District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Moxila A Upadhyaya
Case #: 1:24-cv-02022
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Terminated:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 4:11 AM EST
Defendant
ROBERT JACHIM
Represented By
Kartik Narayan Venguswamy
Doj-Usao
contact info
Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By
Kartik Narayan Venguswamy
Doj-Usao
contact info
Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
NAJMO MOHAMUD MAOW
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
ZAMZAM ABDIKARIM IBRAHIM
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
ABDIWELI AHMED MOHAMED
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
FADUMO OMAR MOHAMED
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHAMED BASHIR MOHAMED
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
AIDID MOHAMED MOUSE
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
ABDINAASIR HUSSEIN MUHUMED
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHAMED DAUD MUMIN
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
ABDISHAKUR SAID NUR
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
HALO ALI NUR
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
SALAHUDIN MOHAMED OSMAN
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
SADIK ABDULKADIR SAID
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
NAJMA MUSE ABDI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHAMED OMAR IBRAHIM
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHAMED HASAN HUSSEIN
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
ABDULLAHI MOHAMED HUSSEIN
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
ABDILLAHI ABDI HASSAN
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
NURA ABDELAHI HASHI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
SADO ABDI ELMI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
YUSUF MOHAMUD ALI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
ABDIRAHMAN HASHI ALI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
ABDIKARIM ADAN ALI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
UBAH HASSAN AHMED
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
ISSE OSMAN AHMED
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
ZAKARIYE HASSAN ABUKAR
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
ABDIRAHMAN MOHAMUD ABDULLAHI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
MUHAMMAD ABDIRAHMAN ABDILAHI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Zhao Guo
Red Eagle Law Lc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CARSON WU
Terminated: 09/11/2024
Represented By
Kartik Narayan Venguswamy
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/01 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UBAH HASSAN AHMED, SADO ABDI ELMI, ABDULLAHI MOHAMED HUSSEIN, FADUMO OMAR MOHAMED, MOHAMED BASHIR MOHAMED, AIDID MOHAMED MOUSE, ABDISHAKUR SAID NUR, SADIK ABDULKADIR SAID (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
order .Order Tue 10/01 2:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal33 , it is hereby ORDERED that this action shall be dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on October 1, 2024. (lcjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Fri 09/27 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Abdirahman Hashi Ali by ABDIRAHMAN HASHI ALI (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Wed 09/25 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re ABDIRAHMAN MOHAMUD ABDULLAHI (Claims by remaining Plaintiffs are not dismissed at this time.) by ABDIRAHMAN MOHAMUD ABDULLAHI (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Tue 09/24 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Abdiweli Ahmed Mohamed and Najmo Mohamud Moaw (Claims by remaining Plaintiffs are not dismissed at this time.) by NAJMO MOHAMUD MAOW, ABDIWELI AHMED MOHAMED (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Thu 09/19 9:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER: As stated on the record on September 17, 2024, the Plaintiffs have voluntarily withdrawn their Motion for Preliminary Injunction10 . Accordingly, that Motion is dismissed as moot. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on September 17, 2024. (lcjm)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/19 9:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record on September 17, 2024, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery11 as moot. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on September 17, 2024. (lcjm)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/19 9:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record on September 17, 2024, the Parties are hereby ORDERED to file either a Joint Status Report with recommendations for further proceedings or advise the Court whether Plaintiffs are dismissing their case with prejudice no later than October 1, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on September 17, 2024. (lcjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
29 29 misc Status Report Tue 09/17 11:55 AM
STATUS REPORT re: Remaining DV Numbers by ANTONY BLINKEN, ROBERT JACHIM. (Venguswamy, Kartik)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Status Report Tue 09/17 11:34 AM
STATUS REPORT (Fifth) by MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Email from Lusaka
27 27 misc Status Report Tue 09/17 2:15 AM
STATUS REPORT (Fourth) by MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Email thread with Djibouti
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 09/17 1:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya: Status Conference held on 9/17/2024. Parties discuss posture of the case. Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2024. Court Reporter FTR- GOLD; FTR Time Frame: CRTM 7: [12:16:16-1:26:38]. (znjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
26 26 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 09/16 11:52 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re11 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by ANTONY BLINKEN, ROBERT JACHIM. (Venguswamy, Kartik)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Status Report Mon 09/16 11:01 PM
Third STATUS REPORT by MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Email from Addis Ababa denying transfer request
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Mon 09/16 10:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re MOHAMED DAUD MUMIN by MOHAMED DAUD MUMIN (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 15, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 09/15 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Reply to opposition to motion Sun 09/15 4:50 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ABDULLAHI MOHAMED HUSSEIN.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Death Certificate
Saturday, September 14, 2024
21 21 misc Status Report Sat 09/14 4:12 PM
Second STATUS REPORT by MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Email to US Embassy Addis Ababa,
Att: 2 Exhibit B, Email from US Embassy Nairobi
Friday, September 13, 2024
20 20 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 09/13 9:30 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,,,, filed by ANTONY BLINKEN, ROBERT JACHIM.(Venguswamy, Kartik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
19 19 motion Dismiss Fri 09/13 9:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ANTONY BLINKEN, ROBERT JACHIM.(Venguswamy, Kartik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
18 18 misc Status Report Fri 09/13 3:09 PM
First STATUS REPORT pursuant to Court's order at September 12, 2024 status conference by MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Fri 09/13 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Yusuf Mohamud Ali by YUSUF MOHAMUD ALI (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Telephone Conference Fri 09/13 9:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing on September 12, 2024, Plaintiffs' Motion for Telephone Conference [ECF 14] is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on September 12, 2024. (lcjm)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 09/13 9:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [ECF 10] Motion for Preliminary Injunction [ECF 15] is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their Response no later than September 13, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on September 12, 2024. (lcjm) Modified on 9/13/2024 (znjb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 09/13 11:54 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Response due by 9/13/2024. (znjb)
Related: [-]
order .Order Fri 09/13 3:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties are to appear before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya for a virtual status conference by Zoom on September 17 at 12:00 p.m. Parties should be prepared to discuss the current status of each Plaintiffs' visa application and whether there is any remedy this Court could as a matter of law provide in this case. Defendants are ORDERED to make available an agency representative with knowledge of this matter for this hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on September 12, 2024. (lcjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 09/12 3:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya: Status Conference held on 9/12/2024. Parties discuss posture of the case. Status Conference set for 9/17/2024 at 12:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. Court Reporter FTR- GOLD; FTR Time Frame: CRTM 5: [12:34:20-1:09:30] (znjb)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/13 9:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer [ECF 13] is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their answer no later than September 13, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on September 12, 2024. (lcjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 09/11 12:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs'8 Motion to Substitute Party is GRANTED pursuant to FRCP 25(d). All future case captions shall reflect the currently substituted parties. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on 9/11/2024. (znjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
16 16 respm Response to motion Tue 09/10 5:12 PM
RESPONSE re15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Nunc Pro Tunc filed by MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Emails to US Consulate Lusaka, Zambia
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 09/10 2:40 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Nunc Pro Tunc by ANTONY BLINKEN, CARSON WU. (Venguswamy, Kartik)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Telephone Conference Tue 09/10 4:30 AM
First MOTION for Telephone Conference by MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
order .Order Tue 09/10 10:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Given Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [ECF 10], if any, was due September 9, 2024 under LCvR 65.1(c), the Court orders Defendants to file their Opposition by 12:00 a.m. on September 11, 2024 if they wish for the Court to consider it. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on September 10, 2024. (lcjm)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 09/10 5:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties are to appear for a status conference on September 12 at 12:00 p.m. in person in Courtroom 5. Parties should be prepared to discuss the current status of each Plaintiffs' visa application and whether there is any remedy this Court could as a matter of law provide in this case. Defendants are ORDERED to make available an agency representative with knowledge of this matter for this hearing. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on September 10, 2024. (lcjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 09/09 10:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by ANTONY BLINKEN, CARSON WU. (Venguswamy, Kartik)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Mon 09/09 9:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI, ABDILLAHI ABDI HASSAN, SALAHUDIN MOHAMED OSMAN, MOHAMED HASAN HUSSEIN, MUHAMMAD ABDIRAHMAN ABDILAHI, ABDIKARIM ADAN ALI, NAJMA MUSE ABDI, ISSE OSMAN AHMED, ABDINAASIR HUSSEIN MUHUMED, NURA ABDELAHI HASHI (Only the listed parties. The remaining Plaintiffs in this action do not dismiss their claims at this time) by NAJMA MUSE ABDI, MUHAMMAD ABDIRAHMAN ABDILAHI, ISSE OSMAN AHMED, ABDIKARIM ADAN ALI, MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI, NURA ABDELAHI HASHI, ABDILLAHI ABDI HASSAN, MOHAMED HASAN HUSSEIN, ABDINAASIR HUSSEIN MUHUMED, SALAHUDIN MOHAMED OSMAN (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/06 10:22 PM
Ex Parte MOTION Expedited Discovery (in the form of four narrowly-tailored interrogatories) by MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A, First Set of ROGS,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Saturday, August 31, 2024
10 10 motion Preliminary Injunction Sat 08/31 3:49 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by NAJMA MUSE ABDI, MUHAMMAD ABDIRAHMAN ABDILAHI, ABDIRAHMAN MOHAMUD ABDULLAHI, ZAKARIYE HASSAN ABUKAR, ISSE OSMAN AHMED, UBAH HASSAN AHMED, ABDIKARIM ADAN ALI, ABDIRAHMAN HASHI ALI, YUSUF MOHAMUD ALI, MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI, SADO ABDI ELMI, NURA ABDELAHI HASHI, ABDILLAHI ABDI HASSAN, ABDULLAHI MOHAMED HUSSEIN, MOHAMED HASAN HUSSEIN, MOHAMED OMAR IBRAHIM, ZAMZAM ABDIKARIM IBRAHIM, NAJMO MOHAMUD MAOW, ABDIWELI AHMED MOHAMED, FADUMO OMAR MOHAMED, MOHAMED BASHIR MOHAMED, AIDID MOHAMED MOUSE, ABDINAASIR HUSSEIN MUHUMED, MOHAMED DAUD MUMIN, ABDISHAKUR SAID NUR, HALO ALI NUR, SALAHUDIN MOHAMED OSMAN, SADIK ABDULKADIR SAID.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Mohamed Ibrahim ELMI 2024AF11336,
Att: 2 Exhibit B, Declaration of Abdillahi Abdi HASSAN 2024AF34343,
Att: 3 Exhibit C, Declaration of Aidid Mohamed MOUSE 2024AF25053,
Att: 4 Exhibit D, Declaration of Mohamed Daud MUMIN 2024AF23172,
Att: 5 Exhibit E, Declaration of Mohamed Bashir MOHAMED 2024AF41125,
Att: 6 Exhibit F, Declaration of Abdirahman Hashi ALI 2024AF05666,
Att: 7 Exhibit G, Declaration of Mohamed Hasan HUSSEIN 2024AF19685,
Att: 8 Exhibit H, Declaration of Muhammad Abdirahman ABDILAHI 2024AF28599,
Att: 9 Exhibit I, Declaration of Sadik Abdulkadir SAID 2024AF23737,
Att: 10 Exhibit J, Declaration of Sado Abdi ELMI and Abdishakur Said NUR 2024AF23936,
Att: 11 Exhibit K, Declaration of Abdiweli Ahmed MOHAMED 2024AF14456,
Att: 12 Exhibit L, Declaration of Ubah Hassan AHMED 2024AF19263,
Att: 13 Exhibit M, Declaration of Najmo Mohamud MAOW 2024AF32721,
Att: 14 Exhibit N, Declaration of Abdirahman Mohamud ABDULLAHI 2024AF27060,
Att: 15 Exhibit O, Declaration of Isse Osman AHMED 2024AF14338,
Att: 16 Exhibit P, Declaration of Abdinaasir Hussein MUHUMED 2024AF49941,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q, Declaration of Fadumo Omar MOHAMED and Mohamed Omar IBRAHIM 2024AF04389,
Att: 18 Exhibit R, Declaration of Yusuf Mohamud ALI 2024AF24412,
Att: 19 Exhibit S, Declaration of Halo Ali NUR and Zakariye Hassan ABUKAR 2024AF04608
Monday, August 26, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/26 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kartik Narayan Venguswamy on behalf of All Defendants (Venguswamy, Kartik)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 25, 2024
8 8 motion Substitute Party Sun 08/25 7:17 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party (Robert Jachim in place of Carson Wu) by NAJMA MUSE ABDI, MUHAMMAD ABDIRAHMAN ABDILAHI, ABDIRAHMAN MOHAMUD ABDULLAHI, ZAKARIYE HASSAN ABUKAR, ISSE OSMAN AHMED, UBAH HASSAN AHMED, ABDIKARIM ADAN ALI, ABDIRAHMAN HASHI ALI, YUSUF MOHAMUD ALI, MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI, SADO ABDI ELMI, NURA ABDELAHI HASHI, ABDILLAHI ABDI HASSAN, ABDULLAHI MOHAMED HUSSEIN, MOHAMED HASAN HUSSEIN, MOHAMED OMAR IBRAHIM, ZAMZAM ABDIKARIM IBRAHIM, NAJMO MOHAMUD MAOW, ABDIWELI AHMED MOHAMED, FADUMO OMAR MOHAMED, MOHAMED BASHIR MOHAMED, AIDID MOHAMED MOUSE, ABDINAASIR HUSSEIN MUHUMED, MOHAMED DAUD MUMIN, ABDISHAKUR SAID NUR, HALO ALI NUR, SALAHUDIN MOHAMED OSMAN, SADIK ABDULKADIR SAID. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Mon 08/12 10:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re ABDIKARIM ADAN ALI and SALAHUDIN MOHAMED OSMAN (only the listed parties) by ABDIKARIM ADAN ALI, SALAHUDIN MOHAMED OSMAN (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
6 6 misc Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes Thu 08/08 8:41 AM
Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by NAJMA MUSE ABDI, MUHAMMAD ABDIRAHMAN ABDILAHI, ABDIRAHMAN MOHAMUD ABDULLAHI, ZAKARIYE HASSAN ABUKAR, ISSE OSMAN AHMED, UBAH HASSAN AHMED, ABDIKARIM ADAN ALI, ABDIRAHMAN HASHI ALI, YUSUF MOHAMUD ALI, MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI, SADO ABDI ELMI, NURA ABDELAHI HASHI, ABDILLAHI ABDI HASSAN, ABDULLAHI MOHAMED HUSSEIN, MOHAMED HASAN HUSSEIN, MOHAMED OMAR IBRAHIM, ZAMZAM ABDIKARIM IBRAHIM, NAJMO MOHAMUD MAOW, ABDIWELI AHMED MOHAMED, FADUMO OMAR MOHAMED, MOHAMED BASHIR MOHAMED, AIDID MOHAMED MOUSE, ABDINAASIR HUSSEIN MUHUMED, MOHAMED DAUD MUMIN, ABDISHAKUR SAID NUR, HALO ALI NUR, SALAHUDIN MOHAMED OSMAN, SADIK ABDULKADIR SAID.. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
order .Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/08 9:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties'6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge for All Purposes, this matter is hereby REFERRED to a randomly assigned magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and to order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/08/2024. (lctnm1)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 08/09 10:42 AM
CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya for all purposes. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 21, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Sun 07/21 3:08 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANTONY J. BLINKEN served on 7/15/2024; CARSON WU served on 7/15/2024, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/15/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/12/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/10/2024.)(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C, service to US Attorney, Blinken, Wu, Garland
Monday, July 15, 2024
4 4 order .Order Mon 07/15 9:22 AM
STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 07/15/2024. (lctnm1)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/12 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zhao Guo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Guo, Zhao)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Fri 07/12 8:27 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ANTONY J BLINKEN, CARSON WU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/12 4:56 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BDCDC-11020236) filed by MUHAMMAD ABDIRAHMAN ABDILAHI, ISSE OSMAN AHMED, MOHAMED DAUD MUMIN, YUSUF MOHAMUD ALI, ABDILLAHI ABDI HASSAN, UBAH HASSAN AHMED, ABDINAASIR HUSSEIN MUHUMED, MOHAMED IBRAHIM ELMI, NAJMA MUSE ABDI, SADIK ABDULKADIR SAID, FADUMO OMAR MOHAMED, ABDIWELI AHMED MOHAMED, HALO ALI NUR, AIDID MOHAMED MOUSE, NURA ABDELAHI HASHI, ZAKARIYE HASSAN ABUKAR, SALAHUDIN MOHAMED OSMAN, ABDIRAHMAN HASHI ALI, ABDIKARIM ADAN ALI, ABDISHAKUR SAID NUR, ABDIRAHMAN MOHAMUD ABDULLAHI, SADO ABDI ELMI, MOHAMED BASHIR MOHAMED, ABDULLAHI MOHAMED HUSSEIN, MOHAMED OMAR IBRAHIM, NAJMO MOHAMUD MAOW, MOHAMED HASAN HUSSEIN, ZAMZAM ABDIKARIM IBRAHIM.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - April 7, 2024 Declaration of Carson Wu,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Mohamed Ibrahim Elmi 2024AF11336,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Abdillahi Abdi Hassan 2024AF34343,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Salahudun Mohamed Osman AF41998,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Abdullahi Mohamed HUSSEIN and Zamzam Abdikarim IBRAHIM 2024AF35743,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Aidid Mohamed Mouse 2024AF25053,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Mohamed Daud Mumin 2024AF23172,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Mohamed Bashir Mohamed 2024AF41125,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Abdirahman Hashi Ali 2024AF5666,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Mohamed Hasan Hussein 2024AF19685,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Muhammad Abdirahman Abdilahi 2024AF28599,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Abdikarim Adan Ali 2024AF49134,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Sadiik Abdulkadir Said 2024AF23737,
Att: 14 Exhibit N - Sado Abdi ELMI and Abdishakur Said NUR 2024AF23936,
Att: 15 Exhibit O - Abdiweli Ahmed Mohamed 2024AF14456,
Att: 16 Exhibit P - Ubah Hassan Ahmed 2024AF19263,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q - Najma Muse Abdi 2024AF41292,
Att: 18 Exhibit R - Najmo Mohamud Maow 2024AF32721,
Att: 19 Exhibit S - Abdirahman Mohamud Abdullahi 2024AF27060,
Att: 20 Exhibit T - Isse Osman Ahmed 2024AF14338,
Att: 21 Exhibit U - Abdinaasir Hussein Muhumed 2024AF49941,
Att: 22 Exhibit V - Fadumo Omar MOHAMED and Mohamed Omar IBRAHIM 2024AF4389,
Att: 23 Exhibit W - Nura Abdelahi Hashi 2024AF29971,
Att: 24 Exhibit X - Yusuf Mohamud Ali 2024AF24412,
Att: 25 Exhibit Y - Halo Ali NUR and Zakariye Hassan ABUKAR 2024AF4608,
Att: 26 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 27 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/12 8:25 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmw)
Related: [-]