Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:J Randal Hall
Referred: Brian K Epps
Case #: 1:24-cv-00109
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity of citizenship
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 4:15 AM EST
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Arthur Allen Ebbs
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eddie Denhardt
576 Pirklefield Drive
Covington, GA 30014


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
18 18 appeal Appeal Remark Thu 05/08 10:44 AM
Appeal Remark re14 Notice of Appeal. Certificate of No Transcript, by Eddie Denhardt. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
17 17 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/18 3:39 PM
USCA Case Number 25-11283 D for14 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddie Denhardt. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
16 16 appeal USCA Appeal Fees Tue 04/15 12:32 PM
USCA Appeal Fees received, $605.00, Receipt # 200001410 re14 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddie Denhardt. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
15 15 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 04/10 12:20 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:14 Notice of Appeal,12 Order on Motion to Dismiss,13 Clerk's Judgment. Other Appeals: No. Judge Appealed: Judge Hall. Court Reporter: N/A. Fee Paid: No. Pending COA/IFP: No. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Record on Appeal
14 14 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 04/10 12:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to12 Order on Motion to Dismiss,13 Clerk's Judgment, by Eddie Denhardt. (gmh)
Related: [-]
appeal FRAP Certificate of Readiness Thu 04/10 12:29 PM
F.R.A.P. Certificate of Readiness re14 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically . (gmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
13 13 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 03/14 4:10 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 3/14/2025. (pts)
Related: [-]
12 12 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 03/14 4:07 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Dismiss. This case stands closed. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/14/2025. (pts)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/15 2:08 PM
ORDER staying discovery. The Court DIRECTS the CLERK to terminate the motion associated with the Rule 26(f) Report. Should any portion of the case remain after resolution of the motion to dismiss, the parties shall confer and submit a new Rule 26(f) Report, with proposed case deadlines, within seven days of the presiding District Judges ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on October 15, 2024. (jrb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
10 10 motion Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 10/10 10:01 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ebbs, Arthur)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 10/10 10:55 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (thb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
9 9 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 09/03 3:37 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ebbs, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Intent Mon 08/26 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re7 Response to Motion. (Ebbs, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
7 7 respm Response to Motion Thu 08/22 11:46 AM
RESPONSE as to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Eddie Denhardt. (loh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss Wed 08/07 1:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 8/21/2024.(Ebbs, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Security Deed,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Redemption Quitclaim Deed
Monday, July 29, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 07/29 11:14 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. c/o Corporation Service Company on 7/17/2024, filed by Eddie Denhardt. (maa)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/29 11:15 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 8/7/2024. (maa)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order Mon 07/15 3:44 PM
ORDERED that the Court DIRECTS the CLERK to attach a copy of Rule 4 to this Order so that Plaintiff may determine the appropriate method of service for Defendant. The Court HEREBY NOTIFIES Plaintiff he must serve Defendant within ninety days after the complaint was filed, and failure to do so may result in the dismissal of individual defendants or the entire case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/15/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
3 3 7 pgs order Order Fri 07/12 11:04 AM
RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/12/24. (loh)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/12 11:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (loh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/12 11:00 AM
COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Eddie Denhardt.(loh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Envelope
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 07/12 11:01 AM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 100001975. (loh)
Related: [-]