Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00987
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 2:42 AM CDT
Defendant
Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza (1)
Represented By
Vanessa Mendoza
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Theodore Vandoren Parran, III
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/12/2024 3:48 AM CDT
Sunday, June 23, 2024
Arrest of Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza, filed. (le7) [7:24-mj-01041]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 6/25/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis (le7) (ced7). [7:24-mj-01041]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. 8:1326 INITIAL APPEARANCE and PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION on Criminal Complaint as to Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza held on 6/25/2024. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Deft, through counsel, waived Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing. Court found Probable Cause. Deft held without bond. Due Process Protections Act admonishments provided to Counsel by Court. Appearances: Matthew Phelps, AUSA; Darrell Bryan, AFPD. (PTS: Robert Weaver) (ERO: Yesenia Ibarra) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Priscilla Muzza-Pastor/not used) (DUSM: Seth Whitten) Deft remanded to custody. (nc7) [7:24-mj-01041]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Theodore Vandoren Parran, III appearing for USA, filed. (Parran, Theodore) [7:24-mj-01041]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza, filed. (le7) [7:24-mj-01041]
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza, filed. [7:24-mj-01041]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-01041]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-01041]
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-01041]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza, filed. (jap7) [7:24-mj-01041]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Vanessa Mendoza, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza, filed. (Mendoza, Vanessa) [7:24-mj-01041]
Related: [-]
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza (1) count(s) 1, filed. (xa7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Raul Antonio Saldivar-Garza, filed. (xa7)
Related: [-]