New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:24-cv-05276
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Terminated:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 4:24 AM EST
Defendant
Sebastian Londono Correa
Plaintiff
Durand Henry Saberi
Represented By
Parker S Rothman
Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, December 09, 2024
32 32 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 12/09 6:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 11/15/24 Order and 12/6/24 Order served on SEBASTIN LONDOO CORREA on December 9, 2024. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 12/06 5:20 PM
ORDER granting in part30 Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's application for attorneys' fees is GRANTED IN PART. The Court deducts $3,936.00 from the claimed attorneys' fees and awards Plaintiff $22,162.35 in attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/6/2024) (vfr) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
30 30 motion Attorney Fees Tue 11/19 3:56 PM
FIRST MOTION for Attorney Fees per 11/15/24 Default Order . Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 11/15/24 Default Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Legal Fee Invoices
Friday, November 15, 2024
29 29 order Judgment - Default ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 11/15 2:49 PM
ORDER: Upon reviewing Plaintiff's Motion for a default judgment against Defendant, and any opposition thereto, and for good cause shown, it is: ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that a Default Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant as to Count Four. Plaintiff is awarded damages in the amount of $83,358.35, broken down as follows: (1) $81,58.000 representing the amount by which Defendant was unjustly enriched; and (2) $1,770.35, representing the statutory prejudgment interest accruing at the rate set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a) on the unpaid principal amount of $81,588.00, beginning on July 12, 2024 (i.e., the filing date of the Complaint) and continuing through and including October 7, 2024 (i.e., the filing date of Plaintiff's motion for default judgment). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is also entitled to post-judgment interest pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1961. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees and costs incurred in connection with the filing of this lawsuit and the Default Judgment motion. By not later than Friday, November 22, 2024, Plaintiff must submit an application for attorneys' fees detailing the attorneys' fees and costs incurred along with supporting documentation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Counts One, Two, and Three of Plaintiff's Complaint are dismissed with prejudice. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to . filed by Durand Henry Saberi. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/15/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 11/15 2:50 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 11/22/2024. (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/14 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Parker S Rothman on behalf of Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
minutes Show Cause Hearing Mon 11/18 11:34 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Show Cause Hearing held on 11/14/2024. Attorney Parker Rothman present for the plaintiff. No defendant appeared. Court Reporter Doug Colavito present. (anc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
27 27 service Certificate of Service Other Fri 10/25 1:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order (ECF Doc. No. 26) served on SEBASTIN LONDOO CORREA on October 25, 2024. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/24 12:57 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the show cause hearing is ADJOURNED from Friday, November 8, 2024, at 10:00 A.M. to Thursday, November 14, 2024, at 3:00 P.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by not later than Monday, October 28, 2024, Plaintiff is directed to send a copy of this Order by e-mail1 to Defendant at s.londono1092@gmail.com. Plaintiff must file proof of e-mail on ECF by not later than Thursday, October 31, 2024. SO ORDERED. ( Show Cause Hearing set for 11/14/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/24/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
25 25 service Certificate of Service Other Wed 10/09 2:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Signed OSC + Supporting Motion Documents served on SEBASTIN LONDOO CORREA on October 9, 2024. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/08 4:38 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned Defendant Sebastin Londoo Correa show cause before this Court on Friday, November 8, 2024, at 10:00 A.M. in United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007, why an Order should not be issued pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)(2) and Rule 55.2(b) of the Local Civil Rules entering default judgment against Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, because the Court has determined that international agreement does not prohibit service by e-mail in Colombia, see Setai Hotel Acquisition, LLC v. Miami Beach Luxury Rentals, Inc., No. 16-CV-21296, 2016 WL 8677230, at *4 (S.D. Fla. Oct. 14, 2016), and Plaintiff has provided sufficient information to show that service by e-mail is reasonably calculated to apprise the Defendant of the pendency of this action, see Dkt. 11, by not later than Friday, October 11, 2024, Plaintiff is directed to send a copy of this Order to Show Cause and the papers upon which it is based, see Dkt. 23, by e-mail to Defendant at s.londono1092@gmail.com. Plaintiff must file proof of e-mail on ECF by not later than Tuesday, October 15, 2024; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's opposition papers, if any, shall be filed and served on the Plaintiff's attorneys by the SDNY Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system and/or by Federal Express to Plaintiffs attorneys, Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel P.C., at 377 Broadway, 6th Floor, New York, New York 10013 by not later than Friday, October 25, 2024; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by not later than Friday, November 1, 2024, Plaintiffs reply papers, if any, shall be filed on ECF and, if Defendant has not appeared in this case, shall be emailed to Defendant at s.londono1092@gmail.com; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to strike the entry at Dkt. 22 as duplicative. SO ORDERED. ( Replies due by 11/1/2024.) Show Cause Hearing set for 11/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2024. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/8/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
23 23 motion Default Judgment Mon 10/07 5:44 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to . Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Supplement Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Supplement Rothman Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit The Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Service Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit AOS,
Att: 7 Exhibit Clerk's Certificate of Default,
Att: 8 Exhibit Default Notice,
Att: 9 Supplement Saberi Affidavit,
Att: 10 Exhibit Text Message Correspondence,
Att: 11 Exhibit Proof of Payments (part 1),
Att: 12 Exhibit Proof of Payments (part 2),
Att: 13 Exhibit Loan Excel Spreadsheet,
Att: 14 Exhibit The Settlement Agreement,
Att: 15 Exhibit BBG Client Trust Ledger,
Att: 16 Exhibit Legal Fee Invoices,
Att: 17 Exhibit Statement of Damages,
Att: 18 Exhibit Certificate of Service,
Att: 19 Supplement Memorandum of Law
22 22 motion Declaration of Mistrial Declaratory Judgment Mon 10/07 5:39 PM
FIRST MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial ., MOTION for Declaratory Judgment . Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Supplement Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Supplement Rothman Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit The Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Service Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit AOS,
Att: 7 Exhibit Clerk's Certificate of Default,
Att: 8 Exhibit Default Notice,
Att: 9 Supplement Saberi Affidavit,
Att: 10 Exhibit Text Message Correspondence,
Att: 11 Exhibit Proof of Payments (part 1),
Att: 12 Exhibit Proof of Payments (part 2),
Att: 13 Exhibit Loan Excel Spreadsheet,
Att: 14 Exhibit The Settlement Agreement,
Att: 15 Exhibit BBG Client Trust Ledger,
Att: 16 Exhibit Legal Fee Invoices,
Att: 17 Exhibit Statement of Damages,
Att: 18 Exhibit Certificate of Service,
Att: 19 Supplement Memorandum of Law
Friday, September 20, 2024
21 21 order Memo Endorsement Fri 09/20 4:54 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:20 Letter filed by Durand Henry Saberi. ENDORSEMENT: The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for Friday, September 27, 2024, is CANCELED. By not later than Monday, October 7, 2024, Plaintiff must file a proposed order to show cause why default judgment should not be entered, proposed default judgment, and supporting papers in compliance with Attachment A to the Undersigned's Individual Practices. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/20/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Letter Fri 09/20 2:41 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from PARKER S. ROTHMAN dated September 20, 2024 re: Initial Pretrial Conference Order. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
19 19 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Mon 08/26 4:36 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to defendant Sebastian Londono Correa. (tp)
Related: [-]
18 18 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Mon 08/26 3:45 PM
DECLARATION of Parker S. Rothman in Support re:13 Summons Issued,15 Certificate of Service Complaints,, Affidavit of Service Complaints,12 Request for Issuance of Summons,17 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,1 Complaint,7 Complaint,9 FIRST MOTION to Serve Sebastin Londoo Correa .,11 Order on Motion to Serve,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: AOS dated 8/20/24,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Request for Default Cert
17 17 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Mon 08/26 3:35 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
16 16 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Tue 08/20 2:08 PM
DECLARATION of Parker S. Rothman re:13 Summons Issued,15 Certificate of Service Complaints,, Affidavit of Service Complaints,12 Request for Issuance of Summons,1 Complaint,14 Affidavit of Service Other,,,, Affidavit of Service Complaints,,,7 Complaint,9 FIRST MOTION to Serve Sebastin Londoo Correa .,11 Order on Motion to Serve,,,,,,,,, SEBASTIN LONDOO CORREA . Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate of Service Complaints Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 08/20 1:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint. Service was made by By E-Mail per Memo Endorsed (Hon. Valeri Caproni) so-ordered on July 23, 2024. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint. Service was made by By E-Mail per Memo Endorsed (Hon. Valeri Caproni) so-ordered on July 23, 2024. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Other Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 08/20 1:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of a) Summons and Complaint; (b) Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference; (c) Civil Cover Sheet; (d) Rule Statement; (e) SDNY Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions; and (f) Order/Memo Endorsed (Hon. Valeri Caproni, United States District Court Judge) so-ordered on July 23, 2024. served on SEBASTIN LONDOO CORREA on July 29, 2024. Service was made by Via E-Mail Per Order/Memo Endorsed (Hon. Valeri Caproni, United States District Court Judge) so-ordered on July 23, 2024. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Sebastian Londono Correa served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. Service was made by Via E-Mail Per Order/Memo Endorsed (Hon. Valeri Caproni, United States District Court Judge) so-ordered on July 23, 2024. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
13 13 service Summons Issued Fri 07/26 11:50 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sebastian Londono Correa..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 07/25 12:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEBASTIN LONDOO CORREA, re:7 Complaint. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Serve Wed 07/24 9:59 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Serve. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff alleges that Defendant is an individual living in Colombia. See Compl., Dkt. 7 2. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f), Plaintiff may serve an individual in a foreign country (1) by any internationally agreed means of service that is reasonably calculated to give notice, like those authorized by the Hague Convention on the Service Abroad of Judicial and Extrajudicial Documents; (2) if there is no internationally agreed means, by a method reasonably calculated to give notice as prescribed by the foreign country's law for service or in a response to a letter rogatory; or (3) "by other means not prohibited by international agreement, as the court orders." The plain language of the rule does not indicate a hierarchy among the acceptable methods. Advanced Aerofoil Techs., AG v. Todaro, No. 11-CV-9505 (ALC), 2012 WL 299959, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 31, 2012) (explaining that service under subsection 3 is "neither a last resort nor extraordinary relief" (citation omitted)). Under subsection 3, as long as the requested mean of service is not prohibited by international agreement, a court has discretion to determine that an alternative means of service like e-mail is appropriate. International agreement does not prohibit service by e-mail in Colombia. See Setai Hotel Acquisition, LLC v. Miami Beach Luxury Rentals, Inc., No. 16-CV-21296, 2016 WL 8677230, at *4 (S.D. Fla. Oct. 14, 2016) (explaining that Colombia is a party to international agreements providing for service of judicial documents by mail and has never objected to e-mail service). Further, Plaintiff has provided sufficient information to show that service by e-mail is reasonably calculated to apprise the Defendant of the pendency of the action. Plaintiff cites a previous settlement agreement between the parties, in which Defendant agreed to service of process via e-mail to his address s.londono1092@gmail.com. Plaintiff also explains that Defendant has communicated with Plaintiff's counsel using that e-mail address as recently as July 15, 2024. For these reasons, it is hereby ordered that Plaintiff may serve Defendant via e-mail at his address s.londono1092@gmail.com pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/23/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 07/19 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/19/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Serve Fri 07/19 12:21 PM
FIRST MOTION to Serve Sebastin Londoo Correa . Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 07/18 11:13 AM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEBASTIN LONDOO CORREA, re:7 Complaint. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker) Modified on 7/18/2024 (gp)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Complaint Thu 07/18 11:11 AM
COMPLAINT against Sebastian Londono Correa. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 07/18 3:07 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 07/18 3:07 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 07/18 3:07 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 07/18 3:33 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Parker S Rothman to RE-FILE Document No. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The PDF lists an email address as means of service. You must seek permission from the Juge to electronically serve via email. (gp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Tue 07/16 3:54 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Parker S Rothman to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/22/2024. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 07/16 3:55 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Parker S Rothman to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Summons Returned Executed,, Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney; The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 07/15 3:02 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Sebastian Londono Correa served on 7/15/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi., REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEBASTIN LONDOO CORREA, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/15 2:49 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/15 2:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 07/15 2:46 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEBASTIN LONDOO CORREA, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Durand Henry Saberi..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/15 2:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 07/15 9:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Parker S Rothman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 370 (Other Fraud); Dollar Demand $630,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 190 (Contract: Other); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $630,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 07/15 9:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Parker S Rothman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DURAND HENRY SABERI, SEBASTIN LONDOO CORREA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 07/15 9:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Parker S Rothman to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Remove the summons form. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/22/2024. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/15 9:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Parker S Rothman to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 07/15 9:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Parker S Rothman to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/12 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against DURAND HENRY SABERI. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29596973)Document filed by DURAND HENRY SABERI..(Rothman, Parker)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet