Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Susan E Huntsman
Case #: 4:24-cv-00327
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Terminated:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 3:29 AM CST
Defendant
Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc.
Represented By
Paul Bradley Bendure
Conner & Winters, Llp (tulsa)
contact info
McKayla Hendrix
Conner & Winters LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mitchell Dodd
Represented By
Leah Michelle Roper
Center For Employment Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Monday, December 30, 2024
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/30 11:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Mitchell Dodd (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-]
utility Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case Tue 12/31 10:55 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number32 ) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 12/02 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Mitchell Dodd (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Mon 12/02 4:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman In light of the parties' Notice of Settlement (ECF No. 30), all remaining dates in the scheduling order are stricken. The parties' stipulation of dismissal is due on 12/30/24. , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 12/30/2024), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SHJ, Judge)
Related: [-] 30 Notice of Settlement
Monday, November 04, 2024
29 29 misc Errata/Correction to Document Mon 11/04 10:03 AM
ERRATA/CORRECTION Related [+] by Mitchell Dodd (With attachments) (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-] 25 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas
Friday, November 01, 2024
28 28 order 00 - Opinion and Order Ruling on Motion to Quash Fri 11/01 7:10 PM
OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman ; granting25 Motion to Quash Related [+] (SHJ, Judge)
Related: [-] 25 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas
Thursday, October 31, 2024
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/31 3:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion Related [+] by Mitchell Dodd ; (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-] 25 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas
Thursday, October 24, 2024
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/24 3:19 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Related [+] by Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc. ; (Hendrix, McKayla)
Related: [-] 25 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas
Thursday, October 10, 2024
25 25 motion Quash Thu 10/10 11:28 AM
MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by Mitchell Dodd (With attachments) (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
24 24 order 01 - Order Ruling on Motion for Discovery Mon 10/07 11:44 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman ; denying23 Motion for Discovery Related [+] (SHJ, Judge)
Related: [-] 23 MOTION for Discovery Additional Interrogatories (Renewed)
Friday, October 04, 2024
23 23 motion Discovery Fri 10/04 9:42 AM
MOTION for Discovery Additional Interrogatories Related [+] by Mitchell Dodd (With attachments) (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-] newed
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion for Discovery Tue 10/01 10:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman Plaintiff has not shown a need for additional interrogatories at this time. Plaintiff's request for additional interrogatories is denied without prejudice to reasserting the request after Plaintiff has commenced written discovery. ; denying18 Motion for Discovery Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SHJ, Judge)
Related: [-] 18 MOTION for Discovery Additional Interrogatories
Monday, September 23, 2024
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/23 1:41 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Related [+] by Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc. ; (Hendrix, McKayla)
Related: [-] 18 MOTION for Discovery Additional Interrogatories
20 20 notice Appearance - Attorney Mon 09/23 1:40 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by McKayla Hendrix on behalf of Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc. [Note: Attorney McKayla Hendrix added to party Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Hendrix, McKayla)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
19 19 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Mon 09/09 4:38 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 3/3/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2025, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/10/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, Jury Trial set for 8/4/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman) (kah, Chambers)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Discovery Mon 09/09 2:45 PM
MOTION for Discovery Additional Interrogatories by Mitchell Dodd (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes 17 - Scheduling Conference Held Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Mon 09/09 2:00 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman: Scheduling Conference held on 9/9/2024 , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Court Reporter: C1) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
15 15 misc Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) Tue 09/03 10:23 AM
Amended JOINT STATUS REPORT by Mitchell Dodd (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Tue 09/03 5:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman A Telephone hearing is scheduled for 9/9/2024 at 1:30 p.m. Dial in information is 918-800-1393. When Prompted, enter conference ID number 776 398 852# , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
13 13 misc Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) Fri 08/30 9:23 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Mitchell Dodd (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 08/30 1:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman The parties joint status report is incomplete. The parties are directed to file a corrected joint status report that includes answers to sections VI(D) and VIII by 9/4/24. , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/4/2024) Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SHJ, Judge)
Related: [-] 13 Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1)
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Tue 08/13 8:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (drw, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
11 11 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Fri 08/09 5:38 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/30/2024) (SHJ, Judge)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Fri 08/09 9:11 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc. for Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc.) by Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc. (Bendure, Paul)
Related: [-]
9 9 respoth Answer Fri 08/09 9:07 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand Related [+] by Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc. (Bendure, Paul)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
8 8 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 08/09 9:04 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paul Bradley Bendure on behalf of Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc. (Bendure, Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/09 9:02 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc. [Note: Attorney Paul Bradley Bendure added to party Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Bendure, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 07/12 3:21 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc. (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Mitchell Dodd to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
4 4 order 15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ Fri 07/12 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 07/12 11:04 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leah Michelle Roper on behalf of Mitchell Dodd (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 07/12 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Indian Health Care Resource Center of Tulsa, Inc. (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3039087) by Mitchell Dodd (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 07/12 11:01 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Mitchell Dodd (Roper, Leah)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Fri 07/12 3:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Mitchell Dodd to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]