Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Referred: Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein
Case #: 1:24-cv-22651
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 4:13 AM EST
Defendant
Lululemon Athletica Inc.
Represented By
Pravin Rajesh Patel
Weil, Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Amber N. Venturelli
Weil, Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Caroline H. Zalka
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Morgan D. MacBride
Weil, Gotshal & Manges
contact info
David R. Singh
Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lululemon USA Inc.
Represented By
Pravin Rajesh Patel
Weil, Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Amber N. Venturelli
Weil, Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Caroline H. Zalka
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Morgan D. MacBride
Weil, Gotshal & Manges
contact info
David R. Singh
Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Honorable Morton Denlow
Plaintiff
Amandeep Gyani
Represented By
Michael James Pascucci
Eggnatz Pascucci, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Eggnatz Pascucci, P.A.
contact info
Christopher Chagas Gold
Gold Law, PA
contact info
Steven Saul
Fenstersheib Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hector Acosta
Represented By
Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Eggnatz Pascucci, P.A.
contact info
Christopher Chagas Gold
Gold Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Julez Blake
Represented By
Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Eggnatz Pascucci, P.A.
contact info
Christopher Chagas Gold
Gold Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Paula Martinez
Represented By
Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Eggnatz Pascucci, P.A.
contact info
Christopher Chagas Gold
Gold Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexandria Reese
Represented By
Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Eggnatz Pascucci, P.A.
contact info
Christopher Chagas Gold
Gold Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Roya Sayied
Represented By
Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Eggnatz Pascucci, P.A.
contact info
Christopher Chagas Gold
Gold Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Tomaz
Represented By
Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Eggnatz Pascucci, P.A.
contact info
Christopher Chagas Gold
Gold Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Abby Utal
Represented By
Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Eggnatz Pascucci, P.A.
contact info
Christopher Chagas Gold
Gold Law, PA
contact info

GPO Feb 19 2025
ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss 20 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal for Failure to State a Claim. Dismissing 20 Amended Complaint without prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
54 54 14 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 02/19 10:37 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Dismiss20 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal for Failure to State a Claim. Dismissing20 Amended Complaint without prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]