Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00764
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 2:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez (1)
Represented By
Raul Agustin Martinez, Jr
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Tory Robert Sailer
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/12/2024 3:34 AM CDT
Thursday, June 20, 2024
Case as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez Assigned to Judge Diana Saldana and Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (dlg5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez (1), filed. (dlg5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez, filed. (dlg5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal Criminal Complaint, Enter Warrant in NCIC by USA as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez, filed. (dlg5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER to Seal Criminal Complaint, Enter Warrant in NCICgranting3 Motion to Seal as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga.) Parties notified. (dlg5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant by USA as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez, filed. (dlg5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion for Issuance of Arrest Warrant as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga.) Parties notified. (dlg5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
Case unsealed as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF SETTING as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez. Initial Appearance set for 6/28/2024 at 09:41 AM in Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos, filed. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
8 8 Criminal Complaint Arrest Warrant issued 6/20/2024; Returned Executed on 6/26/2024 as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez. Defendant was arrested in Laredo, Texas. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez added. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Warrant on Arrest on Complaint as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez held on 6/28/2024. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defrendant submitted written waiver of Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing to the Court. Appearances: Bryan Lyndell Oliver AUSA; FPD Sara A. Martinez (on duty); USPTO: Julio Taboada; USM: Deputy Enrique Granados. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:32 AM - 9:50 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Janis Palma / Ernest Murcio, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 7/5/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
9 9 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez, filed. (scg5). [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
11 11 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 7/5/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
13 13 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez. Detention Hearing set for 7/5/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
14 14 WAIVER of Detention Hearing in the case of Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez, filed. (scg5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez, filed. (scg5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Raul Agustin Martinez, Jr, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez, filed. (Martinez, Raul) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez: Prelim Exam and Detention Hrg terminated. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
16 16 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00772]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
17 17 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Gerardo Albino Lara-Gutierrez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (vcc5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment