North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Kenneth D Bell
Referred: Susan C Rodriguez
Case #: 5:24-cv-00164
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Terminated:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 4:29 AM EST
Defendant
Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By
James P. Hollihan
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Craig Michael Warner
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Plan for Group Insurance
Represented By
James P. Hollihan
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Craig Michael Warner
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lauren Montgomery
Represented By
Bryan Lee Tyson
Marcellino & Tyson, PLLC
contact info
Hannah Auckland
Marcellino & Tyson , PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, November 18, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 11/18 3:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Lauren Montgomery (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Auckland, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time Mon 10/28 4:06 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadline to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Lauren Montgomery. Responses due by 11/12/2024 (Auckland, Hannah)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 10/28 4:14 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Case Settlement Deadline 11/27/2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 10/28/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
10 10 notice Case Settlement Notice Thu 09/26 11:05 AM
Parties Notice of Settlement. COURT NOTICE to the Parties: Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court may dismiss the case without prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 10/28/2024. (Auckland, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 09/18 7:06 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certification of Report of F.C.R.P 26(f) Conference and Proposed Discovery Plan. CIAC Report due by 9/27/2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 9/18/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time Tue 09/17 6:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certification of Report of F.C.R.P 26(f) Conference and Proposed Discovery Plan by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., The Plan for Group Insurance. Responses due by 10/1/2024 (Warner, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Tue 08/27 11:09 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/17/2024. (mek)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/26 3:07 PM
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James P. Hollihan for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. and The Plan for Group Insurance (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 8/26/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Mon 08/26 1:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James P. Hollihan Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6643498. by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., The Plan for Group Insurance. (Warner, Craig)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/26 1:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., The Plan for Group Insurance. (Warner, Craig)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate of Counsel Mon 08/26 1:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re4 Answer to Complaint by Craig Michael Warner on behalf of Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., The Plan for Group Insurance (Warner, Craig)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/26 1:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., The Plan for Group Insurance.(Warner, Craig)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Mon 08/26 3:08 PM
Notice to James P. Hollihan: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 9/3/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
3 3 motion Extension of Time Fri 08/09 10:17 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., The Plan for Group Insurance. (Warner, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 08/09 10:25 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.'s answer due 8/26/2024; The Plan for Group Insurance's answer due 8/26/2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 8/9/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Fri 07/19 9:13 AM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (llp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 07/15 8:45 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., The Plan for Group Insurance. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (llp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/15 8:39 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (llp)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Bell Civil Standing Order Requiring ISC Mon 07/15 8:40 AM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases] assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (llp)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/12 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6589598), filed by Lauren Montgomery.(Auckland, Hannah)
Related: [-]