New York Southern District Court
Judge:Margaret M Garnett
Case #: 1:24-cv-05285
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 4:25 AM EST
Defendant
Verizon Communications Inc.
1095 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Minsuk Han
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Scott H. Angstreich
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd & Evans, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Joshua D. Branson
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Ashle Holman
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick
contact info
Defendant
Verizon Services Corp.
1095 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Minsuk Han
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Scott H. Angstreich
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd & Evans, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Joshua D. Branson
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Ashle Holman
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick
contact info
Defendant
Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless)
1095 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Minsuk Han
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Scott H. Angstreich
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd & Evans, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Joshua D. Branson
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Ashle Holman
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff
Sony Music Entertainment
25 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10010
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Roadrunner Records, Inc.
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC
3390 Mary Street, Suite 220
Coconut Grove, FL 33133
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
UMG Recordings, Inc.
2220 Colorado Avenue
Santa Monica, CA 90404
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ultra Records, LLC
25 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10010
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Volcano Entertainment III, LLC
25 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10010
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Music Inc.
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Music International Services Limited
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Music Latina Inc.
555 Washington Avenue
Miami Beach, FL 33139
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Music Nashville LLC
20 Music Square East
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Records Inc.
777 S. Santa Fe Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90021
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Records LLC
777 S. Santa Fe Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90021
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc.
777 S. Santa Fe Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90021
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Zomba Recording LLC
25 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10010
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elektra Entertainment LLC
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Arista Music
25 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10010
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Arista Records, LLC
25 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10010
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Asylum Records LLC
777 S. Santa Fe Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90021
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Atlantic Recording Corporation
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Atlantic Records Group LLC
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bad Boy Records LLC
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Big Beat Records Inc.
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Capitol Records, LLC
2220 Colorado Avenue
Santa Monica, CA 90404
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rykodisc, Inc.
777 S. Santa Fe Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90021
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Fueled by Ramen LLC
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LaFace Records, LLC
25 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10010
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lava Records LLC
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maverick Recording Company
777 S. Santa Fe Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90021
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nonesuch Records Inc.
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rhino Entertainment Company
777 S. Santa Fe Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90021
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rhino Entertainment LLC
777 S. Santa Fe Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90021
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ABKCO Music & Records, Inc.
85 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gould
Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
46 46 misc Letter Wed 03/12 5:44 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Jeffrey M. Gould dated March 12, 2025 re: Reply to Opposition to Labels' Request to Set Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Document filed by Fueled by Ramen LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Capitol Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Zomba Recording LLC, ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC..(Gould, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
45 45 misc Letter Fri 03/07 2:05 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Joshua D. Branson dated March 7, 2025 re: Opposition to Labels' Request to Set Initial Pre-Trial Conference or to Start Discovery. Document filed by Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless)..(Branson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
44 44 misc Letter Wed 03/05 9:53 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Jeffrey M. Gould dated March 5, 2025 re: Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Document filed by Fueled by Ramen LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Capitol Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Zomba Recording LLC, ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC..(Gould, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
43 43 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 11/07 12:41 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:39 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless)..(Branson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
42 42 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/17 6:48 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:39 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
41 41 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 09/05 5:48 PM
DECLARATION of Joshua D. Branson in Support re:39 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp...(Branson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
40 40 31 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 09/05 5:45 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:39 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp...(Branson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
39 39 2 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 09/05 5:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp...(Branson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
38 38 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/04 4:30 PM
ORDER granting37 Motion for Ashle J. Holman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett)(Text Only Order) (kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
37 37 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/03 4:32 PM
MOTION for Ashle J. Holman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29836862. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp...(Holman, Ashle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Ashle J. Holman,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (DC),
Att: 3 Proposed Order Regarding Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 09/03 4:50 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 37 MOTION for Ashle J. Holman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29836862. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 08/19 1:01 PM
ORDER granting35 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Request GRANTED. In light of the anticipated motion to dismiss, the conference that was scheduled for September 4, 2024, is ADJOURNED sine die. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Dkt. No. 35. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 8/19/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
35 35 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 08/16 11:47 AM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Joshua D. Branson dated August 16, 2024. Document filed by Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp...(Branson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
34 34 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/01 2:27 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Scott H. Angstreich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett)(Text Only Order) (kv)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/01 2:26 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Joshua D. Branson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett)(Text Only Order) (kv)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/01 2:05 PM
MOTION for Scott H. Angstreich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29689714. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp...(Angstreich, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Scott H. Angstreich,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (DC),
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (NY),
Att: 4 Proposed Order Regarding Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
31 31 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/01 2:01 PM
MOTION for Joshua D. Branson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29689650. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp...(Branson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Joshua D. Branson,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (DC),
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (MA),
Att: 4 Proposed Order Regarding Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 08/01 2:06 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 31 MOTION for Joshua D. Branson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29689650. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 08/01 2:08 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 32 MOTION for Scott H. Angstreich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29689714. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 07/29 4:48 PM
ORDER granting29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time.Request GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or move is extended to September 5, 2024. Any opposition to a motion to dismiss is due by October 17, 2024, and any reply brief is dueby November 7, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Dkt. No. 29. Motions due by 9/5/2024.. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 7/20/2024) (tro)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/29 4:49 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless) answer due 9/5/2024; Verizon Communications Inc. answer due 9/5/2024; Verizon Services Corp. answer due 9/5/2024. (tro)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/29 4:55 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/17/2024 Replies due by 11/7/2024. (tro)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time Fri 07/26 4:20 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Minsuk Han dated July 26, 2024. Document filed by Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp...(Han, Minsuk)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/26 4:10 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Services Corp.. Document filed by Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp...(Han, Minsuk)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/26 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Minsuk Han on behalf of Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp...(Han, Minsuk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/25 10:35 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Keith Howell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett)(Text Only Order) (kv)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/25 9:32 AM
MOTION for Keith Howell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29653697. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Howell, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Proposed Order to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 07/25 9:50 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 25 MOTION for Keith Howell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29653697. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/24 12:00 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Jeffrey M. Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett)(Text Only Order) (kv)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 07/24 10:15 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 20 MOTION for Jeffrey M. Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29645739. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
23 23 service Affidavit of Service Other Tue 07/23 8:00 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless) on July 18, 2024. Service was accepted by Chimere Brooks, Intake Specialist. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Affidavit of Service Other Tue 07/23 7:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Verizon Services Corp. on July 18, 2024. Service was accepted by Chimere Brooks, Intake Specialist. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Affidavit of Service Other Tue 07/23 7:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Verizon Communications Inc. on July 18, 2024. Service was accepted by Chimere Brooks, Intake Specialist. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/23 5:30 PM
MOTION for Jeffrey M. Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29645739. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Gould, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Proposed Order to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice
19 19 service Certificate of Service Other Tue 07/23 4:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases served on Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Cellco Partnership on July 23, 2024. Service was accepted by Joshua D. Branson and Scott H. Angstreich, counsel for Defendants. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 07/23 3:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,. Verizon Communications Inc. served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024. Service was accepted by Chimere Brooks, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Zomba Recording LLC; Volcano Entertainment III, LLC; Warner Music Nashville LLC; Big Beat Records Inc.; Arista Music; Rykodisc, Inc.; Capitol Records, LLC; UMG Recordings, Inc.; Warner Music Inc.; Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC; Roadrunner Records, Inc.; Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC; Arista Records, LLC; LaFace Records, LLC; Warner Music Latina Inc.; Rhino Entertainment Company; Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc.; Fueled by Ramen LLC; Ultra Records, LLC; Lava Records LLC; Warner Records Inc. ; Nonesuch Records Inc.; Warner Records LLC; Sony Music Entertainment; Bad Boy Records LLC; Asylum Records LLC; Elektra Entertainment LLC; Maverick Recording Company; Rhino Entertainment LLC; Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.; Atlantic Recording Corporation; ABKCO Music & Records, Inc.; Warner Music International Services Limited; Atlantic Records Group LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 07/23 3:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,. Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless) served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024. Service was accepted by Chimere Brooks, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Zomba Recording LLC; Volcano Entertainment III, LLC; Warner Music Nashville LLC; Big Beat Records Inc.; Arista Music; Rykodisc, Inc.; Capitol Records, LLC; UMG Recordings, Inc.; Warner Music Inc.; Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC; Roadrunner Records, Inc.; Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC; Arista Records, LLC; LaFace Records, LLC; Warner Music Latina Inc.; Rhino Entertainment Company; Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc.; Fueled by Ramen LLC; Ultra Records, LLC; Lava Records LLC; Warner Records Inc. ; Nonesuch Records Inc.; Warner Records LLC; Sony Music Entertainment; Bad Boy Records LLC; Asylum Records LLC; Elektra Entertainment LLC; Maverick Recording Company; Rhino Entertainment LLC; Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.; Atlantic Recording Corporation; ABKCO Music & Records, Inc.; Warner Music International Services Limited; Atlantic Records Group LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 07/23 3:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,. Verizon Services Corp. served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024. Service was accepted by Chimere Brooks, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Zomba Recording LLC; Volcano Entertainment III, LLC; Warner Music Nashville LLC; Big Beat Records Inc.; Arista Music; Rykodisc, Inc.; Capitol Records, LLC; UMG Recordings, Inc.; Warner Music Inc.; Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC; Roadrunner Records, Inc.; Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC; Arista Records, LLC; LaFace Records, LLC; Warner Music Latina Inc.; Rhino Entertainment Company; Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc.; Fueled by Ramen LLC; Ultra Records, LLC; Lava Records LLC; Warner Records Inc. ; Nonesuch Records Inc.; Warner Records LLC; Sony Music Entertainment; Bad Boy Records LLC; Asylum Records LLC; Elektra Entertainment LLC; Maverick Recording Company; Rhino Entertainment LLC; Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.; Atlantic Recording Corporation; ABKCO Music & Records, Inc.; Warner Music International Services Limited; Atlantic Records Group LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 07/22 11:49 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/4/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 7/22/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 07/17 8:53 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Judge Victor Marrero is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
14 14 service Summons Issued Tue 07/16 3:25 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Verizon Communications Inc...(gp)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Tue 07/16 3:24 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Verizon Services Corp...(gp)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 07/16 3:23 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless)..(gp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 07/15 3:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), re:1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 07/15 3:49 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Verizon Services Corp., re:1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 07/15 3:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Verizon Communications Inc., re:1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Mon 07/15 2:27 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 07/15 12:24 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 07/15 12:25 PM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 07/15 12:25 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 07/15 2:34 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Matthew Jan Oppenheim to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,,, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons Caption error. List lead defendant followed by et al. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
7 7 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/12 3:54 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp., Other Affiliate AI Entertainment Holdings LLC for Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC; Corporate Parent Sony Group Corporation for Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Zomba Recording LLC; Corporate Parent Universal Music Group N.V., Other Affiliate Compagnie de Cornouaille SAS, Other Affiliate PS VII Master, L.P. for Capitol Records, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc.; Corporate Parent Bad Boy Records, Corporate Parent Atlantic Recording Corporation for Bad Boy Records LLC. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Fri 07/12 3:31 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 07/12 3:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cellco Partnership (dba Verizon Wireless), re:1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 07/12 3:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Verizon Services Corp., re:1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 07/12 3:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Verizon Communications Inc., re:1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Elektra Entertainment LLC, Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rykodisc, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Ultra Records, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Latina Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 07/12 3:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/12 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Cellco Partnership (d/b/a Verizon Wireless), Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29598032)Document filed by Zomba Recording LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Nashville LLC, Big Beat Records Inc., Arista Music, Rykodisc, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC, Arista Records, LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Warner Music Latina Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner Records/QRI Venture, Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Ultra Records, LLC, Lava Records LLC, Warner Records Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Bad Boy Records LLC, Asylum Records LLC, Elektra Entertainment LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Atlantic Records Group LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A