Status Conference held on 12/10/2024. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 40 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Howard Milton Srebnick, Maria Catala, Alyssa Silvaggi, and Richard Klugh. Telephonic appearance: Krista Klett (BOP). (Digital EGT-13:13:29) (fbn)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
18 18 11 pgs notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Fri 12/06 10:53 AM
Notice of Supplemental Authority re1 Complaint in Support of Petition by Byramji Moneck Javat (Srebnick, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
17 17 order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Thu 12/05 11:51 AM
PAPERLESS Order Resetting Status Conference. Now set for 12/10/2024 at 01:00 PM in the Miami Division before Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. The status conference will take place in person at the United States Courthouse, 99 N.E. Fourth Street, Tenth Floor, Courtroom Five, Miami, Florida. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/5/2024. (kgb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
16 16 order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Mon 11/25 10:47 AM
PAPERLESS Order setting status conference for 12/10/2024 at 11:00 AM in the Miami Division before Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. The status conference will take place in person at the United States Courthouse, 99 N.E. Fourth Street, Tenth Floor, Courtroom Five, Miami, Florida. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 11/25/2024. (kgb)
Related: [-]
15 15 21 pgs notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Mon 11/25 5:58 AM
Notice of Supplemental Authority and Request for Status Conference by Byramji Moneck Javat (Srebnick, Howard)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
14 14 4 pgs notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/16 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Filing Petitioner's Current Sentence Computation Data by Byramji Moneck Javat (Srebnick, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
13 13 order Clerk's Notice of Refund/Transfer-Filing Fee (by FINANCIAL SECTION) Fri 09/13 4:21 PM
Clerk's Notice of Filing Fee refunded to Howard Srebnick in the amount of $400.00 on 09/13/2024 re 3 Clerk's Notice of Reimbursement of Overpayment of Filing Fee (Torres, Betsabel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 08/20 5:23 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 motion for extension of time and thereby deeming11 Petitioner's reply timely filed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/20/2024. (elk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
11 11 10 pgs respm Response/Reply (Other) Mon 08/19 11:35 PM
REPLY to9 Response/Reply (Other), to Petition for Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241 by Byramji Moneck Javat. (Srebnick, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 08/09 4:57 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to9 Response/Reply (Other), by Byramji Moneck Javat.(Srebnick, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, August 02, 2024
9 9 13 pgs respm Response/Reply (Other) Fri 08/02 3:30 PM
First RESPONSE by Warden.(Catala, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit Signed Declaration - CMC Izquierdo (FTC eligibility Date),
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit Public Information Inmate Data,
Att: 3 Exhibit Education Programming,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit FSA Time Credit Assessment,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1170967-F3 Response,
Att: 6 Exhibit PP37 Inmate History ARS,
Att: 7 Exhibit Education Programming,
Att: 8 3 pgs Exhibit Immigration Detainer
Thursday, July 25, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 07/25 2:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 unopposed motion for extension of time. The Government's response is due August 2, 2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/25/2024. (elk)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Fri 07/26 7:33 AM
Set Response/Answer Due Deadline per DE#8: Warden response/answer due 8/2/2024. (scn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time Wed 07/24 2:43 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file response by Warden. Attorney Maria Catala added to party Warden(pty:res). Responses due by 8/7/2024.(Catala, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 07/24 2:09 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is hereby REFERRED to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all pretrial matters and a Report and Recommendation for any dispositive issue. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
5 5 1 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 07/22 10:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Warden. (wce)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Mon 07/22 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Byramji Moneck Javat re1 Complaint filed by Byramji Moneck Javat (Srebnick, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s)
Thursday, July 11, 2024
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Reimbursement of Overpayment of Filing Fee Fri 07/12 9:50 AM
Clerk's Notice of Reimbursement of Overpayment of Filing Fee. The Clerk will refund $400.00, receipt #AFLSDC-17671771, re1 Complaint dated 7/11/2024. (wce) Modified Text on 7/12/2024 (wce).
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 07/12 9:48 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. (wce)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/11 10:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Warden, Miami FCI against Warden. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17671771, filed by Byramji Moneck Javat.(Srebnick, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet