Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-10727

Wisconsin Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine J Furay
Case #: 3:24-ap-00040
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Letea J. Gallahorn
1875 Mariann Ct.
Beloit, WI 53511
Represented By
Letea J. Gallahorn
contact info
Defendant
Lawrence E. Gallahorn
1617 Dewey Ave.
Beloit, WI 53511
Represented By
Lawrence E. Gallahorn
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development
201 E. Washington Ave. PO Box 8942
Madison, WI 53708
Represented By
Ryan Xavier Farrell
Wisconsin Dept. Of Workforce Development
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:12 PM CDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
17 17 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/07 10:47 AM
Adversary Case Closed (24-40). (Eau Claire, Tara)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 09/13 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #15 )
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
15 15 orderad Judgment Wed 09/11 2:26 PM
Judgment cc: parties in int. Related [+] Signed on 9/11/2024. (Eau Claire, Tara)
Related: [-] 1
14 14 order Default Judgment Wed 09/11 2:21 PM
Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] cc: parties in int. Signed on 9/11/2024. (Eau Claire, Tara)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
13 13 chap Hearing Held Wed 09/11 10:00 AM
PM/Hearing Held on Motion by Plaintiff for Default Judgment. OUTCOME : Granted, order at docket no. 6 and 7 to be signed. (Doc # 5) (Madison, Tina)
Related: [-]
12 12 chap Hearing Held Wed 09/11 9:59 AM
PM/ORDER Pre-trial Held on Complaint. OUTCOME : For the reasons stated from the bench, the default judgment is granted. (Doc # 1) (Madison, Tina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 miscad Proof of Service Tue 08/27 4:10 PM
Proof of Service filed by Ryan Xavier Farrell on behalf of State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development. Related document(s)5 ,8 ,7 ,6 Motion for Default Judgment with Notice of Motion, Affidavit in Support of Motion, and Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development, Proposed Order filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development, Proposed Judgment filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development, Pre-Trial Statement of the Case filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development. (Farrell, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 17, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Sat 08/17 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Thursday, August 15, 2024
9 9 court Hearing: Sched/Cont/Resched (auto form) Thu 08/15 11:36 AM
Preliminary hearing scheduled for 9/10/2024 at 02:30 PM at Telephone Conference on Motion for Default Judgment . Parties should call the Court conference line at 1-877-336-1828, access code 8588228##, to participate in this telephonic hearing. cc parties in interest. Related [+]. (Madison, Tina)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
8 8 miscad Pre-Trial Statement of the Case Tue 08/13 5:46 PM
Pre-Trial Statement of the Case with Certificate of Service filed by Ryan Xavier Farrell on behalf of State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development. Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development. (Farrell, Ryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 miscad Proposed Judgment Tue 08/13 5:45 PM
Proposed Judgment Related [+] filed by Attorney Ryan Xavier Farrell of Wisconsin Dept. of Workforce Development on behalf of State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development . Order to be signed on or after 9/9/2024. (Farrell, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 1
6 6 miscad Proposed Order - attorney adversary Tue 08/13 5:43 PM
Proposed Order Related [+] filed by Attorney Ryan Xavier Farrell of Wisconsin Dept. of Workforce Development on behalf of State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development . Order to be signed on or after 9/9/2024. (Farrell, Ryan)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 motion Default Judgment Tue 08/13 5:41 PM
Motion for Default Judgment with Notice of Motion, Affidavit in Support of Motion, and Certificate of Service filed by Ryan Xavier Farrell on behalf of State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development. (Farrell, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
4 4 miscad Proof of Service Wed 07/17 9:03 AM
Proof of Service filed by Ryan Xavier Farrell on behalf of State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development. Related document(s)3 ,1 ,2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development, Summons Issued, Preliminary Pre-Trial Order. (Farrell, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
3 3 court Preliminary Pretrial Order (auto form) Fri 07/12 11:13 AM
Preliminary Pretrial Order. Signed on 7/12/2024. Related [+]. (Eau Claire, Tara)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto form) Fri 07/12 11:12 AM
Summons to be served by 7/19/2024. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 9/10/2024 at 02:30 PM at Madison Hearings, Courtroom 350 on Complaint . Summons Issued on Lawrence E. Gallahorn Answer Due 8/12/2024; Letea J. Gallahorn Answer Due 8/12/2024. Related [+]. (Eau Claire, Tara)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/12 9:10 AM
Adversary case 3 24-00040 Complaint filed by State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Workforce Development against Letea J. Gallahorn, Lawrence E. Gallahorn [ Fee Amount $ 350]. Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) (Farrell, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (s) A-C