Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00765
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 2:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo (2)
Represented By
Arturo Gallegos
Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Angel Velazquez-Salinas (1)
Represented By
Ariana Salinas
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Tory Robert Sailer
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/12/2024 4:15 AM CDT
Monday, June 24, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Angel Velazquez Salinas (1), Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo (2), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 6/25/2024 at 09:32 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Angel Velazquez Salinas, Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo, filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on June 24, 2024 at 12:06 PM as to Angel Velazquez Salinas, Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo held on 6/25/2024. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defendant submitted written waiver of Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing to the Court. Appearances: Tory Robert Sailer AUSA; USPO: Monica Trevino ; USM: Deputy Enrique Granados. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:30 AM - 9:51 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Eduardo Canudas, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 7/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Angel Velazquez Salinas. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Angel Velazquez Salinas added. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Angel Velazquez Salinas held on 6/25/2024. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defendant submitted written waiver of Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing to the Court. Appearances: Tory Robert Sailer AUSA; FPD Raul Guerra (on duty); USPO: Monica Trevino ; USM: Deputy Enrique Granados. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:30 AM - 10:00 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Eduardo Canudas, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 7/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to Angel Velazquez Salinas, Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo, filed. Agent: Leopoldo Ruiz (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Angel Velazquez Salinas, filed. (mtl5). [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Angel Velazquez Salinas. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Angel Velazquez Salinas. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 7/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Angel Velazquez Salinas. Detention Hearing set for 7/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
10 10 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo, filed. (mtl5). [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo. Arturo Gallegos appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
12 12 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 7/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
14 14 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo. Detention Hearing set for 7/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Angel Velazquez Salinas, filed. (bm5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
16 16 Defendant's Response To Notice of Detention Hearing by Defendant Angel Velazquez Salinas, filed. (bm5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
17 17 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo, filed. (bm5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
18 18 Defendant's Response To Notice of Detention Hearing by Defendant Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo, filed. (bm5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
19 19 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Angel Velazquez Salinas ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
20 20 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Ariana Salinas, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Angel Velazquez Salinas, filed. (Salinas, Ariana) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
21 21 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (jb5) [5:24-mj-00801]
Related: [-]
22 22 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Angel Velazquez-Salinas (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Candelario Lorenzo Palomo-Caudillo (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, filed. (rlt5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment