Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-04262
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 12:26 AM MST
Defendant
Maurice Duavell Cooper (1)
Represented By
Christopher Legrand Scileppi
Law Offices Of Christopher L Scileppi PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Material Witness
Material Witness
Terminated: 07/10/2024
Represented By
Matthew John McGuire
Law Office Of Matthew J Mcguire PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/12/2024 1:20 AM MST
Friday, June 14, 2024
Arrest of Maurice Duavell Cooper on 6/14/2024. (SGG) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Maurice Duavell Cooper. (SGG) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT FOR DETENTION OF MATERIAL WITNESS by USA as to Maurice Duavell Cooper signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald. (SGG) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance for Material Witness in case as to Maurice Duavell Cooper held on 6/17/2024. Material Witness(es) are present and in custody. Matthew McGuire appointed as counsel for the material witnesses with appointment type CJA. The Court orders the Material Witnesses temporarily detained in the custody of the United States Marshal pursuant to 18§3144. IT IS ORDERED the United States Attorney shall schedule a date and time for the video deposition of the material witness(es) within 30 days of appearance. (a juvenile material witness within 24 hours) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall preserve video deposition testimony pending resolution of this matter. Material Witness(es) present and state true name to be the following: Rosalinda Ortiz-Francisco. Appearances : AUSA Anshul Krishn, duty for the Government, CJA Attorney Matthew McGuire for material witness(es). Material Witness(es) are present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter David Miller, by phone, appears telephonically, and assists material witness(es). Related [+] Hearing held 1:20 pm to 1:35 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 Notice of Video Deposition Hearing as to Maurice Duavell Cooper. (BHA) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance as to Maurice Duavell Cooper held on 6/17/2024. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Christopher Legrand Scileppi for defendant with Appointment Type: CJA. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Government's motion for detention and Defendant's request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant(s) temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing waived on 6/17/2024. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Interpreter required for Maurice Duavell Cooper (1) English. Defendant's request to be screened for treatment is granted. VTD date and time stated for the record. In the presence of government and defense counsel, the Court orally advises the government of their Brady obligation. Written order to follow. Appearances : AUSA Anshul Krishn, duty for the Government, CJA Attorney Joseph Ezzo for C Scileppi for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter N/A. Detention Hearing set for 6/28/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. Related [+] Hearing held 2:30 pm to 3:35 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
7 7 ORDER: Under federal law, including Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions from the Supreme Court and the Ninth Circuit interpreting Brady , the government has a continuing obligation to produce all information or evidence known to the government relating to guilt or punishment that might reasonably be considered favorable to the defendant's case, even if the evidence is not admissible so long as it is reasonably likely to lead to admissible evidence. See United States v. Price , 566 F.3d 900,913 n.14 (9th Cir. 2009). Accordingly, the court orders the government to produce to the defendant in a timely manner all such information or evidence. Information or evidence may be favorable to a defendant's case if it either may help bolster the defendant's case or impeach a prosecutor's witness or other government evidence. If doubt exists, it should be resolved in favor of the defendant with full disclosure being made. If the government believes that a required disclosure would compromise witness safety, victim rights, national security, a sensitive law-enforcement technique, or any other substantial government interest, the government may apply to the Court for a modification of the requirements of this Disclosure Order, which may include in camera review and/or withholding or subjecting to a protective order all or part of the information. This Disclosure Order is entered under Rule 5(f) and does not relieve any party in this matter of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating either this Disclosure Order or the government's obligations under Brady include, but are not limited to, the following: contempt, sanction, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. Nothing in this Disclosure Order enlarges or diminishes the government's obligation to disclose information and evidence to a defendant under Brady , as interpreted and applied under Supreme Court and Ninth Circuit precedent. As the Supreme Court noted, "the government violates the Constitution's Due Process Clause 'if it withholds evidence that is favorable to the defense and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment." ' Turner v. United States , 137 S. Ct. 1885, 1888 (2017), quoting Smith v. Cain , 565 U.S. 73, 75 (2012). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald.(BHA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
8 8 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Maurice Duavell Cooper. (BHA) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
9 9 MOTION for Hearing re: Status Conference by USA as to Maurice Duavell Cooper. (Solis, Jose) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
10 10 MINUTE ORDER: Magistrate Judge Angela M Martinez no longer assigned as to Maurice Duavell Cooper. The case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: MJ 24-2086 TUC-EJM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAH) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
11 11 ORDER as to Maurice Duavell Cooper (1): IT IS ORDERED that the Motion (Doc.9 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Status Conference is scheduled for July 1, 2024 at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Eric J. Markovich, 405 W. Congress, Courtroom 3A, Tucson, Arizona, 85701. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 6/20/2024. (See attached Order for complete information.)(SCA) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
12 12 AMENDED ORDER as to Maurice Duavell Cooper: IT IS ORDERED that the Status Conference is rescheduled to July 2, 2024 at 2:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Michael Ambri, 405 W. Congress, Courtroom 3B, Tucson, Arizona, 85701. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 6/25/2024. (See attached Order for complete information.)(SCA) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
14 14 STIPULATION Stipulation and Joint Motion for Release of Material Witness without Taking Video Deposition by Maurice Duavell Cooper.(Scileppi, Christopher) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Indictment
15 15 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service is to release the material witness. The Status Conference scheduled for July 2, 2024 at 2:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Michael Ambri, is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 6/28/2024. (SCA) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
16 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich: Detention Hearing as to Maurice Duavell Cooper held on 6/28/2024. Pretrial Services recommends detention per the Addendum to the Report dated 6/27/2024. Defense counsel submits on the issue of detention at this time with leave to file a motion upon receiving additional information. Defendant ordered detained pending trial. Appearances : AUSA Kelly Cavanaugh, attorney on duty for the Government. CJA Attorney Douglas Tyler Francis for Christopher Scileppi for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter: N/A. Related [+] Hearing held 10:35 AM to 10:51 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CAB) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
17 17 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Maurice Duavell Cooper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 6/28/2024. (CAB) [4:24-mj-02086-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
18 18 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Maurice Duavell Cooper (1) counts 1, 2. Arraignment set for 8/2/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Macdonald. Counsel to advise defendants wishing to waive their appearance at the Arraignment Hearing of the following proposed dates: Trial: 9/10/2024; Plea Deadline: 8/23/2024. NOTE: The process for waiving defendant's appearance at Arraignment has changed. There is no longer a need to file a Notice of Intent to File Waiver of Defendants Appearance. Instead, signed appearance waivers may be electronically filed using the Waiver of Defendants Presence at Arraignment and Acknowledgement of Trial Date event. The event is located under Criminal Event Categories: Other Filings/Waivers. The signed Waiver must be filed no later than 12:00 PM the business day prior to the scheduled arraignment. Failure of defense counsel to file a timely waiver (or a timely motion to continue) may result in the reappointment of defense counsel. (BAC)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
20 20 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Maurice Duavell Cooper. (DLC)
Related: [-]